EP3077048 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS OF TREATING THROMBOSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.06.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.02.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Case Western Reserve University 10900 Euclid Avenue Cleveland OH 44116 / US | [2016/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIMON, Daniel I 30 Rydalwood Lane Moreland Hills, Ohio 44022 / US | [2016/41] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/29] | Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2016/41] | Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14868378.2 | 08.12.2014 | [2016/41] | WO2014US69134 | Priority number, date | US201361913263P | 07.12.2013 Original published format: US 201361913263 P | [2016/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015085311 | Date: | 11.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3077048 | Date: | 12.10.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.06.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3077048 | Date: | 17.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.06.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61P7/02, A61K39/395, A61K38/00, G01N33/53, C07K16/28, C07K16/24, A61K38/17, C07K16/18, G01N33/68 | [2017/32] | CPC: |
C07K16/24 (EP,US);
C07K16/18 (US);
A61K38/177 (EP,US);
A61P7/02 (EP);
C07K16/2896 (EP,US);
G01N33/6893 (US);
A61K2039/505 (US);
A61K2039/54 (US);
C07K2317/76 (EP,US);
C07K2319/30 (US);
G01N2800/32 (US);
G01N2800/324 (US);
G01N2800/50 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/41] | A61P7/02, A61K39/395, A61K38/00, G01N33/53 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON THROMBOSE | [2016/41] | English: | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS OF TREATING THROMBOSIS | [2016/41] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET MÉTHODES DE TRAITEMENT DE THROMBOSE | [2016/41] | Entry into regional phase | 23.06.2016 | National basic fee paid | 23.06.2016 | Search fee paid | 23.06.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.06.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.06.2016 | Examination requested [2016/41] | 29.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.12.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.04.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 21.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 03.06.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.06.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.12.2014 | AL | 17.07.2019 | AT | 17.07.2019 | CY | 17.07.2019 | CZ | 17.07.2019 | DK | 17.07.2019 | EE | 17.07.2019 | ES | 17.07.2019 | FI | 17.07.2019 | HR | 17.07.2019 | IT | 17.07.2019 | LT | 17.07.2019 | LV | 17.07.2019 | MC | 17.07.2019 | MK | 17.07.2019 | MT | 17.07.2019 | NL | 17.07.2019 | PL | 17.07.2019 | RO | 17.07.2019 | RS | 17.07.2019 | SE | 17.07.2019 | SI | 17.07.2019 | SK | 17.07.2019 | SM | 17.07.2019 | TR | 17.07.2019 | BG | 17.10.2019 | NO | 17.10.2019 | GR | 18.10.2019 | IS | 17.11.2019 | PT | 18.11.2019 | IE | 08.12.2019 | LU | 08.12.2019 | BE | 31.12.2019 | CH | 31.12.2019 | LI | 31.12.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 08.12.2014 | |
AL | 17.07.2019 | ||
AT | 17.07.2019 | ||
CY | 17.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2019 | ||
DK | 17.07.2019 | ||
EE | 17.07.2019 | ||
ES | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
IT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
MC | 17.07.2019 | ||
MT | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
PL | 17.07.2019 | ||
RO | 17.07.2019 | ||
RS | 17.07.2019 | ||
SE | 17.07.2019 | ||
SI | 17.07.2019 | ||
SK | 17.07.2019 | ||
SM | 17.07.2019 | ||
TR | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
IS | 17.11.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
IE | 08.12.2019 | ||
LU | 08.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 08.12.2014 | |
AL | 17.07.2019 | ||
AT | 17.07.2019 | ||
CY | 17.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2019 | ||
DK | 17.07.2019 | ||
EE | 17.07.2019 | ||
ES | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
IT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
MC | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
PL | 17.07.2019 | ||
RO | 17.07.2019 | ||
RS | 17.07.2019 | ||
SE | 17.07.2019 | ||
SI | 17.07.2019 | ||
SK | 17.07.2019 | ||
SM | 17.07.2019 | ||
TR | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
IS | 17.11.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
IE | 08.12.2019 | ||
LU | 08.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 17.07.2019 | |
AT | 17.07.2019 | ||
CY | 17.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2019 | ||
DK | 17.07.2019 | ||
EE | 17.07.2019 | ||
ES | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
IT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
MC | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
PL | 17.07.2019 | ||
RO | 17.07.2019 | ||
RS | 17.07.2019 | ||
SE | 17.07.2019 | ||
