EP3066033 - SYSTEM FOR MANAGING FLUID CONTAINER CONTENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.06.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.07.2019 [2019/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thermos Limited Liability Company 475 N. Martingale Road Suite 1100 Schaumburg, IL 60173 / US | [2016/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DIAS, Rick 510 Mason Lane Lake in the Hills, Illinois 60156 / US | 02 /
LANE, Marvin 688 Cherrywood Drvie Wheeling, Illinois 60090 / US | 03 /
YOUNG, Shawn 1001 Estancia Lane Algonquin, Illinois 60102 / US | 04 /
TETREAULT, Michael Dennis 189 Firetown Road Simsbury, Connecticut 06070 / US | 05 /
MURRAY, Michael 144 Boulder Crest Lane Vernon, Connecticut 06066 / US | 06 /
PIEPER, Gary Victor 47 Bayberry Drive Wallingford, Connecticut 06492 / US | 07 /
FERGUSON, Eric Lee 19 Neal Drive Simsbury, Connecticut 06070 / US | [2016/44] |
Former [2016/37] | 01 /
DIAS, Rick 510 Mason Lane Lake in the Hills, Illinois 60156 / US | ||
02 /
LANE, Marvin 688 Cherrywood Drvie Wheeling, Illinois 60090 / US | |||
03 /
YOUNG, Shawn 1001 Estancia Lane Algonquin, Illinois 60102 / US | |||
04 /
TETREAULT, Michael Dennis 189 Firetown Road Simsbury, Connecticut 06070 / US | |||
05 /
MURRAY, Michael 63 Village Lane 627 Wethersfield, Connecticut 06109 / US | |||
06 /
PIEPER, Gary Victor 47 Bayberry Drive Wallingford, Connecticut 06492 / US | |||
07 /
FERGUSON, Eric Lee 19 Neal Drive Simsbury, Connecticut 06070 / US | Representative(s) | Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/37] | Lawrence, John Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 14860224.6 | 06.11.2014 | [2016/37] | WO2014US64374 | Priority number, date | US201361901133P | 07.11.2013 Original published format: US 201361901133 P | US201461974230P | 02.04.2014 Original published format: US 201461974230 P | US201462003409P | 27.05.2014 Original published format: US 201462003409 P | [2016/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015069916 | Date: | 14.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3066033 | Date: | 14.09.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.05.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B65D85/72, B65D51/24, A47J41/00, A47G19/12, A47G19/22 | [2017/35] | CPC: |
A47G19/2227 (EP);
A47G19/12 (EP);
A47J41/0094 (EP);
B65D51/245 (EP);
A47G2019/2238 (EP);
A47G2019/2244 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2016/37] | B65D85/72 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/37] | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR VERWALTUNG DES INHALTS VON FLÜSSIGKEITSBEHÄLTERN | [2016/37] | English: | SYSTEM FOR MANAGING FLUID CONTAINER CONTENTS | [2016/37] | French: | SYSTÈME POUR GÉRER LE CONTENU D'UN RÉCIPIENT CONTENANT UN FLUIDE | [2016/37] | Entry into regional phase | 09.05.2016 | National basic fee paid | 09.05.2016 | Search fee paid | 09.05.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.05.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.05.2016 | Examination requested [2016/37] | 27.02.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.01.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/28] | 28.02.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2013115343 (REYHANLOO SHAHRYAR [CH]) [X] 2,4-6,8,10,14,15 * paragraph [0073] - paragraph [0105]; figure - * | International search | [X]US2012293332 (ROSENFELD ABRAHAM [US]); | [Y]US2011108570 (JARISCH CHRISTIAN [CH], et al); | [Y]US2012187075 (EL-SADEN SAMI [US], et al); | [A]US7798373 (WROBLEWSKI LESZEK M [US], et al); | [A]US2009139324 (MORIMOTO HIDEKI [JP], et al); | [A]US2008296191 (RANSCH PASCAL [FR]); | [A]US2007181585 (LANE MARVIN [US]) | by applicant | US2013115343 |