EP3060045 - SYNERGISTIC PESTICIDAL COMPOSITIONS AND RELATED METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.02.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.03.2018 [2018/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dow AgroSciences LLC 9330 Zionsville Road Indianapolis, IN 46268 / US | [2016/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOMEZ, Luis E. 261 Wyndotte Drive Carmel, Indiana 46032 / US | 02 /
HUNTER, Ricky 342 West Tansey Crossing Westfield, Indiana 46074 / US | 03 /
SHAW, Mike 14203 Dove Drive Carmel, Indiana 46033 / US | 04 /
TRULLINGER, Tony K. 644 Zephyr Way Westfield, Indiana 46074 / US | 05 /
HERBERT, John 592 Conner Creek Drive Fishers, Indiana 46038 / US | 06 /
KUBISZAK, Mary E. 3125 North 675 West Thorntown, Indiana 46071 / US | [2016/35] | Representative(s) | HGF 4th Floor Merchant Exchange 17-19 Whitworth Street West Manchester M1 5WG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/35] | HGF Limited 4th Floor Merchant Exchange 17-19 Whitworth Street West Manchester M1 5WG / GB | Application number, filing date | 14855164.1 | 17.10.2014 | [2016/35] | WO2014US61026 | Priority number, date | US201361894116P | 22.10.2013 Original published format: US 201361894116 P | [2016/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015061147 | Date: | 30.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3060045 | Date: | 31.08.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.04.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 30.04.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A01N43/40, A01N43/56, A01N31/04, A01N33/06, A01P5/00, A01P7/00, A01P7/02, A01P7/04, A01P9/00 | [2017/14] | CPC: |
A01N43/56 (EP,KR,US);
A01N25/22 (KR);
A01N25/30 (KR);
A01N25/32 (KR);
A01N43/40 (KR);
C07D231/38 (KR);
C07D231/40 (KR);
C07D401/04 (KR);
C07D403/04 (KR);
Y10S424/10 (KR)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A01N43/56, A01N47/40, A01N51/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2016/35] | A01N43/40, A01N43/56, A01N31/04, A01N33/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/35] | Title | German: | SYNERGISTISCHE PESTIZIDZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND ZUGEHÖRIGE VERFAHREN | [2016/35] | English: | SYNERGISTIC PESTICIDAL COMPOSITIONS AND RELATED METHODS | [2016/35] | French: | COMPOSITIONS PESTICIDES SYNERGIQUES ET PROCÉDÉS ASSOCIÉS | [2016/35] | Entry into regional phase | 17.05.2016 | National basic fee paid | 17.05.2016 | Search fee paid | 17.05.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.05.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.05.2016 | Examination requested [2016/35] | 23.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/13] | 09.11.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]WO2015061146 (DOW AGROSCIENCES LLC [US]) [E] 1-15* the whole document * | International search | [A]US2002013326 (TIEBES JORG [DE], et al); | [A]US2011098287 (BRETSCHNEIDER THOMAS [DE], et al); | [Y]US2012094837 (MUEHLTHAU FRIEDRICH AUGUST [DE], et al); | [X]WO2012061290 (DOW AGROSCIENCES LLC [US], et al); | [A]WO2012108511 (NISSAN CHEMICAL IND LTD [JP], et al) |