EP3076677 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR TRANSMITTING AND RECEIVING BROADCAST SIGNAL FOR PROVIDING TRICK PLAY SERVICE IN DIGITAL BROADCASTING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 12.02.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.02.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 17.03.2021 [2021/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2016/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HWANG, Soojin 19 Yangjae-daero 11gil Seocho-gu Seoul 137-893 / KR | 02 /
OH, Hyunmook 19 Yangjae-daero 11gil Seocho-gu Seoul 137-893 / KR | 03 /
SUH, Jongyeul 19 Yangjae-daero 11gil Seocho-gu Seoul 137-893 / KR | 04 /
YOON, Joonhee 19 Yangjae-daero 11gil Seocho-gu Seoul 137-893 / KR | [2016/40] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/40] | Cabinet Plasseraud 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 14865692.9 | 18.11.2014 | [2016/40] | WO2014KR11044 | Priority number, date | US201361910416P | 01.12.2013 Original published format: US 201361910416 P | US201461952140P | 13.03.2014 Original published format: US 201461952140 P | US201461970910P | 27.03.2014 Original published format: US 201461970910 P | [2016/40] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015080415 | Date: | 04.06.2015 | Language: | KO | [2015/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3076677 | Date: | 05.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 04.06.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04N21/2387, H04N21/234, H04N21/236, H04N21/6332, H04N21/432, H04N21/6587 | [2017/24] | CPC: |
H04N21/23614 (EP,KR,US);
H04N21/2387 (KR,US);
H04N21/234 (EP,KR,US);
H04N21/236 (EP,KR,US);
H04N21/4147 (US);
H04N21/4325 (EP,KR,US);
H04N21/4383 (US);
H04N21/6332 (EP,KR,US);
H04N21/6587 (EP,US);
H04N19/31 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/40] | H04N21/2387, H04N21/234, H04N21/236 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/40] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM SENDEN UND EMPFANGEN EINES RUNDFUNKSIGNALS ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG EINES TRICKWIEDERGABEDIENSTES IN EINEM DIGITALEN RUNDFUNKSYSTEM | [2016/40] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR TRANSMITTING AND RECEIVING BROADCAST SIGNAL FOR PROVIDING TRICK PLAY SERVICE IN DIGITAL BROADCASTING SYSTEM | [2016/40] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT D'ÉMETTRE ET DE RECEVOIR UN SIGNAL DE RADIODIFFUSION AFIN DE FOURNIR UN SERVICE DE LECTURE RAPIDE DANS UN SYSTÈME DE RADIODIFFUSION NUMÉRIQUE | [2016/40] | Entry into regional phase | 29.06.2016 | Translation filed | 29.06.2016 | National basic fee paid | 29.06.2016 | Search fee paid | 29.06.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.06.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.06.2016 | Examination requested [2016/40] | 07.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 07.09.2020 | 07.09.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 27.10.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2021/11] | 06.11.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2020 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I] - DVB ORGANIZATION, "TM-AVC0600_HEVC-strawman-proposal.docx", DVB, DIGITAL VIDEO BROADCASTING, C/O EBU - 17A ANCIENNE ROUTE - CH-1218 GRAND SACONNEX, GENEVA - SWITZERLAND, (20130911), XP017842484 [I] 1-15 * Section 5.12.2.2.1 Temporal Layering * * Annex D. Coding of Data Fields in the Private Data Bytes of the Adaptation Field * | [I] - "Digital Video Broadcasting (DVB); Specification for the use of Video and Audio Coding in Broadcasting Applications based on the MPEG-2 Transport Stream", TECHNICAL SPECIFICATION, EUROPEAN TELECOMMUNICATIONS STANDARDS INSTITUTE (ETSI), 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS ; FRANCE, (20121101), vol. BROADCAS, no. V1.11.1, XP014092645 [I] 1-3,8-10 * Annex D. Coding of Data Fields in the Private Data Bytes of the Adaptation Field * | [IP] - "Digital Video Broadcasting (DVB); Specification for the use of Video and Audio Coding in Broadcasting Applications based on the MPEG-2 Transport Stream;Draft ETSI TS 101 154", ETSI DRAFT; DRAFT ETSI TS 101 154, EUROPEAN TELECOMMUNICATIONS STANDARDS INSTITUTE (ETSI), 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS ; FRANCE, (20141002), vol. Broadcast, no. V2.1.1, pages 1 - 226, XP014215858 [IP] 1-15 * Annex D: Coding of Data Fields in the Private Date Bytes of the Adaptation Field * | International search | [A]US2003118322 (KIM JONG SOON [KR]); | [A]JP2008294638 (SONY CORP); | [A]JP2009159625 (HITACHI LTD); | [Y]US2009323822 (RODRIGUEZ ARTURO A [US], et al); | [X]KR20130129080 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR], et al) |