EP3058551 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR DETERMINING OBJECT MOTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.05.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.05.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 09.06.2021 [2021/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oahu Group, LLC 1568 St. Louis Drive Honolulu, Hawaii 96816 / US | [2018/49] |
Former [2016/34] | For all designated states Oahu Group, LLC 455 Anolani Street Honolulu, Hawaii 96821 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKATA, Robert Haruo 1568 St. Louis Dr. Honolulu, Hawaii 96816 / US | 02 /
NAKATA, Robert Jeffrey 1568 St. Louis Dr. Honolulu, Hawaii 96816 / US | 03 /
MOSTAFANEZHAD, Isar 1310 Ainapua Street Honolulu, Hawaii 96819 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2016/34] | 01 /
NAKATA, Robert Haruo c/o Oahu Group, LLC 455 Anolani Street Honolulu, Hawaii 96821 / US | ||
02 /
NAKATA, Robert Jeffrey c/o Oahu Group, LLC 455 Anolani Street Honolulu, Hawaii 96821 / US | |||
03 /
MOSTAFANEZHAD, Isar 1310 Ainapua Street Honolulu, Hawaii 96819 / US | Representative(s) | Boynton, Juliette Alice Schlich 9 St. Catherine's Road Littlehampton, West Sussex BN17 5HS / GB | [2016/34] | Application number, filing date | 14853566.9 | 17.10.2014 | [2016/34] | WO2014US61255 | Priority number, date | US201361893222P | 20.10.2013 Original published format: US 201361893222 P | [2016/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2015058154 | Date: | 23.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/16] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3058551 | Date: | 24.08.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.04.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 11.06.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/20, G08C17/02, G06F17/40, A61B5/11, G06F3/01, // H04W4/02 | [2017/27] | CPC: |
H04W4/026 (EP,US);
A61B5/1121 (EP,US);
G06F3/011 (EP,US);
H04B1/385 (US);
H04W4/027 (EP,US);
A61B5/1114 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2016/34] | G06T7/20, G08C17/02, G06F17/40 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/34] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR BESTIMMUNG VON OBJEKTBEWEGUNGEN | [2016/34] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR DETERMINING OBJECT MOTION | [2016/34] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE DÉTERMINATION DE MOUVEMENT D'OBJET | [2016/34] | Entry into regional phase | 19.05.2016 | National basic fee paid | 19.05.2016 | Search fee paid | 19.05.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.05.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.05.2016 | Examination requested [2016/34] | 12.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.04.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2020 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US7602301 (STIRLING HAROLD DAN [US], et al) [I] 1-20 * column 9, line 46 - column 11, line 49 * * column 12, line 6 - column 17, line 62 * * column 21, line 8 - column 24, line 41 *; | [I]EP2141632 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [I] 1-7,9-13,17-20 * paragraphs [0039] - [0044] * * paragraphs [0051] , [0052] * * figure - *; | [A]US2010152600 (DROITCOUR AMY [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * paragraphs [0240] , [0247] , [0450] * * paragraphs [0528] - [0535] * * paragraphs [0617] , [0618] *; | [A]US2010304931 (STUMPF JOHN F [US]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]US2013029685 (MOSHFEGHI MEHRAN [US]) [A] 1-20* paragraphs [0072] - [0086] * | International search | [X]US6691074 (MORIYA NETZER [IL], et al); | [A]US2008285805 (LUINGE HENK J [NL], et al); | [A]US2013188017 (MA CHRIS CHEN-HSING [CA]) | by applicant | US7602301 | EP2141632 | US2010152600 | US2010304931 | US2013029685 |