EP3071040 - METHOD FOR SCALABLE SKELETAL MUSCLE LINEAGE SPECIFICATION AND CULTIVATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 25.11.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.12.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.07.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.01.2023 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: NL | published on 22.02.2023 [2023/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Curators of the University of Missouri 316 University Hall Columbia, MO 65211 / US | For all designated states Upside Foods, Inc. 804 Heinz Avenue Berkeley CA 94710 / US | [2021/35] |
Former [2020/16] | For all designated states The Curators of the University of Missouri 316 University Hall Columbia, MO 65211 / US | ||
For all designated states MEMPHIS MEATS, INC. 804 Heinz Avenue Berkeley, CA 94710 / US | |||
Former [2016/39] | For all designated states The Curators of the University of Missouri 316 University Hall Columbia, MO 65211 / US | ||
For all designated states MEMPHIS MEATS, INC. 1933 Davis St. Suite 312 San Leandro, CA 94577 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GENOVESE, Nicholas, J. c/o Memphis Meats, Inc. 804 Heinz Avenue Berkeley, CA 94710 / US | 02 /
ROBERTS, R., Michael University of Missouri 240B Bond Life Science Center Columbia, MO 65211 / US | 03 /
TELUGU, Bhanu, Prakash, V., L. c/o Memphis Meats, Inc. 804 Heinz Avenue Berkeley, CA 94710 / US | [2020/16] |
Former [2016/39] | 01 /
GENOVESE, Nicholas, J. 1517 Hayden Street Hayward, CA 94545 / US | ||
02 /
ROBERTS, R., Michael University of Missouri 240B Bond Life Science Center Columbia, MO 65211 / US | |||
03 /
TELUGU, Bhanu, Prakash, V., L. University of Maryland - College Park Dept. of Animal and Avian Sciences College Park, MD 20742 / US | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2022/52] |
Former [2016/39] | Loo, Chi Ching, et al Albright IP Limited County House Bayshill Road Cheltenham, Gloucestershire GL50 3BA / GB | Application number, filing date | 14858383.4 | 30.10.2014 | [2016/39] | WO2014US63250 | Priority number, date | US201361962068P | 30.10.2013 Original published format: US 201361962068 P | [2016/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015066377 | Date: | 07.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3071040 | Date: | 28.09.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.05.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3071040 | Date: | 01.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/01] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP3071040 | Date: | 28.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.05.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A01N63/00, A01N65/00, A61K35/35, C12N5/10, A61K35/28, C12N5/077, A23L13/00, A61K35/545 | [2017/25] | CPC: |
C12N5/0658 (EP,IL,US);
A23L13/00 (EP,IL,US);
A61K35/28 (EP,IL);
A61K35/545 (EP,IL);
C12N5/10 (EP,IL,US);
A23V2002/00 (IL,US);
C12N2501/392 (EP,IL,US);
C12N2501/40 (IL,US);
C12N2501/415 (EP,IL,US);
C12N2501/60 (EP,IL,US);
C12N2501/602 (IL,US);
C12N2501/603 (EP,IL,US);
C12N2501/604 (EP,IL,US);
C12N2501/72 (EP,IL,US);
C12N2501/727 (EP,IL,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/39] | A01N63/00, A01N65/00, A61K35/35 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/39] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR SKALIERBAREN SKELETTMUSKEL-STAMMZELLENSPEZIFIKATION UND -KULTIVIERUNG | [2016/39] | English: | METHOD FOR SCALABLE SKELETAL MUSCLE LINEAGE SPECIFICATION AND CULTIVATION | [2016/39] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DESTINÉ À SPÉCIFIER ET CULTIVER UNE LIGNÉE DE MUSCLE SQUELETTIQUE ÉVOLUTIVE | [2016/39] | Entry into regional phase | 23.05.2016 | National basic fee paid | 23.05.2016 | Search fee paid | 23.05.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.05.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.05.2016 | Examination requested [2016/39] | 18.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.09.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 10.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.11.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 22.11.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.11.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP19220227.3 Application deemed to be withdrawn : 01.07.2020 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
01.10.2020
05.10.2020