SI | 17.07.2019 | ||
SK | 17.07.2019 | ||
SM | 17.07.2019 | ||
TR | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
IS | 17.11.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
IE | 08.12.2019 | ||
LU | 08.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 17.07.2019 | |
AT | 17.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2019 | ||
DK | 17.07.2019 | ||
EE | 17.07.2019 | ||
ES | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
IT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
MC | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
PL | 17.07.2019 | ||
RO | 17.07.2019 | ||
RS | 17.07.2019 | ||
SE | 17.07.2019 | ||
SI | 17.07.2019 | ||
SK | 17.07.2019 | ||
SM | 17.07.2019 | ||
TR | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
IS | 17.11.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
IE | 08.12.2019 | ||
LU | 08.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 17.07.2019 | |
AT | 17.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2019 | ||
DK | 17.07.2019 | ||
EE | 17.07.2019 | ||
ES | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
IT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
MC | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
PL | 17.07.2019 | ||
RO | 17.07.2019 | ||
RS | 17.07.2019 | ||
SE | 17.07.2019 | ||
SI | 17.07.2019 | ||
SK | 17.07.2019 | ||
SM | 17.07.2019 | ||
TR | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
IS | 17.11.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
IE | 08.12.2019 | ||
LU | 08.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/39] | AL | 17.07.2019 | |
AT | 17.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2019 | ||
DK | 17.07.2019 | ||
EE | 17.07.2019 | ||
ES | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
IT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
MC | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
PL | 17.07.2019 | ||
RO | 17.07.2019 | ||
RS | 17.07.2019 | ||
SE | 17.07.2019 | ||
SI | 17.07.2019 | ||
SK | 17.07.2019 | ||
SM | 17.07.2019 | ||
TR | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
IS | 17.11.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 17.07.2019 | |
AT | 17.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2019 | ||
DK | 17.07.2019 | ||
EE | 17.07.2019 | ||
ES | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
IT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
PL | 17.07.2019 | ||
RO | 17.07.2019 | ||
RS | 17.07.2019 | ||
SE | 17.07.2019 | ||
SI | 17.07.2019 | ||
SK | 17.07.2019 | ||
SM | 17.07.2019 | ||
TR | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
IS | 17.11.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 17.07.2019 | |
AT | 17.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2019 | ||
DK | 17.07.2019 | ||
EE | 17.07.2019 | ||
ES | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
IT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
PL | 17.07.2019 | ||
RO | 17.07.2019 | ||
RS | 17.07.2019 | ||
SE | 17.07.2019 | ||
SK | 17.07.2019 | ||
SM | 17.07.2019 | ||
TR | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
IS | 17.11.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 17.07.2019 | |
AT | 17.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2019 | ||
DK | 17.07.2019 | ||
EE | 17.07.2019 | ||
ES | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
IT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
PL | 17.07.2019 | ||
RO | 17.07.2019 | ||
RS | 17.07.2019 | ||
SE | 17.07.2019 | ||
SK | 17.07.2019 | ||
SM | 17.07.2019 | ||
TR | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 17.07.2019 | |
AT | 17.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2019 | ||
DK | 17.07.2019 | ||
EE | 17.07.2019 | ||
ES | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
IT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
PL | 17.07.2019 | ||
RO | 17.07.2019 | ||
RS | 17.07.2019 | ||
SE | 17.07.2019 | ||
SK | 17.07.2019 | ||
TR | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 17.07.2019 | |
AT | 17.07.2019 | ||
DK | 17.07.2019 | ||
EE | 17.07.2019 | ||
ES | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
IT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
PL | 17.07.2019 | ||
RO | 17.07.2019 | ||
RS | 17.07.2019 | ||
SE | 17.07.2019 | ||
TR | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 17.07.2019 | |
AT | 17.07.2019 | ||
DK | 17.07.2019 | ||
EE | 17.07.2019 | ||
ES | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
IT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
PL | 17.07.2019 | ||
RO | 17.07.2019 | ||
RS | 17.07.2019 | ||
SE | 17.07.2019 | ||
TR | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
IS | 17.11.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 17.07.2019 | |
AT | 17.07.2019 | ||
DK | 17.07.2019 | ||
EE | 17.07.2019 | ||
ES | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
RS | 17.07.2019 | ||
SE | 17.07.2019 | ||
TR | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
IS | 17.11.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 17.07.2019 | |
