EP3060689 - LEACHING OF MINERALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.08.2020 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.09.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.08.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.07.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.03.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Glencore Technology Pty Ltd. 160 Ann Street Level 10 Brisbane, Queensland 4000 / AU | [2016/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOURN, Michael, Matthew 14 Kinrade Place Carindale, Queensland 4152 / AU | 02 /
MALLAH, Daniel c/- Cullens Patent and Trademark Attorneys Level 32 239 George Street Brisbane, Queensland 4000 / AU | 03 /
VOIGT, Paul c/- Cullens Patent and Trademark Attorneys Level 32 239 George Street Brisbane, Queensland 4000 / AU | 04 /
TURNER, Duncan c/- Cullens Patent and Trademark Attorneys Level 32 239 George Street Brisbane, Queensland 4000 / AU | [2016/35] | Representative(s) | Petraz, Gilberto Luigi, et al GLP S.r.l. Viale Europa Unita, 171 33100 Udine / IT | [2016/35] | Application number, filing date | 14856763.9 | 21.10.2014 | [2016/35] | WO2014AU50297 | Priority number, date | AU20130904052 | 21.10.2013 Original published format: AU 2013904052 | [2016/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015058257 | Date: | 30.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3060689 | Date: | 31.08.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.04.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3060689 | Date: | 09.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 30.04.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C22B3/12, C22B1/11, C22B11/00, C22B1/14 | [2016/35] | CPC: |
C22B1/11 (EP,EA,US);
C22B30/04 (US);
C21B15/00 (EA,US);
C22B1/14 (US);
C22B11/04 (EP,EA,US);
C22B3/12 (US);
C22B3/14 (US);
C22B34/22 (US);
C22B34/24 (US);
Y02P10/20 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LAUGUNG VON MINERALIEN | [2016/35] | English: | LEACHING OF MINERALS | [2016/35] | French: | LIXIVIATION DE MINÉRAUX | [2016/35] | Entry into regional phase | 19.04.2016 | National basic fee paid | 19.04.2016 | Search fee paid | 19.04.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.04.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.04.2016 | Examination requested [2016/35] | 19.10.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.07.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 03.07.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 03.07.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.08.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.08.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 10.07.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.10.2014 | AL | 09.10.2019 | AT | 09.10.2019 | CY | 09.10.2019 | CZ | 09.10.2019 | DK | 09.10.2019 | EE | 09.10.2019 | HR | 09.10.2019 | IT | 09.10.2019 | LT | 09.10.2019 | LV | 09.10.2019 | MC | 09.10.2019 | MK | 09.10.2019 | MT | 09.10.2019 | NL | 09.10.2019 | SE | 09.10.2019 | SI | 09.10.2019 | SK | 09.10.2019 | SM | 09.10.2019 | TR | 09.10.2019 | LU | 21.10.2019 | BE | 31.10.2019 | BG | 09.01.2020 | NO | 09.01.2020 | IS | 09.02.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 21.10.2014 | |
AL | 09.10.2019 | ||
AT | 09.10.2019 | ||
CY | 09.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2019 | ||
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
IT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
MC | 09.10.2019 | ||
MT | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
SI | 09.10.2019 | ||
SK | 09.10.2019 | ||
SM | 09.10.2019 | ||
TR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LU | 21.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
Former [2021/34] | HU | 21.10.2014 | |
AL | 09.10.2019 | ||
AT | 09.10.2019 | ||
CY | 09.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2019 | ||
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
IT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
MC | 09.10.2019 | ||
MT | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
SI | 09.10.2019 | ||
SK | 09.10.2019 | ||
SM | 09.10.2019 | ||
LU | 21.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 21.10.2014 | |
AL | 09.10.2019 | ||
AT | 09.10.2019 | ||
CY | 09.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2019 | ||
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
IT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
MC | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
SI | 09.10.2019 | ||
SK | 09.10.2019 | ||
SM | 09.10.2019 | ||
LU | 21.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
AT | 09.10.2019 | ||
CY | 09.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2019 | ||
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
IT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
MC | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
SI | 09.10.2019 | ||
SK | 09.10.2019 | ||
SM | 09.10.2019 | ||
LU | 21.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
AT | 09.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2019 | ||
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
IT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
MC | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
SI | 09.10.2019 | ||
SK | 09.10.2019 | ||
SM | 09.10.2019 | ||
LU | 21.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
AT | 09.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2019 | ||
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
IT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
MC | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
SK | 09.10.2019 | ||
SM | 09.10.2019 | ||
LU | 21.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
AT | 09.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2019 | ||
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
MC | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
SK | 09.10.2019 | ||
SM | 09.10.2019 | ||
LU | 21.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
AT | 09.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2019 | ||
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
MC | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
LU | 21.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
AT | 09.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
LU | 21.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
AT | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/26] | AT | 09.10.2019 | |
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AT | 09.10.2019 | |
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AT | 09.10.2019 | |
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | LT | 09.10.2019 | |
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NL | 09.10.2019 | |
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/20] | NL | 09.10.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0017407 (MIM HOLDINGS LTD [AU], et al) [A] 1-17* the whole document *; | [A]WO2004042094 (XSTRATA QUEENSLAND LTD [AU], et al) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2006064350 (GREENHILLS MINING AND IND SERV [ZA], et al) [A] 1-17 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US4559209 (MUIR COLIN W A [ZA], et al); | [A]US5961940 (SANDSTROEM AAKE [SE], et al); | [A]US2009293680 (RITCHIE IAN CHRISTOPHER [AU], et al) | by applicant | AU744356B | WO2004042094 | US6833021 | - P. M. DOVE; J. D. RIMSTIDT, Am. Miner., (19850000), vol. 70, pages 838 - 844 |