EP3062819 - IONIC LIQUIDS FOR TRANSDERMAL DRUG DELIVERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.10.2022 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.11.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.06.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.08.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.03.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.11.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.10.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.05.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.04.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor Oakland, CA 94607 / US | For all designated states Triad National Security, LLC Los Alamos National Laboratory LC/TAS, P.O. Box 1663 Los Alamos, NM 87545 / US | For all designated states The Arizona Board of Regents c/o Northern Arizona University P.O. Box 4087 Flagstaff, Arizona 86011-4087 / US | [2021/51] |
Former [2019/33] | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor Oakland, CA 94607 / US | ||
For all designated states Triad National Security, LLC Los Alamos National Laboratory LC/TAS, P.O. Box 1663 Los Alamos, NM 87545 / US | |||
For all designated states The Arizona Board of Regents c/o Northern Arizona University P.O. Box 4087 Flagstaff, Arizona 86011-4087 / US | |||
Former [2019/23] | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor Oakland, CA 94607 / US | ||
For all designated states Los Alamos National Security LLC Los Alamos National Laboratory P.O.Box 1663 MS A187 Los Alamos, NM 87545 / US | |||
For all designated states The Arizona Board of Regents c/o Northern Arizona University P.O. Box 4087 Flagstaff, Arizona 86011-4087 / US | |||
Former [2016/36] | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor Oakland, CA 94607 / US | ||
For all designated states Los Alamos National Security LLC Los Alamos National Laboratory P.O.Box 1663 MS A187 Los Alamos, NM 87545 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZAKREWSKY, Michael 11292 Vista Sorrento Pkwy, Apt 210 San Diego, CA 92130 / US | 02 /
MITRAGOTRI, Samir 816 Dorado Drive Santa Barbara, California 93111 / US | 03 /
FOX, David T. 1173 Big Rock Loop Los Alamos, New Mexico 87544 / US | 04 /
KOPPISCH, Andrew 4985 Camino de los Vientos Flagstaff, Arizona 86004 / US | 05 /
DEL SESTO, Rico P.O. Box 2148 St. George, UT 84771 / US | 06 /
LOVEJOY, Katherine c/o Los Alamos National Security, LLC Los Alamos National Laboratory P.O. Box 1663 MS A187 Los Alamos, New Mexico 87545 / US | [2021/51] |
Former [2017/03] | 01 /
ZAKREWSKY, Michael 11292 Vista Sorrento Pkwy, Apt 210 San Diego, CA 92130 / US | ||
02 /
MITRAGOTRI, Samir 816 Dorado Drive Santa Barbara, California 93111 / US | |||
03 /
FOX, David T. 1173 Big Rock Loop Los Alamos, New Mexico 87544 / US | |||
04 /
KOPPISCH, Andrew 4985 Camino de los Vientos Flagstaff, Arizona 86004 / US | |||
05 /
DEL SESTO, Rico P.O.Box 2148 St. George, UT 84771 / US | |||
06 /
LOVEJOY, Katherine c/o Los Alamos National Security LLC Los Alamos National Laboratory P.O. Box 1663 MS A187 Los Alalmos, New Mexico 87545 / US | |||
Former [2016/40] | 01 /
ZAKREWSKY, Michael 11292 Vista Sorrento Pkwy, Apt 210 San Diego, CA 92130 / US | ||
02 /
MITRAGOTRI, Samir 816 Dorado Drive Santa Barbara, California 93111 / US | |||
03 /
FOX, David T. 1173 Big Rock Loop Los Alamos, New Mexico 87544 / US | |||
04 /
KOPPISCH, Andrew 4985 Camino de los Vientos Flagstaff, Arizona 86004 / US | |||
05 /
DEL SESTO, Rico 236 S 300 W Ivins, Utah 84738 / US | |||
06 /
LOVEJOY, Katherine c/o Los Alamos National Security LLC Los Alamos National Laboratory P.O. Box 1663 MS A187 Los Alalmos, New Mexico 87545 / US | |||
Former [2016/36] | 01 /
ZAKREWSKY, Michael 314 W. Mission Street Apartment F Santa Barbara, California 93101-2855 / US | ||
02 /
MITRAGOTRI, Samir 816 Dorado Drive Santa Barbara, California 93111 / US | |||
03 /
FOX, David T. 1173 Big Rock Loop Los Alamos, New Mexico 87544 / US | |||
04 /
KOPPISCH, Andrew 4985 Camino de los Vientos Flagstaff, Arizona 86004 / US | |||
05 /
DEL SESTO, Rico 236 S 300 W Ivins, Utah 84738 / US | |||
06 /
LOVEJOY, Katherine c/o Los Alamos National Security LLC Los Alamos National Laboratory P.O. Box 1663 MS A187 Los Alalmos, New Mexico 87545 / US | Representative(s) | Petty, Catrin Helen, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2021/51] |
Former [2016/36] | Cowley, Catherine Mary Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | Application number, filing date | 14859243.9 | 03.11.2014 | [2016/36] | WO2014US63745 | Priority number, date | US201361899294P | 03.11.2013 Original published format: US 201361899294 P | [2016/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2015066647 | Date: | 07.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/18] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3062819 | Date: | 07.09.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.05.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3062819 | Date: | 22.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | IL | 18.06.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/04, A61K47/12, A61K33/42, A61K9/08, A61P31/04, A61P17/00, A01N33/12, A01N43/36, A61K47/18, A61K47/24, A61K31/047, A61K31/545, A61K31/66 | [2017/26] | CPC: |
A61K47/24 (EP,KR,US);
A61K9/0014 (EP,KR,US);
A01N25/02 (KR);
A01N33/12 (EP,KR,US);
A01N43/36 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/047 (US);
A61K31/545 (US);
A61K31/66 (US);
A61K47/12 (EP,KR,US);
A61K9/08 (KR);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P17/10 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/10 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A01N33/12, A01N37/02, A01N37/04, A01N37/06, A01N41/06, A01N47/28, A01N49/00 (US,EP);
A01N43/36, A01N41/06 (EP,US) |
