EP3000166 - DRIVING CIRCUIT, LIGHTING DEVICE AND METHOD OF REDUCING POWER DISSIPATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.02.2017 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.03.2017 [2017/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Abbeydorney Holdings Ltd. Floor 4, Willow House Cricket Square P.O. Box 2804 Grand Cayman, KY1-1112 / KY | [2016/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHU, Hezhang Room 2105 Xingji Building Shangxing Road Shajing Town Bao'an District Shenzhen Guangdong 518104 / CN | [2016/14] |
Former [2016/13] | 01 /
CHU, Hezhang Room 2105 Xingji Building, Shangxing Road, ShanJing Town Bao'an District Shenzhen City, Guangdong 518104 / CN | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/13] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 14861187.4 | 19.08.2014 | [2016/13] | WO2014CN84741 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016026090 | Date: | 25.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3000166 | Date: | 30.03.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.02.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 25.02.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H02M3/325, H05B37/02, H02M1/36, H02M1/00, H02M1/32, H02M3/335, H02M3/337, H02M7/48, H05B33/08 | [2016/40] | CPC: |
H02M3/33592 (EP,US);
H02M1/4208 (US);
H02M3/33507 (US);
H02M3/3376 (EP,US);
H05B45/18 (EP,US);
H05B45/38 (EP,US);
H05B45/382 (EP,US);
H05B45/39 (EP,US);
H02M1/0006 (EP,US);
H02M1/0058 (EP,US);
H02M1/32 (EP,US);
H02M1/36 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/14] | H02M3/325, H05B37/02 | ||
Former IPC [2016/13] | H02M3/325 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TREIBERSCHALTUNG, BELEUCHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR REDUZIERUNG DER VERLUSTLEISTUNG | [2016/13] | English: | DRIVING CIRCUIT, LIGHTING DEVICE AND METHOD OF REDUCING POWER DISSIPATION | [2016/13] | French: | CIRCUIT D'ATTAQUE, DISPOSITIF D'ÉCLAIRAGE ET PROCÉDÉ DE RÉDUCTION DE LA DISSIPATION D'ÉNERGIE | [2016/13] | Entry into regional phase | 21.05.2015 | National basic fee paid | 21.05.2015 | Search fee paid | 21.05.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.05.2015 | Examination requested [2016/13] | 25.08.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/10] | 10.10.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [2017/10] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2016 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2011261592 (SAMEJIMA KEISUKE [JP], et al) [Y] 1-6 * abstract * * figure 1 * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0044] *; | [Y]US2011096578 (FANG SHAOHUA [CN], et al) [Y] 1-6 * abstract * * figures 4-8 * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0063] *; | [A]US2010110739 (NISHIKAWA YUKIHIRO [JP]) [A] 3 * figure 1 *; | [A]CN102868293 (UNIV CHANGZHOU) [A] 1 * figure 2 *; | [Y]CN103813589 (UNIV SOUTHEAST) [Y] 5,6 * figure 2 * | International search | [X]US2011261592 (SAMEJIMA KEISUKE [JP], et al) [X] 1-6, 12-23, 29-34 * description, paragraphs [0023]-[0058], [0069], figures 1 and 2 *; | [X]CN201278600Y (FUGANG ELECTRONICS DONGGUAN CO [CN]) [X] 35-37 * the abstract, description, page 4, line 10 - page 5, line 1, and figure 1 *; | [X]US2010020578 (RYU BYOUNG WOO [KR], et al) [X] 1-4, 6, 12-21, 23, 29-32 * description, paragraphs [0028]-[0039], figures 2 and 3 *; | [X]CN102067736 (PANASONIC ELEC WORKS CO LTD) [X] 1-5, 12-22, 29-33 * description, paragraphs [0049]-[0056], [0082]-[0090], [0099]-[0110], and figures 4, 5, 7. 10 *; | [X]CN103797897 (OSRAM SYLVANIA INC) [X] 12-20, 29-31 * description, paragraphs [0023]-[0037], and figures 1-5, 6A, 6B *; | [X]CN103051195 (QINGDAO HISENSE ELECTRIC CO) [X] 1-3, 12-20, 29-31 * description, paragraphs [0026]-[0037], and figures 2-4 *; | [X]CN102243850 (QINGDAO HISENSE ELECTRIC CO) [X] 12-20, 29-31 * description, paragraphs [0058]-[0100], and figure 2 *; | [X]CN102097060 (FUJIAN JIELIAN ELECTRONICS CO) [X] 12-20, 29-31 * description, paragraphs [0021]-[0022], [0033], figures 1 and 2 *; | [X]CN103813589 (UNIV SOUTHEAST) [X] 1-3, 12-20, 29-31 * description, paragraphs [0030]-[0032], [0051], figures 1 and 2 *; | [A]US2011181205 (CHUNG IL HWI [KR]) [A] 1-34 * the whole document *; | [A]CN101340760 (NEC LCD TECHNOLOGIES LTD [JP]) [A] 35-37 * the whole document * |