EP3073553 - POSITIVE ELECTRODE FOR LITHIUM AIR BATTERY AND LITHIUM AIR BATTERY COMPRISING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 01.06.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 04.07.2018 [2018/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IUCF-HYU (Industry-University Cooperation Foundation Hanyang University) Hanyang University 222 Wangsimni-ro Seongdong-gu Seoul 133-791 / KR | [2016/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUN, Yang-Kook 23-1308 Eunma Apt. 212 Samseong-ro Gangnam-gu Seoul 135-280 / KR | 02 /
PARK, Jin Bum 142-62 Gwangnaru-ro Seongdong-gu Seoul 133-110 / KR | [2016/39] | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2016/39] | Application number, filing date | 14863763.0 | 19.11.2014 | [2016/39] | WO2014KR11148 | Priority number, date | KR20130140365 | 19.11.2013 Original published format: KR 20130140365 | [2016/39] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015076569 | Date: | 28.05.2015 | Language: | KO | [2015/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3073553 | Date: | 28.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 28.05.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/02, H01M4/133, H01M12/06, H01M4/86, H01M2/16, H01M4/134, H01M4/38, H01M10/0525, H01M4/88, H01M10/0568, H01M10/0569, H01M4/90, H01M4/92, H01M8/02, H01M12/08 | [2017/20] | CPC: |
H01M4/86 (EP,US);
H01M4/02 (KR);
H01M4/9041 (US);
H01M10/0525 (US);
H01M10/0568 (US);
H01M10/0569 (US);
H01M12/06 (KR);
H01M12/08 (EP,US);
H01M4/133 (KR);
H01M4/134 (US);
H01M4/382 (US);
H01M4/8605 (US);
H01M4/8807 (US);
H01M4/926 (EP,US);
H01M50/44 (US);
H01M8/02 (US);
H01M2004/027 (US);
H01M2004/8689 (US);
|
Former IPC [2016/39] | H01M4/02, H01M4/133, H01M12/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/39] | Title | German: | POSITIVELEKTRODE FÜR EINE LITHIUM-LUFT-BATTERIE UND LITHIUM-LUFT-BATTERIE DAMIT | [2016/39] | English: | POSITIVE ELECTRODE FOR LITHIUM AIR BATTERY AND LITHIUM AIR BATTERY COMPRISING SAME | [2016/39] | French: | ÉLECTRODE POSITIVE POUR BATTERIE LITHIUM-AIR, ET BATTERIE LITHIUM-AIR COMPRENANT CETTE DERNIÈRE | [2016/39] | Entry into regional phase | 17.06.2016 | Translation filed | 17.06.2016 | National basic fee paid | 17.06.2016 | Search fee paid | 17.06.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.06.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.06.2016 | Examination requested [2016/39] | 10.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.05.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2016 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   20.03.2017 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP2495803 (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 1-6 * paragraphs [0023] , [0026] , [0038] , [0041] - [0042] - [0059] , [0061] , [0063] * * paragraphs [0065] , [0069] , [0080]; figure 1A *; | [X]WO2012169548 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP], et al) [X] 1-6 * page 2, line 34 - line 36 * * page 15, line 27 - page 16, line 2 * * page 30, line 14 - line 20 * * page 38, line 1 - line 9 * * page 41, line 31 - line 32 * * page 41, line 14 - line 17 * * page 42, line 19 - line 20 * * page 43, line 11 - line 22 * * page 44, line 1 - line 16 * * page 45, line 1 - line 3 * * page 45, line 30 - line 42; figures 1,2 *; | [XI]WO2013084591 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [X] 1-3,5,6 * page 2, line 16 - line 19 * * page 3, line 1 - line 17 * * page 3, line 23 - line 30 * * page 4, line 7 - line 8 * * page 5, line 3 - line 7; claim 7 * * page 8, line 5 - line 8; figure 1A *[I] 4 | International search | [A]KR20080033229 (BASF FUEL CELL GMBH [DE]); | [A]KR20110056803 (UNIV KOREA RES & BUS FOUND [KR]); | [A]KR20120048245 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [A]KR20130001170 (IUCF HYU [KR]); | [A]KR20130103333 (LIOX POWER INC [US]) |