Former IPC [2016/36] | A61K47/04, A61K47/12, A61K33/42, A61K9/08, A61P31/04, A61P17/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | IONISCHE FLÜSSIGKEITEN ZUR TRANSDERMALEN ARZNEIMITTELVERABREICHUNG | [2016/36] | English: | IONIC LIQUIDS FOR TRANSDERMAL DRUG DELIVERY | [2016/36] | French: | LIQUIDES IONIQUES POUR ADMINISTRATION TRANSDERMIQUE DE MÉDICAMENTS | [2016/36] | Entry into regional phase | 18.05.2016 | National basic fee paid | 18.05.2016 | Search fee paid | 18.05.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.05.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.05.2016 | Examination requested [2016/36] | 26.03.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.12.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.04.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 05.06.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 21.11.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.03.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 02.04.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.08.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 27.05.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 07.06.2021 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 18.06.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.10.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 27.10.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.10.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 23.09.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2017 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   23.05.2018 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.11.2014 | AL | 22.12.2021 | AT | 22.12.2021 | CY | 22.12.2021 | CZ | 22.12.2021 | DK | 22.12.2021 | EE | 22.12.2021 | FI | 22.12.2021 | HR | 22.12.2021 | LT | 22.12.2021 | LV | 22.12.2021 | MC | 22.12.2021 | MK | 22.12.2021 | NL | 22.12.2021 | PL | 22.12.2021 | RO | 22.12.2021 | RS | 22.12.2021 | SE | 22.12.2021 | SI | 22.12.2021 | SK | 22.12.2021 | SM | 22.12.2021 | TR | 22.12.2021 | BG | 22.03.2022 | NO | 22.03.2022 | GR | 23.03.2022 | IS | 22.04.2022 | PT | 22.04.2022 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/27] | HU | 03.11.2014 | |
AL | 22.12.2021 | ||
AT | 22.12.2021 | ||
CY | 22.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
DK | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
MC | 22.12.2021 | ||
MK | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SI | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 03.11.2014 | |
AL | 22.12.2021 | ||
AT | 22.12.2021 | ||
CY | 22.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
DK | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
MC | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SI | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 03.11.2014 | |
AL | 22.12.2021 | ||
AT | 22.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
DK | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
MC | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SI | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 22.12.2021 | |
AT | 22.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
DK | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
MC | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SI | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 22.12.2021 | |
AT | 22.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
DK | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SI | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 22.12.2021 | |
AT | 22.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
DK | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AT | 22.12.2021 | |
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
DK | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | AT | 22.12.2021 | |
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 22.12.2021 | |
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | CZ | 22.12.2021 | |
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | EE | 22.12.2021 | |
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | FI | 22.12.2021 | |
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/30] | FI | 22.12.2021 | |
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | FI | 22.12.2021 | |
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | FI | 22.12.2021 | |
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | FI | 22.12.2021 | |
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | RS | 22.12.2021 | |
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 22.03.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]US2010256174 (YAMAGUCHI TOSHIKAZU [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,8,12 * paragraph [0001] * * example - * * claim - * * tables 24, 25, 27, 35 * [A] 5-7 [Y] 9-11,13-15; | [YA] - DOROTA DOBLER ET AL, "Ionic liquids as ingredients in topical drug delivery systems", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20130101), vol. 441, no. 1-2, doi:10.1016/j.ijpharm.2012.10.035, ISSN 0378-5173, pages 620 - 627, XP055260389 [Y] 9-11,13-15 * the whole document * * abstract * * page 621, paragraph 2.1 * * page 626, paragraph 3.4 - paragraph 3.5 * [A] 5-7 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ijpharm.2012.10.035 | International search | [X]WO2008031105 (DELAVAL HOLDINGS AB [SE], et al); | [X]JP2008184402 (MEDOREKKUSU KK); | [Y]WO2011056545 (UNIV BOSTON [US], et al); | [Y] - DOBLER D ET AL., "Ionic liquids as ingredients in topical drug delivery systems", INT J PHARM., (20130130), vol. 441, no. 1-2, pages 620 - 7., XP055260389 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ijpharm.2012.10.035 | by applicant | - XU et al., "Ionic Liquids: Ion Mobilities, Glass Temperatures, and Fragilities", Journal of Physical Chemistry B, (20030000), vol. 107, no. 25, pages 6170 - 6178 |