EP3078360 - WOUND DRESSING WITH THREE-LAYER STRUCTURE AND PREPARATION METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.11.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.12.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Foshan United Medical Technologies Ltd 89 Taoyuan East Road Shishan Nanhai Foshan Guangdong 528225 / CN | [2016/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Xiaodong 89 Taoyuan East Road Shishan Nanhai District Foshan Guangdong 528225 / CN | 02 /
FENG, Caixia 89 Taoyuan East Road Shishan Nanhai District Foshan Guangdong 528225 / CN | 03 /
HE, Guibiao 89 Taoyuan East Road Shishan Nanhai District Foshan Guangdong 528225 / CN | 04 /
XIAO, Jianpeng 89 Taoyuan East Road Shishan Nanhai District Foshan Guangdong 528225 / CN | 05 /
MO, Xiaohui 89 Taoyuan East Road Shishan Nanhai District Foshan Guangdong 528225 / CN | [2016/41] | Representative(s) | Wilson Gunn Charles House 148/9 Great Charles Street Birmingham B3 3HT / GB | [2016/41] | Application number, filing date | 14868096.0 | 23.10.2014 | [2016/41] | WO2014CN89317 | Priority number, date | CN201310642677 | 03.12.2013 Original published format: CN201310642677 | [2016/41] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015081769 | Date: | 11.06.2015 | Language: | ZH | [2015/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3078360 | Date: | 12.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3078360 | Date: | 09.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 11.06.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/00 | [2017/31] | CPC: |
A61F13/01042 (EP,US);
A61F13/0276 (CN);
A61F13/00063 (US);
A61F13/00987 (US);
A61F13/01008 (EP,US);
A61F13/01012 (US);
A61F13/01017 (US);
A61F13/01029 (EP,US);
A61F13/05 (US);
A61L15/225 (US);
A61L15/24 (CN);
A61L15/26 (CN);
A61L15/28 (CN);
A61L15/44 (CN,US);
A61L15/60 (US);
|
Former IPC [2016/41] | A61F13/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WUNDVERBAND MIT EINER DREISCHICHTIGEN STRUKTUR UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2016/41] | English: | WOUND DRESSING WITH THREE-LAYER STRUCTURE AND PREPARATION METHOD THEREOF | [2016/41] | French: | PANSEMENT AYANT UNE STRUCTURE À TROIS COUCHES, ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION | [2016/41] | Entry into regional phase | 20.06.2016 | Translation filed | 20.06.2016 | National basic fee paid | 20.06.2016 | Search fee paid | 20.06.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.06.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.06.2016 | Examination requested [2016/41] | 11.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.10.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.11.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 27.11.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.11.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 10.10.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.10.2014 | AL | 09.01.2019 | AT | 09.01.2019 | CY | 09.01.2019 | CZ | 09.01.2019 | DK | 09.01.2019 | EE | 09.01.2019 | ES | 09.01.2019 | FI | 09.01.2019 | HR | 09.01.2019 | IT | 09.01.2019 | LT | 09.01.2019 | LV | 09.01.2019 | MC | 09.01.2019 | MK | 09.01.2019 | MT | 09.01.2019 | NL | 09.01.2019 | PL | 09.01.2019 | RO | 09.01.2019 | RS | 09.01.2019 | SE | 09.01.2019 | SI | 09.01.2019 | SK | 09.01.2019 | SM | 09.01.2019 | TR | 09.01.2019 | BG | 09.04.2019 | NO | 09.04.2019 | GR | 10.04.2019 | IS | 09.05.2019 | PT | 09.05.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 23.10.2014 | |
AL | 09.01.2019 | ||
AT | 09.01.2019 | ||
CY | 09.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
MC | 09.01.2019 | ||
MT | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
SM | 09.01.2019 | ||
TR | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 23.10.2014 | |
AL | 09.01.2019 | ||
AT | 09.01.2019 | ||
CY | 09.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
MC | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
SM | 09.01.2019 | ||
TR | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 09.01.2019 | |
AT | 09.01.2019 | ||
CY | 09.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
MC | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
SM | 09.01.2019 | ||
TR | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 09.01.2019 | |
AT | 09.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
MC | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
SM | 09.01.2019 | ||
TR | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 09.01.2019 | |
AT | 09.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
SM | 09.01.2019 | ||
TR | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 09.01.2019 | |
AT | 09.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
SM | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 09.01.2019 | |
AT | 09.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
SM | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 09.01.2019 | |
AT | 09.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AT | 09.01.2019 | |
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AT | 09.01.2019 | |
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | ES | 09.01.2019 | |
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | ES | 09.01.2019 | |
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | ES | 09.01.2019 | |
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | ES | 09.01.2019 | |
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 09.01.2019 | |
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 09.01.2019 | |
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/30] | NL | 09.01.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2006020235 (SINIAGUINE OLEG [US]) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0027] - [0040]; figures 2-4 *; | [A]US2010030170 (KELLER KEITH ALAN [US], et al) [A] 1-11* paragraphs [0018] - [0040]; figure - * | International search | [Y]CN1329881 (UNI CHARM CORP [JP]); | [A]CN1358484 (UNI CHARM CORP [JP]); | [A]JP2004073759 (UNI CHARM CORP); | [Y]US2004082925 (PATEL HARISH A [US]); | [A]CN102076291 (HARTMANN PAUL AG [DE]); | [A]US2013012902 (ROVANIEMI ROLF [SE]); | [XP]CN103655046 (FOSHAN UNITED MEDICAL TECHNOLOGIES LTD) | by applicant | EP0078378 | EP0927013 | EP1303239 |