EP3061424 - MEDICAL STENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.10.2020 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.11.2020 [2020/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 2951 Ishikawa-machi, Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | [2016/40] |
Former [2016/39] | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | ||
Former [2016/35] | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 2951 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANUMA, Yutaka c/o Olympus Corporation 2951 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | [2016/35] | Representative(s) | Gunzelmann, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/35] | Gunzelmann, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14855508.9 | 24.10.2014 | [2016/35] | WO2014JP78351 | Priority number, date | US201361895541P | 25.10.2013 Original published format: US 201361895541 P | [2016/35] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015060424 | Date: | 30.04.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3061424 | Date: | 31.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.04.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/848, A61F2/844, A61F2/94 | [2017/25] | CPC: |
A61F2/848 (EP,US);
A61F2/04 (EP,US);
A61F2/94 (EP,US);
A61F2002/041 (EP,US);
A61F2002/8483 (EP,US);
A61F2002/8486 (EP,US);
A61F2220/0008 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/35] | A61F2/848, A61F2/844 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/35] | Title | German: | MEDIZINISCHER STENT | [2016/35] | English: | MEDICAL STENT | [2016/35] | French: | ENDOPROTHÈSE MÉDICALE | [2016/35] | Entry into regional phase | 23.05.2016 | Translation filed | 23.05.2016 | National basic fee paid | 23.05.2016 | Search fee paid | 23.05.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.05.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.05.2016 | Examination requested [2016/35] | 23.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/45] | 29.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2020/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2019 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2005046488 (MEDTRONIC VASCULAR INC [US], et al) [X] 1,4-6,9,11 * paragraph [0058]; figures 8-10 *; | [A]EP2133043 (OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP [JP]) [A] 1-11* paragraphs [0087] - [0091]; figure 30 * | International search | [A]JP2000152985 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO); | [A]WO03092782 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO [JP], et al); | [A]JP2006051375 (PERCARDIA INC); | [A]US2011077622 (WEISMAN MICHAL [US], et al); | [A]US2012203325 (WEISMAN MICHAL [US], et al) | by applicant | JP2009136676 |