EP3060831 - SEALING SYSTEM AND SEALING RING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.07.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.08.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.06.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 24.08.2022 [2022/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SKF Marine GmbH Hermann-Blohm-Straße 5 20457 Hamburg / DE | For all designated states Skf Usa Inc. 890 Forty Foot Road PO Box 352 Lansdale, PA 19446 / US | [2016/50] |
Former [2016/35] | For all designated states SKF Blohm + Voss Industries GmbH Hermann-Blohm-Strasse 5 20457 Hamburg / DE | ||
For all designated states Skf Usa Inc. 890 Forty Foot Road PO Box 352 Lansdale, PA 19446 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VON BERGEN, Ernst-Peter Hauptstrasse 12 24811 Ahlefeld / DE | 02 /
FANGAUF, Carlos Eichenstrasse 62 20255 Hamburg / DE | 03 /
ZIEMEN, Lars Auf dem Kamp 4 22335 Hamburg / DE | 04 /
VON BORSTEL, Dieter Wetternweg 3a 21720 Guderhandviertel / DE | 05 /
RISTIC, Ivan Stuebeheide 67 22337 Hamburg / DE | 06 /
WUESTENHAGEN, Guido Beerentaltrift 60b 21077 Hamburg / DE | [2016/42] |
Former [2016/35] | 01 /
VON BERGEN, Ernst-Peter Hauptstrasse 12 24811 Ahlefeld / DE | ||
02 /
FANGAUF, Carlos Eppendorfer Weg 128 20259 Hamburg / DE | |||
03 /
ZIEMEN, Lars Auf dem Kamp 4 22335 Hamburg / DE | |||
04 /
VON BORSTEL, Dieter Wetternweg 3a 21720 Guderhandviertel / DE | |||
05 /
RISTIC, Ivan Stuebeheide 67 22337 Hamburg / DE | |||
06 /
WUESTENHAGEN, Guido Beerentaltrift 60b 21077 Hamburg / DE | Representative(s) | Marschall, Stefan Elbpatent Marschall & Partner Patent und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Bavariaring 26 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/35] | Marschall, Stefan Elbpatent Marschall & Partner PartGmbB Jessenstrasse 4 22767 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 14855569.1 | 05.12.2014 | [2016/35] | WO2014US68744 | Priority number, date | DE20131017816 | 22.10.2013 Original published format: DE102013017816 | DE20131017817 | 22.10.2013 Original published format: DE102013017817 | DE20131017818 | 22.10.2013 Original published format: DE102013017818 | [2016/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015061810 | Date: | 30.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3060831 | Date: | 31.08.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.04.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3060831 | Date: | 16.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.04.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F16J15/32, F16J15/3212, F16J15/322, F16J15/324, F16J15/3252 | [2017/31] | CPC: |
F16J15/3216 (EP,US);
F16J15/32 (RU);
F16J15/3276 (EP,KR,US);
F16J15/3212 (EP,US);
F16J15/322 (EP,US);
F16J15/324 (EP,US);
F16J15/3244 (EP,KR,US);
F16J15/3252 (EP,US);
F16J15/3268 (EP,US);
Y10S277/907 (KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/35] | F16J15/32 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DICHTUNGSSYSTEM UND DICHTUNGSRING | [2016/35] | English: | SEALING SYSTEM AND SEALING RING | [2016/35] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ÉTANCHÉITÉ ET BAGUE D'ÉTANCHÉITÉ | [2016/35] | Entry into regional phase | 20.04.2016 | National basic fee paid | 20.04.2016 | Search fee paid | 20.04.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.04.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.04.2016 | Examination requested [2016/35] | 25.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.08.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 06.08.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.08.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 17.06.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.12.2014 | AL | 16.09.2020 | AT | 16.09.2020 | CY | 16.09.2020 | CZ | 16.09.2020 | DK | 16.09.2020 | EE | 16.09.2020 | ES | 16.09.2020 | HR | 16.09.2020 | LT | 16.09.2020 | LV | 16.09.2020 | MC | 16.09.2020 | MK | 16.09.2020 | MT | 16.09.2020 | PL | 16.09.2020 | RO | 16.09.2020 | RS | 16.09.2020 | SE | 16.09.2020 | SI | 16.09.2020 | SK | 16.09.2020 | SM | 16.09.2020 | TR | 16.09.2020 | IE | 05.12.2020 | LU | 05.12.2020 | BG | 16.12.2020 | GB | 16.12.2020 | NO | 16.12.2020 | GR | 17.12.2020 | BE | 31.12.2020 | CH | 31.12.2020 | FR | 31.12.2020 | LI | 31.12.2020 | IS | 16.01.2021 | PT | 18.01.2021 | [2022/34] |
Former [2022/32] | HU | 05.12.2014 | |
AL | 16.09.2020 | ||
AT | 16.09.2020 | ||
CY | 16.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
DK | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
ES | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
MC | 16.09.2020 | ||
MK | 16.09.2020 | ||
MT | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SI | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
TR | 16.09.2020 | ||
IE | 05.12.2020 | ||
LU | 05.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
GB | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
FR | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 05.12.2014 | |
AL | 16.09.2020 | ||
AT | 16.09.2020 | ||
CY | 16.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
DK | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
ES | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
MC | 16.09.2020 | ||
MT | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SI | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
TR | 16.09.2020 | ||
IE | 05.12.2020 | ||
LU | 05.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
GB | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
FR | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 16.09.2020 | |
AT | 16.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
DK | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
ES | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
MC | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SI | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
IE | 05.12.2020 | ||
LU | 05.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
GB | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
FR | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 16.09.2020 | |
AT | 16.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
DK | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
ES | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
MC | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SI | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
IE | 05.12.2020 | ||
LU | 05.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
GB | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
FR | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AL | 16.09.2020 | |
AT | 16.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
DK | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
ES | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
MC | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SI | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
IE | 05.12.2020 | ||
LU | 05.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
GB | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
FR | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AL | 16.09.2020 | |
AT | 16.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
DK | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
ES | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
MC | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SI | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
IE | 05.12.2020 | ||
LU | 05.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
GB | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
FR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 16.09.2020 | |
AT | 16.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
DK | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
ES | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
MC | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SI | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
IE | 05.12.2020 | ||
LU | 05.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
FR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AL | 16.09.2020 | |
AT | 16.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
DK | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
ES | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
MC | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SI | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
IE | 05.12.2020 | ||
LU | 05.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 16.09.2020 | |
AT | 16.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
DK | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
ES | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
MC | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SI | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
IE | 05.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/40] | AL | 16.09.2020 | |
AT | 16.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
DK | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
ES | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
MC | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SI | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 16.09.2020 | |
AT | 16.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
DK | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
ES | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SI | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 16.09.2020 | |
AT | 16.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
ES | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SI | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 16.09.2020 | |
AT | 16.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
ES | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 16.09.2020 | |
AT | 16.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
ES | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 16.09.2020 | |
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 16.09.2020 | |
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | HR | 16.09.2020 | |
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | HR | 16.09.2020 | |
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | HR | 16.09.2020 | |
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | SE | 16.09.2020 | |
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | NO | 16.12.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]US4344631 (WINN LEO W); | [XI]DE3714674 (BLOHM VOSS AG [DE]); | [XA]WO2010041543 (NOK CORP [JP], et al); | [XI]CA2826017 (BLOHM & VOSS IND GMBH [DE]) | International search | [X]DE3714674 (BLOHM VOSS AG [DE]); | [X]US5411273 (PIETSCH GUENTER [DE], et al) |