Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
08.11.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.12.2019 [2019/50] |
07.08.2019 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
12.07.2019 | Change - divisional application(s) | published on 14.08.2019 [2019/33] |
03.05.2019 | Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
02.01.2019 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
21.12.2018 | First examination report | |
31.10.2018 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
08.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant | |
31.10.2017 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
17.05.2017 | Supplementary search report | published on 14.06.2017 [2017/24] |
12.05.2017 | Change - classification | published on 14.06.2017 [2017/24] |
10.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant | |
23.12.2016 | Change - extension states | published on 25.01.2017 [2017/04] |
31.10.2016 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
22.07.2016 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 24.08.2016 [2016/34] |
22.07.2016 | Request for examination filed | published on 24.08.2016 [2016/34] |
07.07.2016 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
16.06.2016 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
23.05.2016 | Change - representative | |
23.05.2016 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
01.05.2015 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
24.04.2015 | PCT data prior to European publication |