Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
02.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.11.2020 [2020/45] |
28.06.2020 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
05.12.2019 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
31.10.2018 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
29.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant | |
23.10.2017 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
23.05.2017 | Supplementary search report | published on 21.06.2017 [2017/25] |
19.05.2017 | Change - classification | published on 21.06.2017 [2017/25] |
19.05.2017 | Change - classification | published on 21.06.2017 [2017/25] |
30.12.2016 | Change - extension states | published on 01.02.2017 [2017/05] |
19.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant | |
24.10.2016 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
02.09.2016 | Change - applicant | published on 05.10.2016 [2016/40] |
26.08.2016 | Change - applicant | published on 28.09.2016 [2016/39] |
29.07.2016 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 31.08.2016 [2016/35] |
29.07.2016 | Request for examination filed | published on 31.08.2016 [2016/35] |
22.06.2016 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
03.06.2016 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
25.05.2016 | Amendment by applicant | |
23.05.2016 | Change - representative | |
23.05.2016 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
17.07.2015 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
08.05.2015 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
01.05.2015 | PCT data prior to European publication |