EP3076961 - OMEGA-3 FATTY ACID ARTICLES OF MANUFACTURE, AND METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR MAKING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 19.03.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.06.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 21.04.2021 [2021/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ambo Innovation LLC 1721 South Creek Drive Osprey, FL 34229 / US | [2016/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARTINSEN, Bo 72 Commerce Drive Venice, FL 34292 / US | 02 /
RIEGE, Leif, Andreas Vikanekroken 8 N-1621 Gressvik / NO | [2016/41] | Representative(s) | Geary, Stephen Bawden & Associates Rothamsted Enterprises Russell Building West Common Harpenden, Hertfordshire AL5 2JQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/41] | Geary, Stephen Bawden & Associates 4 The Gatehouse 2 High Street Harpenden Hertfordshire AL5 2TH / GB | Application number, filing date | 14867897.2 | 04.12.2014 | [2016/41] | WO2014US68528 | Priority number, date | US201361913048P | 06.12.2013 Original published format: US 201361913048 P | [2016/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015085045 | Date: | 11.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3076961 | Date: | 12.10.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.06.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 11.06.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/202, A61K36/00, A61K35/56, C11B1/10, C11B5/00, B01J14/00, A23D9/02 | [2017/24] | CPC: |
A61K31/202 (EP,US);
A23D9/02 (EP,US);
A23L33/12 (EP,US);
A61K31/352 (EP,US);
A61K31/353 (EP,US);
A61K31/355 (EP,US);
A61K31/4045 (EP,US);
A61K31/593 (EP,US);
A61K35/60 (EP,US);
A61K36/185 (EP,US);
A61K36/82 (EP,US);
C11B1/10 (EP,US);
C11B5/0085 (EP,US);
C11B5/0092 (EP,US);
A23V2002/00 (US);
A61K9/0053 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/202, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/352, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/353, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/355, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/593, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K36/185, A61K2300/00 (US,EP); |
Former IPC [2016/41] | A61K31/202, A61K36/00, A61K35/56, C11B1/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/41] | Title | German: | AUS OMEGA-3-FETTSÄURE HERGESTELLTE ARTIKEL SOWIE VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2016/41] | English: | OMEGA-3 FATTY ACID ARTICLES OF MANUFACTURE, AND METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR MAKING SAME | [2016/41] | French: | ARTICLES MANUFACTURÉS CONTENANT DES ACIDES GRAS OMÉGA-3, AINSI QUE PROCÉDÉS ET DISPOSITIFS POUR LES PRÉPARER | [2016/41] | Entry into regional phase | 05.07.2016 | National basic fee paid | 05.07.2016 | Search fee paid | 05.07.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.07.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.07.2016 | Examination requested [2016/41] | 04.05.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 04.07.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.06.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.05.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.12.2020 | 03.12.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2021/16] | 10.12.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 13.12.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/16] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 04.07.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 04.07.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.07.2018 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2018 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   07.06.2019 | 31.12.2020 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO2007116052 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [X] 1-3,5,7,8 * page 9, paragraph 6 - page 10, paragraph 1 * * Claim 16: food stuff * * Claims: medicaments comprising genistein and DHA * [Y] 4; | [XY]US2008031869 (FONTAINE JULIETTE S [US]) [X] 1-3,5-8 * Document D1 (US20080031869) discloses articles of manufacture comprising omega-3 fatty acids and quercetin (claims 8,13-18). * [Y] 4; | [XPY]WO2014093313 (KANG JINGXUAN [US]) [XP] 1,2,5-7 * claims 1-25 * [Y] 4; | [Y] - VURAL HUSEYIN ET AL, "Melatonin inhibits lipid peroxidation and stimulates the antioxidant status of diabetic rats", JOURNAL OF PINEAL RESEARCH, (200110), vol. 31, no. 3, ISSN 0742-3098, pages 193 - 198, XP002769600 [Y] 4 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1034/j.1600-079X.2001.310301.x | International search | [A]US2002004074 (BAKAL ABRAHAM I [US], et al); | [Y]WO2008022199 (KELLOG CO [US], et al); | [A]WO2008060163 (PRONOVA BIOPHARMA NORGE AS [NO], et al); | [X]WO2011057183 (ALCON RES LTD [US], et al); | [Y] - TEIXEIRA A. ET AL., "Melatonin protects against pro-oxidant enzymes and reduces lipid peroxidation in distinct membranes induced by the hydroxyl and ascorbyl radicals and by peroxynitrite.", J. PINEAL. RES., (20031101), vol. 35, no. 4, doi:10.1034/J.1600-079X.2003.00085.X, pages 262 - 268, XP055348175 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1034/j.1600-079X.2003.00085.x |