EP3061644 - SEAT SLIDE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.10.2020 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.11.2020 [2020/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aisin Seiki Kabushiki Kaisha 1 Asahi-machi 2-chome Kariya-shi, Aichi 448-8650 / JP | [2016/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SATOH, Takanori c/o AISIN SEIKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA Intellectual Property Department 1, Asahi-machi 2-chome Kariya-shi, Aichi-Ken 448-8650 / JP | 02 /
KUMAGAI, Koji c/o AISIN SEIKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA Intellectual Property Department 1, Asahi-machi 2-chome Kariya-shi, Aichi-Ken 448-8650 / JP | 03 /
SAKAI, Makoto c/o AISIN SEIKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA Intellectual Property Department 1, Asahi-machi 2-chome Kariya-shi, Aichi-Ken 448-8650 / JP | 04 /
KOJIMA, Yasuhiro c/o AISIN SEIKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA Intellectual Property Department 1, Asahi-machi 2-chome Kariya-shi, Aichi-Ken 448-8650 / JP | [2016/35] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/35] | Intès, Didier Gérard André, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 14855480.1 | 24.10.2014 | [2016/35] | WO2014JP78373 | Priority number, date | JP20130222346 | 25.10.2013 Original published format: JP 2013222346 | JP20130222347 | 25.10.2013 Original published format: JP 2013222347 | JP20130222348 | 25.10.2013 Original published format: JP 2013222348 | [2016/35] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015060435 | Date: | 30.04.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3061644 | Date: | 31.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.04.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B60N2/07, B60N2/08 | [2016/35] | CPC: |
B60N2/0818 (EP,US);
B60N2/0705 (EP,US);
B60N2/0715 (EP,US);
B60N2/085 (EP,US);
B60N2/0881 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/35] | Title | German: | SITZGLEITVORRICHTUNG | [2016/35] | English: | SEAT SLIDE DEVICE | [2016/35] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE GLISSIÈRE DE SIÈGE | [2016/35] | Entry into regional phase | 23.05.2016 | Translation filed | 23.05.2016 | National basic fee paid | 23.05.2016 | Search fee paid | 23.05.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.05.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.05.2016 | Examination requested [2016/35] | 27.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/45] | 30.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XDI]US2012132778 (NAKAMURA MOTOHISA [JP], et al) [XD] 4 * the whole document * [I] 1-3,5-9; | [AD]JP2010095171 (IMASEN ELECTRIC IND) [AD] 1-9 * abstract *; | [A]US2013134281 (NAOKI HAYASHI [JP]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]US2008231101 (SAKAKIBARA YOSHIHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]EP2631110 (AISIN SEIKI [JP]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document * | International search | [A]JP2010095171 (IMASEN ELECTRIC IND); | [A]JP2010195269 (TOYOTA BOSHOKU CORP); | [X]JP2012111378 (GIFU AUTO BODY INDUSTRY CO LTD); | [A]WO2013008630 (AISIN SEIKI [JP], et al) | by applicant | JP2008184033 | JP2010095171 | JP2013052843 |