EP3065577 - PROTECTIVE HELMETS WITH NON-LINEARLY DEFORMING ELEMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.06.2021 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.09.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.06.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.07.2021 [2021/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University of Washington through its Center for Commercialization 4311 11th Avenue NE Suite 500 Seattle, WA 98105-4608 / US | [2016/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BROWD, Samuel, R. 7513 55th Place NE Seattle, WA 98115 / US | 02 /
POSNER, Jonathan 4311 11th Avenue NE Suite 500 Seattle, WA 98105-4608 / US | 03 /
REINHALL, Per, G. 4311 11th Avenue NE Suite 500 Seattle, WA 98105-4608 / US | 04 /
MARVER, David, L. 4311 11th Avenue NE Suite 500 Seattle, WA 98105-4608 / US | 05 /
DARDIS II, John T. 3121 Franklin Avenue East No.23 Seattle, Washington 98102 / US | [2016/37] | Representative(s) | Ahmad, Sheikh Shakeel, et al Keltie LLP No.1 London Bridge London SE1 9BA / GB | [2016/37] | Application number, filing date | 14861065.2 | 05.11.2014 | [2016/37] | WO2014US64173 | Priority number, date | US201361900212P | 05.11.2013 Original published format: US 201361900212 P | US201461923495P | 03.01.2014 Original published format: US 201461923495 P | US201462049161P | 11.09.2014 Original published format: US 201462049161 P | US201462049207P | 11.09.2014 Original published format: US 201462049207 P | US201462049049P | 11.09.2014 Original published format: US 201462049049 P | US201462049190P | 11.09.2014 Original published format: US 201462049190 P | [2016/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2015069800 | Date: | 14.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/19] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3065577 | Date: | 14.09.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.11.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A24B3/00, A42B3/06, A42B3/12 | [2017/41] | CPC: |
A42B3/064 (EP,US);
A42B3/14 (US);
A42B3/046 (US);
A42B3/065 (EP,US);
A42B3/121 (US);
A42B3/125 (US);
A42B3/30 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/37] | A24B3/00, A42B3/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/37] | Title | German: | SCHUTZHELME MIT NICHTLINEAR VERFORMENDEN ELEMENTEN | [2016/37] | English: | PROTECTIVE HELMETS WITH NON-LINEARLY DEFORMING ELEMENTS | [2016/37] | French: | CASQUES PROTECTEURS POURVUS D'ÉLÉMENTS À DÉFORMATION NON LINÉAIRE | [2016/37] | Entry into regional phase | 02.06.2016 | National basic fee paid | 02.06.2016 | Search fee paid | 02.06.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.06.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.06.2016 | Examination requested [2016/37] | 09.04.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.01.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/27] | 16.02.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2021/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2020 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1578351 (DU PONT CANADA) [X] 1-3,5,7,13 * page 1, line 18 - line 27 * * page 1, line 36 - line 47 * * page 2, line 60 - page 3, line 2 * * page 3, line 28 - line 35 * * figures 1,2,3 *; | [X]US5956777 (POPOVICH DARKO D [US]) [X] 1-3,5,8-13 * column 4, line 30 - line 63 ** figures 1,3,4,5,6 *; | [Y]US2011143080 (ORTIZ CHRISTINE [US], et al) [Y] 6 * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0031] * * figure 3 *; | [XY]US2013185837 (PHIPPS EMERSON SPALDING [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7,8,10,12-15 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0057] * * figures 1,2,3 * [Y] 6 | International search | [Y]US4307471 (LOVELL PETER J) [Y] 31 * ; figure 7; column 3, lines 50-55 *; | [Y]US5956777 (POPOVICH DARKO D [US]) [Y] 17-19, 21-23, 27 * ; figures 3, 6-7; column 3, lines 10-35 *; | [A]US2012096631 (KING ALBERT I [US], et al) [A] 1-36* ; entire document *; | [Y]US2012306120 (LI GUOQIANG [US], et al) [Y] 7 * ; paragraph [0078] *; | [A]US2013000015 (MARZEC JAMES [US], et al) [A] 1-36 * ; entire document *; | [XY]US2013185837 (PHIPPS EMERSON SPALDING [US], et al) [X] 1-6, 8-16, 24-26, 28-30, 33-36 * ; figures 1, 3; paragraphs [0031], [0037] * [Y] 7, 17-19, 21-23, 31 | by applicant | US2013185837 |