EP3074343 - STABLE AQUEOUS COLLOIDAL SILICA PRODUCT, AND METHODS TO MAKE AND USE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.07.2021 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.07.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.03.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ecolab USA Inc. 1 Ecolab Place St. Paul, MN 55102 / US | [2017/35] |
Former [2016/40] | For all designated states Ecolab USA Inc. 370 N. Wabasha Street St. Paul, Minnesota 55102 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Minghua 1738 Maroon Bells Lane Bolingbrook, Illinois 60490 / US | 02 /
WONG SHING, Jane B. 2325 Alder Court Aurora, Illinois 60504 / US | 03 /
MILLER, Raymond D., Jr. 925 LaCrosse Court Carol Stream, Illinois 60188 / US | [2020/35] |
Former [2016/40] | 01 /
LI, Minghua 1738 Maroon Bells Lane Bolingbrook, Illinois 60490 / US | ||
02 /
WONG SHING, Jane B. 2325 Alder Court Aurora, Illinois 60504 / US | |||
03 /
MILLER, Raymond D.Jr. 925 LaCrosse Court Carol Stream, Illinois 60188 / US | Representative(s) | Godemeyer Blum Lenze Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB - werkpatent An den Gärten 7 51491 Overath / DE | [2016/40] | Application number, filing date | 14864844.7 | 08.10.2014 | [2016/40] | WO2014US59724 | Priority number, date | US201314089028 | 25.11.2013 Original published format: US201314089028 | [2016/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015076946 | Date: | 28.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3074343 | Date: | 05.10.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.05.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3074343 | Date: | 26.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 28.05.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C01B33/143, D21H17/13, D21H21/10 | [2017/19] | CPC: |
D21H21/10 (EP,KR);
C01B33/141 (KR);
C01B33/1435 (EP);
D21H17/13 (EP,KR);
C01P2006/12 (EP,KR);
C01P2006/22 (EP);
C01P2006/90 (KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/40] | C01B33/141 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STABILES, WÄSSRIGES, KOLLOIDALES KIESELSÄUREPRODUKT UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2016/40] | English: | STABLE AQUEOUS COLLOIDAL SILICA PRODUCT, AND METHODS TO MAKE AND USE SAME | [2016/40] | French: | PRODUIT DE SILICE COLLOÏDALE AQUEUSE STABLE, ET SES PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION ET D'UTILISATION | [2016/40] | Entry into regional phase | 23.06.2016 | National basic fee paid | 23.06.2016 | Search fee paid | 23.06.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.06.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.06.2016 | Examination requested [2016/40] | 05.10.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 15.07.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.07.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 27.05.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.10.2014 | AL | 26.08.2020 | AT | 26.08.2020 | CY | 26.08.2020 | CZ | 26.08.2020 | DK | 26.08.2020 | EE | 26.08.2020 | HR | 26.08.2020 | LT | 26.08.2020 | LV | 26.08.2020 | MC | 26.08.2020 | MK | 26.08.2020 | MT | 26.08.2020 | NL | 26.08.2020 | RO | 26.08.2020 | RS | 26.08.2020 | SI | 26.08.2020 | SK | 26.08.2020 | SM | 26.08.2020 | TR | 26.08.2020 | IE | 08.10.2020 | LU | 08.10.2020 | BE | 31.10.2020 | CH | 31.10.2020 | LI | 31.10.2020 | BG | 26.11.2020 | GB | 26.11.2020 | NO | 26.11.2020 | GR | 27.11.2020 | IS | 26.12.2020 | PT | 28.12.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 08.10.2014 | |
AL | 26.08.2020 | ||
AT | 26.08.2020 | ||
CY | 26.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2020 | ||
DK | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
MC | 26.08.2020 | ||
MT | 26.08.2020 | ||
NL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SI | 26.08.2020 | ||
SK | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
TR | 26.08.2020 | ||
IE | 08.10.2020 | ||
LU | 08.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
GB | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 26.08.2020 | |
AT | 26.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2020 | ||
DK | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
MC | 26.08.2020 | ||
NL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SI | 26.08.2020 | ||
SK | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
IE | 08.10.2020 | ||
LU | 08.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
GB | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 26.08.2020 | |
AT | 26.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2020 | ||
DK | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
MC | 26.08.2020 | ||
NL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SI | 26.08.2020 | ||
SK | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
IE | 08.10.2020 | ||
LU | 08.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
GB | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AL | 26.08.2020 | |
AT | 26.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2020 | ||
DK | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
MC | 26.08.2020 | ||
NL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SI | 26.08.2020 | ||
SK | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
IE | 08.10.2020 | ||
LU | 08.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
GB | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 26.08.2020 | |
AT | 26.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2020 | ||
DK | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
MC | 26.08.2020 | ||
NL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SI | 26.08.2020 | ||
SK | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
IE | 08.10.2020 | ||
LU | 08.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 26.08.2020 | |
AT | 26.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2020 | ||
DK | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
MC | 26.08.2020 | ||
NL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SI | 26.08.2020 | ||
SK | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
LU | 08.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 26.08.2020 | |
AT | 26.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2020 | ||
DK | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
MC | 26.08.2020 | ||
NL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SI | 26.08.2020 | ||
SK | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
LU | 08.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 26.08.2020 | |
AT | 26.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2020 | ||
DK | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
MC | 26.08.2020 | ||
NL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SK | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
LU | 08.10.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 26.08.2020 | |
AT | 26.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2020 | ||
DK | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
NL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SK | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 26.08.2020 | |
AT | 26.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2020 | ||
DK | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
NL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 26.08.2020 | |
CZ | 26.08.2020 | ||
DK | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
NL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 26.08.2020 | |
DK | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
NL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/21] | DK | 26.08.2020 | |
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
NL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | HR | 26.08.2020 | |
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
NL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | HR | 26.08.2020 | |
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | LT | 26.08.2020 | |
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | LT | 26.08.2020 | |
NO | 26.11.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2631134 (ILER RALPH K, et al) [A] 1-10* example 9; claims 1-6 *; | [X]WO0066492 (AKZO NOBEL NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-5,11-15 * page 2, line 15 - page 11, line 27; examples 1-7; claims 10-16, 19-25 *; | [X]US6372089 (KEISER BRUCE A [US], et al) [X] 6-15 * examples 4, 5; claims 1-6 *; | [XAI]WO2008150230 (AKZO NOBEL NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-5 * page 12, line 32 - page 15, line 17; examples 1-25; claims 24-29 * [A] 6-10 [I] 11-15 | International search | [A]US5368833 (JOHANSSON HANS ERIK [SE], et al); | [A]US5447604 (JOHANSSON HANS E [SE], et al); | [X]WO0066491 (AKZO NOBEL NV [NL], et al); | [A]WO0075074 (NALCO CHEMICAL CO [US]); | [A]US2003065041 (KEISER BRUCE A [US], et al); | [A] - KIM, K. D. ET AL., "Comparison of the Properties of Silica Fine Particles Prepared by Using Batch and Semibatch Process", JOURNAL OF THE KOREAN INSTITUTE OF CHEMICAL ENGINEERS, (20000630), vol. 38, no. 3, pages 398 - 404, XP008183308 | by applicant | US5368833 | WO0066492 | US6372089 | US6372806 | - "Terminology for Membranes and Membrane Processes", WJ KOROS et al., Journal of Membrane Science, (19960000), vol. 120, pages 149 - 159 |