Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2019174475 | Global Dossier | 06.06.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361893266 | 20.10.2013 | US201615332946 | 24.10.2016 | US201816185785 | 09.11.2018 | US201414519086 | 20.10.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2015110212 | Global Dossier | 23.04.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414519095 | 20.10.2014 | US201361893266 | 20.10.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9479241 | Global Dossier | 25.10.2016 | B2 | US2015110049 | 23.04.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361893266 | 20.10.2013 | US201414519086 | 20.10.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10129887 | Global Dossier | 13.11.2018 | B2 | US2017086184 | 23.03.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361893266 | 20.10.2013 | US201615332946 | 24.10.2016 | US201414519086 | 20.10.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20160090811 | Global Dossier | 01.08.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014US61422 | 20.10.2014 | US201361893266 | 20.10.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2016541155 | Global Dossier | 28.12.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014US61422 | 20.10.2014 | US201361893266 | 20.10.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3573363 | Global Dossier | 27.11.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP14853652 | 20.10.2014 | WO2014US61422 | 20.10.2014 | US201361893266 | 20.10.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105814932B | Global Dossier | 15.10.2019 | B | CN105814932 | 27.07.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014US61422 | 20.10.2014 | US201361893266 | 20.10.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3058770 | Global Dossier | 14.06.2017 | A4 | EP3058770 | 24.08.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014US61422 | 20.10.2014 | US201361893266 | 20.10.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2935037 | 23.04.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014US61422 | 20.10.2014 | US201361893266 | 20.10.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX365057 | 22.05.2019 | B | MX2016005210 | 05.10.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014US61422 | 20.10.2014 | US201361893266 | 20.10.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2015058210 | Global Dossier | 23.04.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361893266 | 20.10.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2020014212 | Global Dossier | 23.01.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361893266 | 20.10.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2019003711 | 24.06.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361893266 | 20.10.2013 | Type | Divisional application | EP3573363 |