EP3069443 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR BRUSHLESS ELECTRICAL MACHINE CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.07.2020 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brooks Automation US, LLC 15 Elizabeth Drive Chelmsford, MA 01824 / US | [2022/22] |
Former [2022/21] | For all designated states Brooks Automation Holding, LLC 15 Elisabeth Drive Chelmsford, MA 01824 / US | ||
Former [2016/38] | For all designated states Brooks Automation, Inc. 15 Elizabeth Drive Chelmsford, MA 01824 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOURA, Jairo T. 93 Brigham Street Marlboro, MA 01752 / US | 02 /
SPIKER, Nathan 110 O Street 2 Boston, MA 02127 / US | 03 /
GAWLIK, Aaron 17 Francis Wyman Road Burlington, MA 01803 / US | 04 /
KRISHNASAMY, Jayaraman 5 Jennifer Circle Billerica, MA 01821 / US | [2016/38] | Representative(s) | Ipside 7-9 Allée Haussmann 33300 Bordeaux Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/38] | Ipside 7-9 Allées Haussmann 33300 Bordeaux Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 14862821.7 | 13.11.2014 | [2016/38] | WO2014US65422 | Priority number, date | US201361903745P | 13.11.2013 Original published format: US 201361903745 P | [2016/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015073651 | Date: | 21.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3069443 | Date: | 21.09.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.05.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 21.05.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H02P25/08, H02P6/08, G01L3/22, G01R31/34, H02P23/00, H02P23/12, H02P25/098, H02P6/10 | [2018/01] | CPC: |
H02P6/10 (EP);
G01R31/34 (US);
G01L3/22 (US);
H02P23/0031 (EP);
H02P23/12 (EP);
H02P25/098 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2016/38] | H02P25/08, H02P6/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/38] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR STEUERUNG EINES BÜRSTENLOSEN ELEKTROMOTORS | [2016/38] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR BRUSHLESS ELECTRICAL MACHINE CONTROL | [2016/38] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE COMMANDE DE MACHINE ÉLECTRIQUE SANS BALAI | [2016/38] | Entry into regional phase | 03.06.2016 | National basic fee paid | 03.06.2016 | Search fee paid | 03.06.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.06.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.06.2016 | Examination requested [2016/38] | 25.06.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.08.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4670696 (BYRNE JOHN V [IE], et al) [A] 1-13* column 23, line 28 - column 24, line 23; figure 12 *; | [A]US4868477 (ANDERSON FRANK J [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * column 3, line 35 - column 5, line 25; figures 4,5 *; | [Y]US5621294 (BESSETTE STEVEN C [US], et al) [Y] 1-3,5-13 * column 2, line 16 - line 23 * * column 3, line 34 - line 57; figures 2,6C * * column 6, line 33 - line 35 * * column 5, line 8 - line 16 *; | [Y]US2005011288 (FLAMMER HERMANN [DE], et al) [Y] 1-13 * paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0052]; figure 1 *; | [Y]US7071659 (TORREY DAVID A [US], et al) [Y] 4 * column 4, line 21 - line 53; figures 2-6 * | International search | [A]US5140243 (LYONS JAMES P [US], et al); | [A]US6242874 (KALPATHI RAMANI R [US], et al); | [A]WO03021761 (DELPHI TECH INC [US]); | [A]KR20050002151 (NAT UNIV CHONNAM); | [A]JP2009142101 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) | by applicant | US4670696 | US4868477 | US5621294 | US6002840 | US2005011288 | US7071659 | US7904182 | WO2013033289 | US20050178615 | US20070442511 | WO2012US52977 |