ADMISSIBLE Gleiss Große Schrell und Partner mbB Leitzstrasse 45 70469 Stuttgart / DE Opponent's representative Schrell, Andreas, et al, et al Gleiss Große Schrell und Partner mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Leitzstrasse 45 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [2020/46] | 13.10.2020 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 22.02.2021 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 16.02.2022 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 16.02.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | 01.04.2022 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 01.04.2022 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 22.08.2022 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 17.11.2022 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 10.12.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 10.12.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.12.2018 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.10.2014 | AL | 01.01.2020 | AT | 01.01.2020 | CY | 01.01.2020 | CZ | 01.01.2020 | DK | 01.01.2020 | EE | 01.01.2020 | FI | 01.01.2020 | HR | 01.01.2020 | LT | 01.01.2020 | LV | 01.01.2020 | MC | 01.01.2020 | MK | 01.01.2020 | MT | 01.01.2020 | PL | 01.01.2020 | RO | 01.01.2020 | RS | 01.01.2020 | SE | 01.01.2020 | SI | 01.01.2020 | SK | 01.01.2020 | SM | 01.01.2020 | TR | 01.01.2020 | BG | 01.04.2020 | NO | 01.04.2020 | GR | 02.04.2020 | IS | 01.05.2020 | PT | 27.05.2020 | GB | 30.10.2020 | IE | 30.10.2020 | LU | 30.10.2020 | BE | 31.10.2020 | CH | 31.10.2020 | LI | 31.10.2020 | [2023/08] |
Former [2022/34] | HU | 30.10.2014 | |
AL | 01.01.2020 | ||
AT | 01.01.2020 | ||
CY | 01.01.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2020 | ||
DK | 01.01.2020 | ||
EE | 01.01.2020 | ||
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
MC | 01.01.2020 | ||
MK | 01.01.2020 | ||
MT | 01.01.2020 | ||
PL | 01.01.2020 | ||
RO | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
SI | 01.01.2020 | ||
SK | 01.01.2020 | ||
SM | 01.01.2020 | ||
TR | 01.01.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
GB | 30.10.2020 | ||
IE | 30.10.2020 | ||
LU | 30.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
NL | 01.11.2020 | ||
Former [2022/31] | HU | 30.10.2014 | |
AL | 01.01.2020 | ||
AT | 01.01.2020 | ||
CY | 01.01.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2020 | ||
DK | 01.01.2020 | ||
EE | 01.01.2020 | ||
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
MC | 01.01.2020 | ||
MK | 01.01.2020 | ||
MT | 01.01.2020 | ||
PL | 01.01.2020 | ||
RO | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
SI | 01.01.2020 | ||
SK | 01.01.2020 | ||
SM | 01.01.2020 | ||
TR | 01.01.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
GB | 30.10.2020 | ||
IE | 30.10.2020 | ||
LU | 30.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
FR | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
NL | 01.11.2020 | ||
Former [2022/30] | HU | 30.10.2014 | |
AL | 01.01.2020 | ||
AT | 01.01.2020 | ||
CY | 01.01.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2020 | ||
DK | 01.01.2020 | ||
EE | 01.01.2020 | ||
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
MC | 01.01.2020 | ||
MT | 01.01.2020 | ||
PL | 01.01.2020 | ||
RO | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
SI | 01.01.2020 | ||
SK | 01.01.2020 | ||
SM | 01.01.2020 | ||
TR | 01.01.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
GB | 30.10.2020 | ||
IE | 30.10.2020 | ||
LU | 30.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
FR | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
NL | 01.11.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 30.10.2014 | |
AT | 01.01.2020 | ||
CY | 01.01.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2020 | ||
DK | 01.01.2020 | ||
EE | 01.01.2020 | ||
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
MC | 01.01.2020 | ||
MT | 01.01.2020 | ||
PL | 01.01.2020 | ||
RO | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
SI | 01.01.2020 | ||
SK | 01.01.2020 | ||
SM | 01.01.2020 | ||
TR | 01.01.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
GB | 30.10.2020 | ||
IE | 30.10.2020 | ||
LU | 30.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
FR | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
NL | 01.11.2020 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 01.01.2020 | |
CZ | 01.01.2020 | ||
DK | 01.01.2020 | ||
EE | 01.01.2020 | ||
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
MC | 01.01.2020 | ||
PL | 01.01.2020 | ||
RO | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
SI | 01.01.2020 | ||
SK | 01.01.2020 | ||
SM | 01.01.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
GB | 30.10.2020 | ||
IE | 30.10.2020 | ||
LU | 30.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
FR | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
NL | 01.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 01.01.2020 | |
CZ | 01.01.2020 | ||
DK | 01.01.2020 | ||
EE | 01.01.2020 | ||
