EP3063687 - INTENT ENGINES SYSTEMS AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 21.07.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.07.2023 | Refusal of application | published on 23.08.2023 [2023/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nant Holdings IP LLC 9920 Jefferson Boulevard Culver City, CA 90232 / US | [2016/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SOON-SHIONG, Patrick 9920 Jefferson Boulevard Culver City, California 90232 / US | 02 /
SOON-SHIONG, Luke 9920 Jefferson Boulevard Culver City, California 90232 / US | [2016/36] | Representative(s) | Laqua, Bernd Christian Kurt Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/36] | Smith, Samuel Leonard J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 14856964.3 | 28.10.2014 | [2016/36] | WO2014US62575 | Priority number, date | US201361896454P | 28.10.2013 Original published format: US 201361896454 P | [2016/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015065976 | Date: | 07.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3063687 | Date: | 07.09.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.05.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 07.05.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q30/02, G06F19/00 | [2017/16] | CPC: |
G06N5/04 (EP,US);
G06Q30/02 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2016/36] | G06F19/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/36] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN FÜR EINE ABSICHTS-ENGINE | [2016/36] | English: | INTENT ENGINES SYSTEMS AND METHOD | [2016/36] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉ DE MOTEUR D'INTENTION | [2016/36] | Entry into regional phase | 25.04.2016 | National basic fee paid | 25.04.2016 | Search fee paid | 25.04.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.04.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.08.2015 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: KR | 25.04.2016 | Examination requested [2016/36] | 19.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.07.2021 | 12.07.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 08.11.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | 31.01.2023 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 02.02.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2023/34] | 12.06.2023 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2023/34] | Appeal following examination | 11.04.2023 | Appeal received No. T1200/23 | 11.04.2023 | Payment of appeal fee | 12.06.2023 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]US2008126284 (FORBES SCOTT C [US], et al); | [A]WO2011000046 (OZMOTA INC [GB], et al); | [A]US2011313954 (ZHAO FENG [US], et al); | [A]US2013031081 (VIJAYARAGHAVAN RAVI [IN], et al); | [X]US2013204813 (MASTER DEMITRIOS LEO [US], et al) |