EP3062575 - TERMINAL APPARATUS AND METHOD IN TERMINAL APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/35] | TERMINAL APPARATUS, BASE STATION APPARATUS, METHOD IN TERMINAL APPARATUS, AND METHOD IN BASE STATION APPARATUS | ||
[2020/15] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.06.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.07.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.04.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | [2016/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OUCHI Wataru c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 545-8522 / JP | 02 /
SHIMEZAWA Kazuyuki c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 545-8522 / JP | 03 /
NOGAMI Toshizo c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 545-8522 / JP | 04 /
SUZUKI Shoichi c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 545-8522 / JP | 05 /
IMAMURA Kimihiko c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 545-8522 / JP | [2016/35] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2016/35] | Application number, filing date | 14856214.3 | 24.10.2014 | [2016/35] | WO2014JP78371 | Priority number, date | JP20130221791 | 25.10.2013 Original published format: JP 2013221791 | [2016/35] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015060433 | Date: | 30.04.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3062575 | Date: | 31.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3062575 | Date: | 19.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.04.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/12, H04W28/16 | [2016/35] | CPC: |
H04W72/12 (EP,US);
H04B1/10 (US);
H04L5/14 (US);
H04W72/0446 (US);
H04W84/045 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ENDGERÄTEVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN IN DER ENDGERÄTEVORRICHTUNG | [2020/15] | English: | TERMINAL APPARATUS AND METHOD IN TERMINAL APPARATUS | [2020/15] | French: | APPAREIL TERMINAL ET PROCÉDÉ DANS UN APPAREIL TERMINAL | [2020/15] |
Former [2016/35] | ENDGERÄTEVORRICHTUNG, BASISSTATIONSVORRICHTUNG, VERFAHREN IN DER ENDGERÄTEVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN IN DER BASISSTATIONSVORRICHTUNG | ||
Former [2016/35] | TERMINAL APPARATUS, BASE STATION APPARATUS, METHOD IN TERMINAL APPARATUS, AND METHOD IN BASE STATION APPARATUS | ||
Former [2016/35] | APPAREIL TERMINAL, APPAREIL STATION DE BASE, PROCÉDÉ DANS UN APPAREIL TERMINAL, ET PROCÉDÉ DANS UN APPAREIL STATION DE BASE | Entry into regional phase | 26.04.2016 | Translation filed | 28.04.2016 | National basic fee paid | 28.04.2016 | Search fee paid | 28.04.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.04.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.04.2016 | Examination requested [2016/35] | 19.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 09.07.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 09.07.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.05.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.10.2014 | AL | 19.08.2020 | AT | 19.08.2020 | CY | 19.08.2020 | CZ | 19.08.2020 | DK | 19.08.2020 | EE | 19.08.2020 | ES | 19.08.2020 | FI | 19.08.2020 | HR | 19.08.2020 | IT | 19.08.2020 | LT | 19.08.2020 | LV | 19.08.2020 | MC | 19.08.2020 | MK | 19.08.2020 | MT | 19.08.2020 | NL | 19.08.2020 | PL | 19.08.2020 | RO | 19.08.2020 | RS | 19.08.2020 | SE | 19.08.2020 | SI | 19.08.2020 | SK | 19.08.2020 | SM | 19.08.2020 | TR | 19.08.2020 | IE | 24.10.2020 | LU | 24.10.2020 | BE | 31.10.2020 | CH | 31.10.2020 | LI | 31.10.2020 | BG | 19.11.2020 | NO | 19.11.2020 | GR | 20.11.2020 | IS | 19.12.2020 | PT | 21.12.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 24.10.2014 | |
AL | 19.08.2020 | ||
AT | 19.08.2020 | ||
CY | 19.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2020 | ||
DK | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
ES | 19.08.2020 | ||
FI | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
IT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
MC | 19.08.2020 | ||
MT | 19.08.2020 | ||
NL | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
SI | 19.08.2020 | ||
SK | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
TR | 19.08.2020 | ||
IE | 24.10.2020 | ||
LU | 24.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 19.08.2020 | |
AT | 19.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2020 | ||
DK | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
ES | 19.08.2020 | ||
FI | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
IT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
MC | 19.08.2020 | ||
NL | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
SI | 19.08.2020 | ||
SK | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
IE | 24.10.2020 | ||
LU | 24.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 19.08.2020 | |
AT | 19.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2020 | ||
DK | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
ES | 19.08.2020 | ||
FI | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
IT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
MC | 19.08.2020 | ||
NL | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
SI | 19.08.2020 | ||
SK | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
LU | 24.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 19.08.2020 | |
AT | 19.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2020 | ||
DK | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
ES | 19.08.2020 | ||
FI | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
IT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
MC | 19.08.2020 | ||
NL | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
SI | 19.08.2020 | ||
SK | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
LU | 24.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/34] | AL | 19.08.2020 | |
AT | 19.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2020 | ||
DK | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
ES | 19.08.2020 | ||
FI | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
IT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
MC | 19.08.2020 | ||
NL | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
SK | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
LU | 24.10.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 19.08.2020 | |
AT | 19.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2020 | ||
DK | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
ES | 19.08.2020 | ||
FI | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
MC | 19.08.2020 | ||
NL | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
SK | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
LU | 24.10.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 19.08.2020 | |
AT | 19.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2020 | ||
DK | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
ES | 19.08.2020 | ||
FI | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
NL | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
SK | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 19.08.2020 | |
AT | 19.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2020 | ||
DK | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
ES | 19.08.2020 | ||
FI | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
NL | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 19.08.2020 | |
CZ | 19.08.2020 | ||
DK | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
FI | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
NL | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | CZ | 19.08.2020 | |
DK | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
FI | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
NL | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 19.08.2020 | |
DK | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
FI | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
NL | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | DK | 19.08.2020 | |
FI | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
NL | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | FI | 19.08.2020 | |
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
NL | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | FI | 19.08.2020 | |
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | FI | 19.08.2020 | |
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 19.08.2020 | |
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 19.08.2020 | |
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY] - HUAWEI ET AL, "Details of TDD-FDD CA", vol. RAN WG1, no. Guangzhou, China; 20131007 - 20131011, (20130928), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-134056, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_74b/Docs/, (20130928), XP050717248 [X] 1,6,7 * page 3; page 4; 1. Introduction; pages 3, 4 * [A] 2-4 [Y] 5 | [X] - ERICSSON, "Detection of duplex", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-080888, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20080206), vol. RAN WG1, no. Sorrento, Italy; 20080206, XP050109363 [X] 1-4 * page 2 * | [YA] - CATT, "Parallel PUCCH transmission for FDD-TDD carrier aggregation", vol. RAN WG1, no. Guangzhou, China; 20131007 - 20131011, (20130928), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-134098, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_74b/Docs/, (20130928), XP050717290 [Y] 5 * page 2 * [A] 1-4,6,7 | International search | [X] - CATT, "PUSCH timing with TDD as PCell for FDD-TDD CA", 3GPP RL-134096, 3GPP, XP050717288 | [Y] - CATT, "PDSCH timing with TDD as PCell for FDD-TDD CA", 3GPP RL-134095, 3GPP, XP050717287 | [Y] - QUALCOMM INCORPORATED, "Solutions for TDD-FDD CA", 3GPP RL-134610, 3GPP, XP050717695 | [Y] - NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS ET AL., "DRX operation for EDPCCH monitoring", 3GPP R2-131084, 3GPP, (20130415), XP050699248 |