EP3073159 - SLIDING COMPONENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.06.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.07.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, MK | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eagle Industry Co., Ltd. 1-12-15 Shiba-Daimon Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8587 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2016/39] | For all designated states Eagle Industry Co., Ltd. 1-12-15 Shiba-Daimon Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8587 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ITADANI Masatoshi c/o Eagle Industry Co. Ltd. 1-12-15 Shiba-Daimon Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8587 / JP | 02 /
SUNAGAWA Kazumasa c/o Eagle Industry Co. Ltd. 1-12-15 Shiba-Daimon Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8587 / JP | 03 /
TOKUNAGA Yuuichiro c/o Eagle Industry Co. Ltd. 1-12-15 Shiba-Daimon Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8587 / JP | 04 /
YAMAKAWA Ryoma c/o Eagle Industry Co. Ltd. 1-12-15 Shiba-Daimon Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8587 / JP | [2016/39] | Representative(s) | WSL Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Kaiser-Friedrich-Ring 98 65185 Wiesbaden / DE | [2016/39] | Application number, filing date | 14863659.0 | 20.11.2014 | [2016/39] | WO2014JP80715 | Priority number, date | JP20130242187 | 22.11.2013 Original published format: JP 2013242187 | [2016/39] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015076319 | Date: | 28.05.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3073159 | Date: | 28.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3073159 | Date: | 08.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.05.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F16J15/34 | [2016/39] | CPC: |
F16J15/3412 (EP,US);
F16J15/342 (US);
F04D29/10 (US);
F16J15/3452 (US);
F05D2240/55 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GLEITKOMPONENTE | [2016/39] | English: | SLIDING COMPONENT | [2016/39] | French: | ÉLÉMENT DE COULISSEMENT | [2016/39] | Entry into regional phase | 29.04.2016 | Translation filed | 29.04.2016 | National basic fee paid | 29.04.2016 | Search fee paid | 29.04.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.04.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.04.2016 | Examination requested [2016/39] | 13.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.06.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 02.07.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 02.07.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.05.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.11.2014 | AL | 08.08.2018 | AT | 08.08.2018 | CY | 08.08.2018 | CZ | 08.08.2018 | DK | 08.08.2018 | EE | 08.08.2018 | ES | 08.08.2018 | FI | 08.08.2018 | HR | 08.08.2018 | LT | 08.08.2018 | LV | 08.08.2018 | MC | 08.08.2018 | MK | 08.08.2018 | PL | 08.08.2018 | PT | 08.08.2018 | RO | 08.08.2018 | RS | 08.08.2018 | SE | 08.08.2018 | SI | 08.08.2018 | SK | 08.08.2018 | SM | 08.08.2018 | TR | 08.08.2018 | BG | 08.11.2018 | NO | 08.11.2018 | GR | 09.11.2018 | IE | 20.11.2018 | LU | 20.11.2018 | MT | 20.11.2018 | BE | 30.11.2018 | CH | 30.11.2018 | LI | 30.11.2018 | IS | 08.12.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/28] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PT | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
TR | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IE | 20.11.2018 | ||
LU | 20.11.2018 | ||
MT | 20.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
TR | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IE | 20.11.2018 | ||
LU | 20.11.2018 | ||
MT | 20.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IE | 20.11.2018 | ||
LU | 20.11.2018 | ||
MT | 20.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IE | 20.11.2018 | ||
LU | 20.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IE | 20.11.2018 | ||
LU | 20.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
LU | 20.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
LU | 20.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
LU | 20.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 08.08.2018 | |
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 08.08.2018 | |
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 08.08.2018 | |
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 08.08.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1221865 (EHRHARD MAYER DR ING) [A] 1,2* column 3, line 45 - column 4, paragraph 10; figure 1 * | International search | [A]JPS57146955 (KAGUCHI SHINSAKU); | [A]JPS6449771 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [A]JPH01133572U (EAGLE KOGYO CO., LTD.); | [A]JPH0417570U (CHUBU ELECTRIC POWER CO., INC.); | [A]JPH04101077U (MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD.); | [A]JPH0735242 (NIPPON PILLAR PACKING); | [A]US6446976 (KEY WILLIAM E [US], et al) | by applicant | JPH07180772 | JPH07224948 | US5498007 |