Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101693221B | Global Dossier | 05.01.2017 | B1 | KR20150071009 | 25.06.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20140015569 | 11.02.2014 | WO2014KR11290 | 21.11.2014 | KR20130142968 | 22.11.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6339199B | Global Dossier | 06.06.2018 | B2 | JP2017500697 | 05.01.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20140015569 | 11.02.2014 | WO2014KR11290 | 21.11.2014 | KR20130142968 | 22.11.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105745491 | Global Dossier | 06.07.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20140015569 | 11.02.2014 | WO2014KR11290 | 21.11.2014 | KR20130142968 | 22.11.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2931358 | Global Dossier | 02.10.2018 | C | CA2931358 | 28.05.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20140015569 | 11.02.2014 | WO2014KR11290 | 21.11.2014 | KR20130142968 | 22.11.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2014353710B | Global Dossier | 01.12.2016 | B2 | AU2014353710 | 16.06.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20140015569 | 11.02.2014 | WO2014KR11290 | 21.11.2014 | KR20130142968 | 22.11.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3076072 | Global Dossier | 19.07.2017 | A4 | EP3076072 | 05.10.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20140015569 | 11.02.2014 | WO2014KR11290 | 21.11.2014 | KR20130142968 | 22.11.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PH12016500942 | 27.06.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20140015569 | 11.02.2014 | WO2014KR11290 | 21.11.2014 | KR20130142968 | 22.11.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2648013 | 21.03.2018 | C2 | RU2016124536 | 25.12.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20140015569 | 11.02.2014 | WO2014KR11290 | 21.11.2014 | KR20130142968 | 22.11.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA201603808 | 25.07.2018 | B | Priority number | Date | KR20140015569 | 11.02.2014 | WO2014KR11290 | 21.11.2014 | KR20130142968 | 22.11.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2015076625 | Global Dossier | 28.05.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20140015569 | 11.02.2014 | KR20130142968 | 22.11.2013 |