AT | 17.07.2019 | ||
ES | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
RS | 17.07.2019 | ||
SE | 17.07.2019 | ||
TR | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
IS | 17.11.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 17.07.2019 | |
AT | 17.07.2019 | ||
ES | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
RS | 17.07.2019 | ||
SE | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
IS | 17.11.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AT | 17.07.2019 | |
ES | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
RS | 17.07.2019 | ||
SE | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
IS | 17.11.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 17.07.2019 | |
ES | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
RS | 17.07.2019 | ||
SE | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AT | 17.07.2019 | |
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
SE | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 17.07.2019 | |
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 17.07.2019 | |
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | NL | 17.07.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [IP] - YUNMEI WANG ET AL, "Platelet-derived S100 family member myeloid-related protein-14 regulates thrombosis", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL INVESTIGATION, US, (20140501), vol. 124, no. 5, doi:10.1172/JCI70966, ISSN 0021-9738, pages 2160 - 2171, XP055386570 [IP] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1172/JCI70966 | [A] - KEIKO YONEKAWA ET AL, "Myeloid related proteins activate Toll-like receptor 4 in human acute coronary syndromes", ATHEROSCLEROSIS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 218, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.ATHEROSCLEROSIS.2011.06.020, ISSN 0021-9150, (20110608), pages 486 - 492, (20110617), XP028301383 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.atherosclerosis.2011.06.020 | International search | [Y]WO9306848 (BLOOD RES CENTER [US]); | [Y]US6090367 (KHALIL NASREEN [CA]); | [Y]WO03069349 (SORG CLEMENS [DE], et al); | [Y]WO2006122723 (VAECGENE BIOTECH GMBH [DE], et al); | [Y]US2008219998 (GRUBER ANDRAS [US]); | [X]US2009246810 (MAIER WILLIBALD [CH], et al); | [Y] - HEALY ET AL., "Platelet Expression Profiling and Clinical Validation of Myeloid-Related Protein-14 as a Novel Determinant of Cardiovascular Events'.", CIRCULATION, (20060516), vol. 113, no. 19, pages 2278 - 2284, XP002401377 | [Y] - KERKHOFF ET AL., "Interaction of S 100A8 /S 100A9 -Arachidonic Acid Complexes with the Scavenger Receptor CD 36 May Facilitate Fatty Acid Uptake by Endothelial Cells", BIOCHEMISTRY, (20010109), vol. 40, no. 1, pages 241 - 248, XP055348376 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi001791k | by applicant | US6224867 | US4244946 | US5116964 | US5349053 | US5541087 | US5702892 | US5750373 | US5821047 | US6127132 | US6992174 | WO2006107124 | US7250493 | US2009246810 | - Y. WANG et al., Journal of Clinical Investigation, (20140000), vol. 124, no. 5, pages 2160 - 2171 | - KLENOTIC et al., "Molecular Basis of Antiangiogenic Thrombospondin-1 Type 1 Repeat Domain Interactions with CD36", Arterioscler Thromb Vase Biol., (20130000), vol. 33, pages 1655 - 1662 | - J. MEIENHOFER, Hormonal Proteins and Peptides, Academic Press, (19830000), vol. 2, page 46 | - MERRIFIELD, Adv. Enzymol., (19690000), vol. 32, pages 221 - 96 | - FIELDS et al., int. J. Peptide Protein Res., (19900000), vol. 35, pages 161 - 214 | - SCHRODER et al., The Peptides, Academic Press, (19650000), vol. 1 | - MUYLDEMANS S. et al., Protein Eng., (19940000), vol. 7, no. 9, pages 1129 - 35 | - HAMERS-CASTERMAN C. et al., Nature, (19930000), vol. 363, no. 6429, pages 446 - 8 | - KUBY, JANIS, Immunology, 3rd ed., W.H. Freeman & Co., (19970000), pages 131 - 139 | - HOLT, L. J. et al., "The Use of Recombinant Antibodies in Proteomics", Current Opinion in Biotechnology, (20000000), vol. 11, doi:doi:10.1016/S0958-1669(00)00133-6, pages 445 - 449, XP001155930 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0958-1669(00)00133-6 | - CAPON et al., Nature, (19890000), vol. 337, pages 525 - 531 | - CHAMOW et al., Trends Biotechnol., (19960000), vol. 14, pages 52 - 60 | - LIU et al., Immunological Reviews, (20080000), vol. 222, pages 9 - 27 | - JOHN R. CROWTHER, The ELISA Guidebook, Humana Press, (20000000), ISBN 0896037282 | - "Mass Spectrometry of Proteins and Peptides", Chapman, Methods in Molecular Biology, Humana Press, (20000000), vol. 146, ISBN 089603609x | - BIEMANN, Methods Enzymol, (19900000), vol. 193, pages 455 - 79 | - "Biological Mass Spectrometry", Burlingame, Methods in Enzymology, Academic Press, (20050000), vol. 402, ISBN 9780121828073 | - KUHN et al., Proteomics, (20040000), vol. 4, pages 1175 - 86 | - MAISEYEU et al., "Vivo Targeting of Inflammation-Associated Myeloid-Related Protein 8/14 Via Gadolinium Immunonanoparticles", Aterioscler Thromb Vasc Biol., (20120000), vol. 32, no. 4, pages 962 - 970 |