EP3078379 - DRUG FOR THE TREATMENT OF CHOLESTEROL ACCUMULATION DISORDERS, AND SCREENING METHOD FOR SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.10.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.10.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, MK | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states National University Corporation Kumamoto University 2-39-1 Kurokami Chuo-ku Kumamoto-shi, Kumamoto 860-8555 / JP | For all designated states Nihon Shokuhin Kako Co., Ltd. 20F, Marunouchi kitaguchi Building 1-6-5, Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | [2016/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ERA Takumi c/o NATIONAL UNIVERSITY CORPORATION KUMAMOTO UNIVERSITY 2-39-1 Kurokami Chuo-ku Kumamoto-shi Kumamoto 860-8555 / JP | 02 /
IRIE Tetsumi c/o NATIONAL UNIVERSITY CORPORATION KUMAMOTO UNIVERSITY 2-39-1 Kurokami Chuo-ku Kumamoto-shi Kumamoto 860-8555 / JP | [2016/41] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/48] | Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2016/41] | Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14866984.9 | 03.12.2014 | [2016/41] | WO2014JP81969 | Priority number, date | JP20130252174 | 05.12.2013 Original published format: JP 2013252174 | JP20140135865 | 01.07.2014 Original published format: JP 2014135865 | [2016/41] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015083736 | Date: | 11.06.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3078379 | Date: | 12.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3078379 | Date: | 28.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.06.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/724, A61P1/16, A61P19/00, A61P25/00, A61P25/28, A61P27/02, C12N5/07, C12Q1/02 | [2016/41] | CPC: |
A61K31/724 (EP,US);
A61K9/0019 (US);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
C12N5/0696 (EP,US);
G01N33/5073 (EP,US);
G01N33/92 (EP,US);
G01N2500/04 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ARZNEIMITTEL ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON CHOLESTEROLANSAMMLUNGSERKRANKUNGEN UND SCREENINGVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2016/41] | English: | DRUG FOR THE TREATMENT OF CHOLESTEROL ACCUMULATION DISORDERS, AND SCREENING METHOD FOR SAME | [2016/41] | French: | MÉDICAMENT POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE TROUBLES D'ACCUMULATION DE CHOLESTÉROL ET MÉTHODE DE SÉLECTION DE CE DERNIER | [2016/41] | Entry into regional phase | 30.06.2016 | Translation filed | 30.06.2016 | National basic fee paid | 30.06.2016 | Search fee paid | 30.06.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.06.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.06.2016 | Examination requested [2016/41] | 20.04.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.06.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 18.10.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.10.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 29.08.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.12.2014 | AL | 28.11.2018 | AT | 28.11.2018 | CY | 28.11.2018 | CZ | 28.11.2018 | DK | 28.11.2018 | EE | 28.11.2018 | ES | 28.11.2018 | FI | 28.11.2018 | HR | 28.11.2018 | IT | 28.11.2018 | LT | 28.11.2018 | LV | 28.11.2018 | MC | 28.11.2018 | MK | 28.11.2018 | NL | 28.11.2018 | PL | 28.11.2018 | RO | 28.11.2018 | RS | 28.11.2018 | SE | 28.11.2018 | SI | 28.11.2018 | SK | 28.11.2018 | SM | 28.11.2018 | TR | 28.11.2018 | IE | 03.12.2018 | LU | 03.12.2018 | MT | 03.12.2018 | BE | 31.12.2018 | CH | 31.12.2018 | LI | 31.12.2018 | BG | 28.02.2019 | NO | 28.02.2019 | GR | 01.03.2019 | IS | 28.03.2019 | PT | 28.03.2019 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/17] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
IT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
MC | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SI | 28.11.2018 | ||
SK | 28.11.2018 | ||
SM | 28.11.2018 | ||
TR | 28.11.2018 | ||
IE | 03.12.2018 | ||
LU | 03.12.2018 | ||
MT | 03.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
IT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
MC | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SI | 28.11.2018 | ||
SK | 28.11.2018 | ||
SM | 28.11.2018 | ||
IE | 03.12.2018 | ||
LU | 03.12.2018 | ||
MT | 03.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
