EP3066537 - LIMITING CURRENT IN A LOW DROPOUT LINEAR VOLTAGE REGULATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.10.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.12.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.12.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.07.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.05.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Texas Instruments Incorporated P.O. Box 655474 Mail Station 3999 Dallas, TX 75265-5474 / US | [2016/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JAIN, Karan Singh 6041 Village Bend Drive Apt. 707 Dallas, TX 75206 / US | 02 /
MERKIN, Timothy Bryan 1510 Banbury Court Richardson, TX 75082 / US | 03 /
CURTIS, Susan 1225 Pinkerton Lane Allen, TX 75002 / US | [2016/37] | Representative(s) | Zeller, Andreas, et al Texas Instruments Deutschland GmbH Haggertystraße 1 85356 Freising / DE | [2016/37] | Application number, filing date | 14859592.9 | 30.09.2014 | [2016/37] | WO2014US58170 | Priority number, date | US201361901851P | 08.11.2013 Original published format: US 201361901851 P | US201414446563 | 30.07.2014 Original published format: US201414446563 | [2016/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015069388 | Date: | 14.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3066537 | Date: | 14.09.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3066537 | Date: | 03.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 14.05.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G05F1/575, G05F1/10, G05F1/56 | [2017/25] | CPC: |
G05F1/575 (EP,US);
G05F1/10 (EP,US);
G05F1/56 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2016/37] | G05F1/575 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STROMBEGRENZUNG BEI EINEM LINEARER SPANNUNGSREGLER MIT NIEDRIGEM SPANNUNGSVERLUST | [2016/37] | English: | LIMITING CURRENT IN A LOW DROPOUT LINEAR VOLTAGE REGULATOR | [2016/37] | French: | LIMITATION DE COURANT DANS UN RÉGULATEUR DE TENSION LINÉAIRE À FAIBLE RELÂCHEMENT | [2016/37] | Entry into regional phase | 08.06.2016 | National basic fee paid | 08.06.2016 | Search fee paid | 08.06.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.06.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.06.2016 | Examination requested [2016/37] | 09.10.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.06.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.10.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.01.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2023 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 16.10.2023 | 16.10.2023 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 30.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 26.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]US2007194768 (BANSAL NITIN [IN], et al) [I] 1,8 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0037] * [A] 2-7,9-15; | [A]US2013293986 (LERNER VALENTIN [IL], et al) [A] 1-15* abstract * | International search | [Y]US2009001953 (HUANG WEI-JEN [TW]); | [Y]US2012112717 (LIU JING-MENG [US], et al); | [Y]US2013049722 (HUANG JUNWEI [CN]) | Examination | US2003193320 | by applicant | US2007194768 |