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
MC | 01.01.2020 | ||
PL | 01.01.2020 | ||
RO | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
SI | 01.01.2020 | ||
SK | 01.01.2020 | ||
SM | 01.01.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
GB | 30.10.2020 | ||
IE | 30.10.2020 | ||
LU | 30.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
FR | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
NL | 01.11.2020 | ||
DE | 01.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/38] | AT | 01.01.2020 | |
CZ | 01.01.2020 | ||
DK | 01.01.2020 | ||
EE | 01.01.2020 | ||
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
MC | 01.01.2020 | ||
PL | 01.01.2020 | ||
RO | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
SI | 01.01.2020 | ||
SK | 01.01.2020 | ||
SM | 01.01.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
GB | 30.10.2020 | ||
LU | 30.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
FR | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
NL | 01.11.2020 | ||
DE | 01.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 01.01.2020 | |
CZ | 01.01.2020 | ||
DK | 01.01.2020 | ||
EE | 01.01.2020 | ||
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
MC | 01.01.2020 | ||
PL | 01.01.2020 | ||
RO | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
SI | 01.01.2020 | ||
SK | 01.01.2020 | ||
SM | 01.01.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LU | 30.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
FR | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
NL | 01.11.2020 | ||
DE | 01.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AT | 01.01.2020 | |
CZ | 01.01.2020 | ||
DK | 01.01.2020 | ||
EE | 01.01.2020 | ||
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
MC | 01.01.2020 | ||
PL | 01.01.2020 | ||
RO | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
SI | 01.01.2020 | ||
SK | 01.01.2020 | ||
SM | 01.01.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LU | 30.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
FR | 31.10.2020 | ||
NL | 01.11.2020 | ||
DE | 01.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | AT | 01.01.2020 | |
CZ | 01.01.2020 | ||
DK | 01.01.2020 | ||
EE | 01.01.2020 | ||
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
MC | 01.01.2020 | ||
PL | 01.01.2020 | ||
RO | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
SI | 01.01.2020 | ||
SK | 01.01.2020 | ||
SM | 01.01.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LU | 30.10.2020 | ||
FR | 31.10.2020 | ||
NL | 01.11.2020 | ||
DE | 01.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/34] | AT | 01.01.2020 | |
CZ | 01.01.2020 | ||
DK | 01.01.2020 | ||
EE | 01.01.2020 | ||
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
MC | 01.01.2020 | ||
PL | 01.01.2020 | ||
RO | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
SI | 01.01.2020 | ||
SK | 01.01.2020 | ||
SM | 01.01.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LU | 30.10.2020 | ||
NL | 01.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AT | 01.01.2020 | |
CZ | 01.01.2020 | ||
DK | 01.01.2020 | ||
EE | 01.01.2020 | ||
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
MC | 01.01.2020 | ||
PL | 01.01.2020 | ||
RO | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
SI | 01.01.2020 | ||
SK | 01.01.2020 | ||
SM | 01.01.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LU | 30.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/11] | AT | 01.01.2020 | |
CZ | 01.01.2020 | ||
DK | 01.01.2020 | ||
EE | 01.01.2020 | ||
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
PL | 01.01.2020 | ||
RO | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
SI | 01.01.2020 | ||
SK | 01.01.2020 | ||
SM | 01.01.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 01.01.2020 | |
DK | 01.01.2020 | ||
EE | 01.01.2020 | ||
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
RO | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
SK | 01.01.2020 | ||
SM | 01.01.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 01.01.2020 | |
DK | 01.01.2020 | ||
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
RO | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
SK | 01.01.2020 | ||
SM | 01.01.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | DK | 01.01.2020 | |
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
RO | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
SM | 01.01.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | DK | 01.01.2020 | |
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | FI | 01.01.2020 | |
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 01.01.2020 | |
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 01.01.2020 | |
