EP3025146 - SPEED BUMP BOMB DETECTOR FOR BOMBS IN VEHICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.01.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.02.2018 [2018/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Calsec California Science&Engineering Corporation 16540 Aston Street Irvine, CA 92606 / US | For all designated states Suvakovic, Alexander 16540 Aston Street Irvine, CA 92606 / US | For all designated states Maglich, Bogdan C. 16540 Aston Street Irvine, CA 92606 / US | [2016/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUVAKOVIC, Alexander 16540 Aston Street Irvine, CA 92606 / US | 02 /
MAGLICH, Bogdan C. 16540 Aston Street Irvine, CA 92606 / US | [2016/22] | Representative(s) | Wright, Howard Hugh Burnby Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/22] | Wright, Howard Hugh Burnby Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | Application number, filing date | 14856084.0 | 22.07.2014 | [2016/22] | WO2014US47567 | Priority number, date | US201361857641P | 23.07.2013 Original published format: US 201361857641 P | [2016/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2015060911 | Date: | 30.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/17] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3025146 | Date: | 01.06.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.04.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.07.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G01N23/00 | [2016/22] | CPC: |
G01V5/234 (EP,US);
G01N23/222 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/22] | Title | German: | BOMBENDETEKTOR MIT GESCHWINDIGKEITSHEMMUNGSSCHWELLE FÜR BOMBEN IN FAHRZEUGEN | [2016/22] | English: | SPEED BUMP BOMB DETECTOR FOR BOMBS IN VEHICLES | [2016/22] | French: | DÉTECTEUR DE BOMBE DANS RALENTISSEUR POUR BOMBES SITUÉES DANS DES VÉHICULES | [2016/22] | Entry into regional phase | 09.02.2016 | National basic fee paid | 09.02.2016 | Search fee paid | 09.02.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.02.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.02.2016 | Examination requested [2016/22] | 07.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/09] | 13.10.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US7430479 (HOLSLIN DANIEL [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7,9,11,14,16-19 * abstract * * figures 1, 2, 4 * * column 2, lines 17-45 * * column 4, lines 48-50 * * column 5, line 65 - column 7, line 8 * * column 7, lines 31-33 * * column 7, line 55 * * column 8, lines 5-41 * * column 9, lines 24-28 * * column 9, lines 39-42 * * column 10, lines 19-28 * * column 12, lines 12-50 * * column 15, lines 44-52 * * column 10, line 67 - column 11, line 3 *; | [XAYI]US7732772 (KOLTICK DAVID S [US], et al) [X] 1,4,5,7,14,16,17,19,21,23,25-27 * figures 1-3 * * column 2, lines 10-33 * * column 2, line 53 - column 3, line 51 * * column 4, lines 8-37 * * column 5, lines 26-48 * [A] 8,24 [Y] 15,22 [I] 20; | [XI]EP2259092 (APPLIED SIGNAL TECHNOLOGY INC [US]) [X] 1,4-6,12 * figures 3, 4a * * paragraphs [0027] - [0029] * * paragraphs [0040] - [0041] * * paragraphs [0045] - [0046] * * paragraph [0048] * * paragraphs [0050] - [0051] * [I] 13; | [X]US8324588 (DUNN WILLIAM L [US]) [X] 1-3,7,9,10,14,17,18 * figures 1, 4 * * column 2, lines 41-46 * * column 3, lines 49-55 * * column 4, line 1 - column 5, line 45 * * column 6, line 64 - column 7, line 4 * * column 7, lines 32-49 * * column 9, lines 12-31 * * column 10, lines 1-24 * * column 11, lines 11-21 * * column 11, line 63 - column 12, line 13 *; | [Y] - Calsec, "October 18, 2010 WHAT'S CALSEC ALL ABOUT? World's First and Only Sub-Nanotechnology *", (20101018), URL: http://calseco.com/userdata/news/10-18-2010.pdf, (20170126), XP055339548 [Y] 15,22 * middle paragraph; page 1 * | [L] - Anonymous, "News", (20170126), URL: http://calseco.com/news.html, (20170126), XP055339546 [L] 15,22 * page 2 * | International search | [Y]US2003185340 (FRANTZ ROBERT H [US]); | [Y]US2005156734 (ZERWEKH WILLIAM D [US], et al); | [Y]US2012236990 (ROTHSCHILD PETER J [US]); | [Y]US8288734 (NORRIS WAYNE B [US]); | [X]US8324588 (DUNN WILLIAM L [US]) |