EP3079342 - RELAY DEVICE, DISPLAY DEVICE, AND COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.08.2021 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.09.2021 [2021/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2016/41] | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKANO, Tomohide c/o RICOH COMPANY LIMITED 3-6 Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [2016/41] | Representative(s) | White, Duncan Rohan Marks & Clerk LLP 2nd Floor, Wytham Court 11 West Way Oxford OX2 0JB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/41] | White, Duncan Rohan Marks & Clerk LLP Fletcher House (2nd Floor) Heatley Road The Oxford Science Park Oxford OX4 4GE / GB | Application number, filing date | 14867071.4 | 03.12.2014 | [2016/41] | WO2014JP81985 | Priority number, date | JP20130250480 | 03.12.2013 Original published format: JP 2013250480 | JP20140231043 | 13.11.2014 Original published format: JP 2014231043 | [2016/41] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015083741 | Date: | 11.06.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3079342 | Date: | 12.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.06.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04M3/42, G10L13/08, G10L13/00, G10L15/26, G10L15/22, G10L15/30 | [2016/49] | CPC: |
G10L15/26 (EP,US);
H04M3/42 (KR);
G06F40/242 (US);
G10L13/00 (EP,US);
G10L13/08 (EP,US);
G10L15/22 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2016/41] | H04M3/42 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/41] | Title | German: | RELAISVORRICHTUNG, ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG UND KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2016/41] | English: | RELAY DEVICE, DISPLAY DEVICE, AND COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2016/41] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE RELAIS, DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE ET SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION | [2016/41] | Entry into regional phase | 26.05.2016 | Translation filed | 26.05.2016 | National basic fee paid | 26.05.2016 | Search fee paid | 26.05.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.05.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.05.2016 | Examination requested [2016/41] | 11.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.04.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/38] | 14.05.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2002111794 (YAMAMOTO HIROSHI [JP], et al) [I] 1-3,11 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0044] * * paragraphs [0052] , [0 62] * * paragraph [0065] - paragraph [0073] * * paragraph [0097] - paragraph [0100] * * paragraphs [0135] , [ 136] , [ 140] *; | [I]US2003187650 (MOORE RICHARD G [US], et al) [I] 1-11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0012] , [0 19] , [0 25] * * paragraphs [0064] , [0 66] , [0 70] , [0 90] , [0 94] , [0 97] , [ 107] , [ 111] * * paragraphs [0148] , [ 152] , [ 179] , [ 192] , [ 203] , [ 204] *; | [X]US7103548 (SQUIBBS ROBERT FRANCIS [GB], et al) [X] 4-6,11 * abstract * * column 1, line 6 - line 8 * * column 3, line 64 - column 4, line 31 * * column 5, line 28 - line 65 ** column 7, line 63 - line 67 * | International search | [Y]JP2003092628 (AOKI KETSU); | [Y]JP2004129174 (RICOH KK); | [Y]JP2007096449 (OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [Y]JP2009139390 (NEC CORP); | [XP]JP2014167517 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE) | by applicant | JP2002244688 |