EP3063899 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR SYNCHRONIZED KEY DERIVATION ACROSS MULTIPLE CONDITIONAL ACCESS SERVERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.06.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Verimatrix, Inc. 6059 Cornerstone Court West San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2019/30] |
Former [2016/36] | For all designated states Verimatrix, Inc. 6059 Cornerstone Court West San Diego, CA 92121-3713 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MESSERMAN, Matthew 5872 Chateau Drive San Diego, CA 92177 / US | 02 /
HANDAL, Thomas 17823 36th Ave SE Bothell, WA 98012 / US | 03 /
FITE, Matthew 6429 Caminito Listo San Diego, CA 92111 / US | 04 /
MERSMANN, Gerd Hohenwaldeckstrasse 39 81541 München / DE | [2016/40] |
Former [2016/36] | 01 /
MESSERMAN, Matthew 2420 Bartel Street San Diego, CA 92123 / US | ||
02 /
HANDAL, Thomas 11302 182nd Place NE Apt. F4082 Redmond, WA 98052 / US | |||
03 /
FITE, Matthew 6429 Caminito Listo San Diego, CA 92111 / US | |||
04 /
MERSMANN, Gerd Hohenwaldeckstrasse 39 81541 München / DE | Representative(s) | Patentanwaltskanzlei Matschnig & Forsthuber OG Biberstraße 22 Postfach 36 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2016/36] | Patentanwaltskanzlei Matschnig & Forsthuber OG Biberstrasse 22 Postfach 36 1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 14858223.2 | 31.10.2014 | [2016/36] | WO2014US63585 | Priority number, date | US201361898441P | 31.10.2013 Original published format: US 201361898441 P | [2016/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015066556 | Date: | 07.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3063899 | Date: | 07.09.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.05.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.05.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/08, H04L9/16, H04N7/167 | [2017/27] | CPC: |
H04L9/0836 (EP,US);
H04L9/083 (US);
H04L9/0833 (US);
H04L9/0861 (US);
H04L9/088 (EP,US);
H04L9/16 (EP,US);
H04N21/222 (EP,US);
H04N21/2347 (EP,US);
H04N21/26613 (EP,US);
H04N21/4405 (EP,US);
H04N21/63345 (EP,US);
H04N21/835 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/36] | H04L9/32 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/36] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR SYNCHRONISIERTEN SCHLÜSSELABLEITUNG ÜBER MEHRERE BEDINGTE ZUGANGSSERVER | [2016/36] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR SYNCHRONIZED KEY DERIVATION ACROSS MULTIPLE CONDITIONAL ACCESS SERVERS | [2016/36] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ POUR UNE DÉRIVATION DE CLÉS SYNCHRONISÉES À TRAVERS DE MULTIPLES SERVEURS D'ACCÈS CONDITIONNEL | [2016/36] | Entry into regional phase | 14.04.2016 | National basic fee paid | 14.04.2016 | Search fee paid | 14.04.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.04.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.04.2016 | Examination requested [2016/36] | 02.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/31] | 24.01.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2006034453 (LIU YEN-FU [TW]) [Y] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0012] - [0017] - [0025] - [0046] *; | [A]US7392382 (WEIS BRIAN [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * abstract ** column 3, line 36 - column 5, line 6 *; | [Y]US2009052661 (FAHRNY JAMES WILLIAM [US], et al) [Y] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0008] - [0013] *; | [Y]US2011231660 (KANUNGO RAJESH [US]) [Y] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0007] - [0010] - [0 18] , [0019] , [0 25] - [0029] - [0 33] - [0036] - [0 41] - [0043] *; | [Y]EP2487828 (THOMSON LICENSING [FR]) [Y] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0010] , [0016] , [0018] , [0022] , [0023] , [0025] - [0028] - [0031] - [0040] * | International search | [Y]US2004268117 (OLIVIER STEVE [US], et al); | [Y]US2005201556 (RIJCKAERT ALBERT MARIA A [NL], et al); | [Y]US2005249350 (KAHN RAYNOLD M [US], et al); | [A]US2009052661 (FAHRNY JAMES WILLIAM [US], et al) |