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 01.01.2020 | |
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | FI | 01.01.2020 | |
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 01.01.2020 | |
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2013004466 (TREMBLAY JACQUES P [CA], et al) [X] 1,3,5,12,13,15 * the whole document * * claims 9-16 * * figures 8, 10; examples 8-10 *; | [X]WO2013073246 (UNIV KYOTO [JP], et al) [X] 1-6,13,15 * page 3, paragraph 007 * * page 35, paragraph 0087 - page 51, paragraph 0115; figure 9 * * page 12, paragraph 0028 * * the whole document *; | [T] - NICHOLAS J. GENOVESE ET AL, "Enhanced Development of Skeletal Myotubes from Porcine Induced Pluripotent Stem Cells", SCIENTIFIC REPORTS, (20170206), vol. 7, doi:10.1038/srep41833, page 41833, XP055369888 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/srep41833 | International search | [X]EP0435617 (UNIV GEORGIA RES FOUND [US]); | [Y]WO9309236 (BAYLOR COLLEGE MEDICINE [US]); | [Y]US2011191871 (WALSH KENNETH [US], et al) | Examination | - MARK J POST ED - SERDAROGLU M, "Cultured meat from stem cells: Challenges and prospects", MEAT SCIENCE, ELSEVIER SCIENCE, GB, vol. 92, no. 3, doi:10.1016/J.MEATSCI.2012.04.008, ISSN 0309-1740, (20120403), pages 297 - 301, (20120411), XP028504027 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.meatsci.2012.04.008 | Opposition | US2013004466 | WO2013073246 | - RINKEVICH, BARUCH, "Cell cultures from marine invertebrates: new insights for capturing endless sternness", Marine Biotechnology, (20110107), vol. 13, no. 3, doi:10.1007/s10126-010-9354-3, pages 345 - 354, XP019910939 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10126-010-9354-3 | - NOWAK-IMIALEK, MONIKA et al., "Pluripotent cells in farm animals: state of the art and future perspectives", Reproduction, Fertility and Development, (20120000), vol. 25, no. 1, pages 103 - 128, XP055738782 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1071/RD12265 | - BHAT, ZUHAIB FAYAZ et al., "Animal-free meat biofabrication", American Journal of Food Technology, (20110515), vol. 6, no. 6, pages 441 - 459, XP0557387824 | - GENOVESE, NICHOLAS J. et al., "Enhanced development of skeletal myotubes from porcine induced pluripotent stem cells", Scientific reports, (20170000), vol. 7, doi:10.1038/srep41833, page 41833, XP055369888 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/srep41833 | - MOLKENTIN, JEFFERY D. et al., "Cooperative activation of muscle gene expression by MEF2 and myogenic bHLH proteins", Cell, (19951229), vol. 83, no. 7, pages 1125 - 1136, XP055369889 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2337/diab.18.4.206 | - SCHNAPP, ESTHER et al., "Induced early expression of mrf4 but not myog rescues myogenesis in the myod/myf5 double-morphant zebrafish embryo", Journal of Cell Science, (20090215), vol. 122, no. 4, pages 481 - 488, XP055738790 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1242/jcs.038356 | - BLACK, BRIAN L. et al., "Transcriptional control of muscle development by myocyte enhancer factor-2 (MEF2) proteins", Annual review of cell and developmental biology, (19980000), vol. 14, no. 1, doi:10.1146/annurev.cellbio.14.1.167, pages 167 - 196, XP000981549 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1146/annurev.cellbio.14.1.167 | - CHEN, ZIRONG et al., "DNA methyltransferase inhibitor CDA-II inhibits myogenic differentiation", Biochemical and biophysical research communications, (20120600), vol. 422, no. 3, pages 522 - 526, XP055738792 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bbrc.2012.05.068 | - HUPKES, MARLINDA et al., "Epigenetics: DNA demethylation promotes skeletal myotube maturation", The FASEB Journal, (20111100), vol. 25, no. 11, pages 3861 - 3872, XP055738796 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1096/fj.11-186122 | - HUPKES, MARLINDA et al., "DNA methylation restricts spontaneous multi-lineage differentiation of mesenchymal progenitor cells, but is stable during growth factor-induced terminal differentiation", Biochimica et Biophysica Acta (BBA)-Molecular Cell Research, (20110000), vol. 1813, no. 5, doi:10.1016/j.bbamcr.2011.01.022, pages 839 - 849, XP028190500 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bbamcr.2011.01.022 | - POST, MARK J., "Cultured meat from stem cells: Challenges and prospects", Meat science, (20120000), vol. 92, no. 3, doi:10.1016/j.meatsci.2012.04.008, pages 297 - 301, XP028504027 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.meatsci.2012.04.008 | - DESBOIS-MOUTHON, CHRISTÈLE et al., "Insulin and IGF-1 stimulate the beta-catenin pathway through two signalling cascades involving GSK-3beta inhibition and Ras activation", Oncogene, (20010312), vol. 