EP2924608 - BIOLOGICAL FEATURES IMAGING METHOD AND DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.11.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.12.2018 [2018/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eyesmart Technology Ltd. 501, Tai De Commercial Centre No. 12, Xinyuanxili Mid-street Chaoyang District Beijing 100027 / CN | [2015/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Xiaopeng 501 Tai De Commercial Centre No.12 Xin Yuan Li Mid-street Chaoyang District Beijing 100027 / CN | [2015/40] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2015/40] | Application number, filing date | 14856525.2 | 26.03.2014 | [2015/40] | WO2014CN00330 | Priority number, date | CN201310494298 | 21.10.2013 Original published format: CN201310494298 | [2015/40] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015058460 | Date: | 30.04.2015 | Language: | ZH | [2015/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2924608 | Date: | 30.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 30.04.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/00, G02B7/28, H04N5/232, // G02B3/14, H04N5/33 | [2016/45] | CPC: |
G02B7/28 (EP,US);
G06V40/19 (EP,US);
G06V40/193 (US);
H04N23/11 (EP,US);
H04N23/673 (EP,US);
G02B3/14 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/40] | G06K9/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/40] | Title | German: | BILDGEBUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR BIOLOGISCHER MERKMALE UND VORRICHTUNG | [2015/40] | English: | BIOLOGICAL FEATURES IMAGING METHOD AND DEVICE | [2015/40] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF D'IMAGERIE D'ÉLÉMENTS BIOLOGIQUES | [2015/40] | Entry into regional phase | 22.06.2015 | Translation filed | 22.06.2015 | National basic fee paid | 22.06.2015 | Search fee paid | 22.06.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.06.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/40] | 08.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.12.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.07.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/50] | 06.08.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/50] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.08.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XDI]CN102855476 (WANG XIAOPENG); | [X]US2013089240 (NORTHCOTT MALCOLM J [US], et al) | International search | [Y]CN1464323 (BEIJING ZHONGXING ELECTRONICS [CN]); | [Y]CN103136421 (SHEN HONGQUAN); | [XP]CN103593647 (WANG XIAOPENG) | by applicant | CN102855476 |