EP3071561 - AUTOTAXIN INHIBITOR COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.02.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.02.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.10.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.08.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.06.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.02.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.03.2022 [2022/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sabre Therapeutics LLC 442 Littlefield Avenue South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | [2019/52] |
Former [2017/13] | For all designated states Pharmakea, Inc. 3030 Bunker Hill Street Suite 300 San Diego, California 92109 / US | ||
Former [2016/39] | For all designated states Pharmakea Inc. 12780 El Camino Real Suite 200 San Diego, CA 92130 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUTCHINSON, John, Howard 1262 Upas Street San Diego, CA 92103 / US | 02 /
LONERGAN, David 1512 Black Walnut Drive San Marcos, CA 92078 / US | [2016/39] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2021/12] |
Former [2016/39] | Campabadal i Monfà, Gemma Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati LLP Rue Montoyer 47 1000 Bruxelles / BE | Application number, filing date | 14864293.7 | 20.11.2014 | [2016/39] | WO2014US66706 | Priority number, date | US201361907965P | 22.11.2013 Original published format: US 201361907965 P | US201462038121P | 15.08.2014 Original published format: US 201462038121 P | [2016/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015077503 | Date: | 28.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3071561 | Date: | 28.09.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.05.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3071561 | Date: | 24.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 28.05.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C07D403/04, C07D403/14, A61K31/404, A61K31/4178, A61P11/00 | [2016/39] | CPC: |
A61K31/4155 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07D401/14 (EP,IL,US);
C07D403/04 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/4439 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K9/0014 (IL,US);
A61K9/0019 (IL,US);
A61K9/0053 (IL,US);
A61K9/06 (IL,US);
A61K9/08 (IL,US);
A61K9/20 (IL,US);
A61K9/48 (IL,US);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP,KR);
A61P43/00 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/39] | Extension states | BA | 22.06.2016 | ME | 22.06.2016 | Title | German: | AUTOTAXIN-INHIBITORVERBINDUNGEN | [2016/39] | English: | AUTOTAXIN INHIBITOR COMPOUNDS | [2016/39] | French: | COMPOSÉS INHIBITEURS DE L'AUTOTAXINE | [2016/39] | Entry into regional phase | 22.06.2016 | National basic fee paid | 22.06.2016 | Search fee paid | 22.06.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.06.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.06.2016 | Examination requested [2016/39] | 09.10.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.08.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 06.10.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.02.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 09.02.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.02.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP21156420.8 / EP3878848 | Opposition(s) | 04.01.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2010112116 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE], et al); | [A]WO2011116867 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE], et al); | [X]WO2012024620 (AMIRA PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al); | [X]WO2012166415 (AMIRA PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al); | [A]US2013023556 (SCHULTZ MELANIE [DE], et al) | by applicant | WO2012024620 | WO2012166415 |