IT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
MC | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SI | 28.11.2018 | ||
SK | 28.11.2018 | ||
SM | 28.11.2018 | ||
IE | 03.12.2018 | ||
LU | 03.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
IT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
MC | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SI | 28.11.2018 | ||
SK | 28.11.2018 | ||
SM | 28.11.2018 | ||
IE | 03.12.2018 | ||
LU | 03.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
IT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
MC | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SK | 28.11.2018 | ||
SM | 28.11.2018 | ||
IE | 03.12.2018 | ||
LU | 03.12.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
IT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
MC | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SK | 28.11.2018 | ||
SM | 28.11.2018 | ||
LU | 03.12.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
IT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SK | 28.11.2018 | ||
SM | 28.11.2018 | ||
LU | 03.12.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
IT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SM | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
IT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
IT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | AT | 28.11.2018 | |
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 28.11.2018 | |
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 28.11.2018 | |
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 28.11.2018 | |
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 28.11.2018 | |
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 28.11.2018 | |
NO | 28.02.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2013123214 (ZHENG WEI [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * p. 4, paragraph [0040] - p. 6, paragraph [0057], claims 22-40 *; | [A] - BENNY LIU, "Therapeutic potential of cyclodextrins in the treatment of Niemann-Pick type C disease", CLINICAL LIPIDOLOGY, GB, (20120601), vol. 7, no. 3, doi:10.2217/clp.12.31, ISSN 1758-4299, pages 289 - 301, XP055375347 [A] 1-5 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2217/clp.12.31 | [A] - CHARINA M. RAMIREZ ET AL, "Quantitative role of LAL, NPC2, and NPC1 in lysosomal cholesterol processing defined by genetic and pharmacological manipulations", JOURNAL OF LIPID RESEARCH, US, (20110401), vol. 52, no. 4, doi:10.1194/jlr.M013789, ISSN 0022-2275, pages 688 - 698, XP055387038 [A] 1-5 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1194/jlr.M013789 | [AP] - MINAMI SOGA ET AL, "HPGCD Outperforms HPBCD as a Potential Treatment for Niemann-Pick Disease Type C During Disease Modeling with iPS Cells : HPGCD for NPC Treatment", STEM CELLS., US, (20150424), vol. 33, no. 4, doi:10.1002/stem.1917, ISSN 1066-5099, pages 1075 - 1088, XP055387040 [AP] 1-5 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/stem.1917 | International search | [A] - LIU B. ET AL., "Reversal of defective lysosomal transport in NPC disease ameliorates liver dysfunction and neurodegeneration in the npcl-/- mouse", PROC.NATL.ACAD.SCI.USA, (2009), vol. 106, pages 2377 - 2382, XP055144509 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.0810895106 | [A] - IRIE T. ET AL., "Pharmaceutical applications of cyclodextrins. III. Toxicological issues and safety evaluation", J.PHRAM.SCI., (1997), vol. 86, pages 147 - 162, XP000643007 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/js960213f | [A] - COLLINS, C.J. ET AL., "Synthesis, characterization, and evaluation of pluronic- based beta-cyclodextrin polyrotaxanes for mobi", BIOCHEMISTRY, vol. 52, no. 19, pages 3242 - 3253, XP055294446 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi3010889 | by applicant | WO2012063817 | - LIU ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (2009), vol. 106, page 2377 | - FUSAKI ET AL., PROC. JPN. ACAD. SER. B, PHYS. BIOL. SCI, (2009), vol. 85, pages 348 - 362 | - SEKI ET AL., CELL STEM CELL, (2010), vol. 7, pages 11 - 14 | - BAN ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (2011), vol. 108, pages 14234 - 14239 | - IRIE ET AL., J. PHAR. SCI., (1997), vol. 86, no. 2, pages 147 - 162 | - HAMASAKI ET AL., STEM CELLS, (2012), vol. 30, pages 2437 - 2449 |