Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9737079 | Global Dossier | 22.08.2017 | B2 | US2015230480 | 20.08.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201420035814 | 20.01.2014 | WO2014CN73397 | 13.03.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2921092 | Global Dossier | 11.03.2020 | B1 | EP2921092 | 20.07.2016 | A4 | EP2921092 | 23.09.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201420035814 | 20.01.2014 | WO2014CN73397 | 13.03.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR212015019410U | 24.11.2015 | U2 | Priority number | Date | CN201420035814 | 20.01.2014 | WO2014CN73397 | 13.03.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2015106485 | Global Dossier | 23.07.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201420035814 | 20.01.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN203693407U | 09.07.2014 | U | Priority number | Date | CN201420035814 | 20.01.2014 |