20, no. 2, pages 252 - 259, XP055738775 | - DING, VANESSA MY et al., "FGF-2 modulates Wnt signaling in undifferentiated hESC and iPS cells through activated PI3-K/GSK3beta signaling", Journal of cellular physiology, (20100000), vol. 225, no. 2, doi:10.1002/jcp.22214, pages 417 - 428, XP055023931 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jcp.22214 | - CHOI, SANG-WOON et al., "Epigenetics: a new bridge between nutrition and health", Advances in nutrition, (20100000), vol. 1, no. 1, doi:10.3945/an.110.1004, pages 8 - 16, XP055215291 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3945/an.110.1004 | - RINKEVICH, BARUCH, "Cell cultures from marine invertebrates: new insights for capturing endless sternness", Marine Biotechnology, (20110107), vol. 13, no. 3, doi:10.1007/s10126-010-9354-3, pages 345 - 354 | - NOWAK-IMIALEK, MONIKA et al., "Pluripotent cells in farm animals: state of the art and future perspectives", Reproduction, Fertility and Development, (20120000), vol. 25, no. 1, pages 103 - 128 | - BHAT, ZUHAIB FAYAZ et al., "Animal-free meat biofabrication", American Journal of Food Technology, (20110515), vol. 6, no. 6, pages 441 - 459 | - GENOVESE, NICHOLAS J. et al., "Enhanced development of skeletal myotubes from porcine induced pluripotent stem cells", Scientific reports, (20170000), vol. 7, doi:10.1038/srep41833, page 41833 | - MOLKENTIN, JEFFERY D. et al., "Cooperative activation of muscle gene expression by MEF2 and myogenic bHLH proteins", Cell, (19951229), vol. 83, no. 7, pages 1125 - 1136 | - SCHNAPP, ESTHER et al., "Induced early expression of mrf4 but not myog rescues myogenesis in the myod/myf5 double-morphant zebrafish embryo", Journal of Cell Science, (20090215), vol. 122, no. 4, pages 481 - 488 | - BLACK, BRIAN L. et al., "Transcriptional control of muscle development by myocyte enhancer factor-2 (MEF2) proteins", Annual review of cell and developmental biology, (19980000), vol. 14, no. 1, doi:10.1146/annurev.cellbio.14.1.167, pages 167 - 196 | - CHEN, ZIRONG et al., "DNA methyltransferase inhibitor CDA-II inhibits myogenic differentiation", Biochemical and biophysical research communications, (20120600), vol. 422, no. 3, pages 522 - 526 | - HUPKES, MARLINDA et al., "Epigenetics: DNA demethylation promotes skeletal myotube maturation", The FASEB Journal, (20111100), vol. 25, no. 11, pages 3861 - 3872 | - HUPKES, MARLINDA et al., "DNA methylation restricts spontaneous multi-lineage differentiation of mesenchymal progenitor cells, but is stable during growth factor-induced terminal differentiation", Biochimica et Biophysica Acta (BBA)-Molecular Cell Research, (20110000), vol. 1813, no. 5, doi:10.1016/j.bbamcr.2011.01.022, pages 839 - 849 | - POST, MARK J., "Cultured meat from stem cells: Challenges and prospects", Meat science, (20120000), vol. 92, no. 3, doi:10.1016/j.meatsci.2012.04.008, pages 297 - 301 | - DESBOIS-MOUTHON, CHRISTÈLE et al., "Insulin and IGF-1 stimulate the beta-catenin pathway through two signalling cascades involving GSK-3beta inhibition and Ras activation", Oncogene, (20010312), vol. 20, no. 2, pages 252 - 259 | - DING, VANESSA MY et al., "FGF-2 modulates Wnt signaling in undifferentiated hESC and iPS cells through activated PI3-K/GSK3beta signaling", Journal of cellular physiology, (20100000), vol. 225, no. 2, doi:10.1002/jcp.22214, pages 417 - 428 | - CHOI, SANG-WOON et al., "Epigenetics: a new bridge between nutrition and health", Advances in nutrition, (20100000), vol. 1, no. 1, doi:10.3945/an.110.1004, pages 8 - 16 | - Ezashi et al (2009) PNAS 106 27 10993-10998 | - Okita et al (2011) Nature Methods (2011), 8: 409-412 | - Carstea et al., "Germline competence of mouse ES and iPS cell lines:Chimera technologies and genetic background" World Journal of Stem Cells, 2009 | - Ogorevc et al., "Cellular reprogramming in farm animals: an overview of iPSC generation in the mammalian farm animal species" Journal of Animal Science and Biotechnology, 2016 | - Su et al., "Establishment of Bovine- Induced Pluripotent Stem Cells” International Journal of Molecular Sciences, 2021 | - Asp et al, "Genome-wide remodeling of the epigenetic landscape during myogenic differentiation" PNAS, 2011 | - Hall et al., "Temporal Repression of Endogenous Pluripotency Genes during Reprogramming of Porcine Induced Pluripotent Stem Cells " CELLULAR REPROGRAMMING, 2012 | - Vallier et al Activin/Nodal and FGF pathways cooperate to maintain pluripotency of human embryonic stem cells. J Cell Sci. 2005 Oct1:118(Pt 19):4495-509. doi:10.1242/jcs.02553. PMID: 16179608 | - Chen et al, Human pluripotent stem cell culture: considerations for maintenance, expansion, and therapeutics. Cell Stem Cell. 2014 Jan 2; 14(1): 13-26. |