EP3077092 - SYSTEM FOR CARBONATING SYRUP BASED CARBONATED DRINKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.11.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.04.2024 [2024/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SodaStream Industries Ltd. 1 Atir Yeda Street Kfar Saba 4464301 / IL | [2023/18] |
Former [2016/41] | For all designated states SodaStream Industries Ltd. Gilboa Street P.O. Box 280 Airport City 7019900 Ben Gurion Airport / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COHEN, Avi 8/4 Hadishon Street 9695608 Jerusalem / IL | 02 /
DANIELI, Guy 128/5 Moshe Rachmilevitz Street 9779137 Jerusalem / IL | 03 /
LANDAU, Eitan 50 Tom Lantis Boulevard Netanya / IL | [2016/41] | Representative(s) | Pearl Cohen Zedek Latzer Baratz UK LLP The Gridiron Building One Pancras Square London N1C 4AG / GB | [2023/18] |
Former [2016/41] | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14868456.6 | 04.12.2014 | [2016/41] | WO2014IB66594 | Priority number, date | US201361911493P | 04.12.2013 Original published format: US 201361911493 P | [2016/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015083117 | Date: | 11.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3077092 | Date: | 12.10.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.06.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3077092 | Date: | 03.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.06.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B01F23/2361, B67C3/10, B67D1/04 | [2022/48] | CPC: |
B01F23/233 (EP,US);
B01F23/2361 (EP,US);
B01F23/2363 (EP,US);
F17C2250/043 (US);
Y10T137/0396 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2016/41] | B01F3/04, B67C3/10, B67D1/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUM KARBONISIEREN KOHLENSÄUREHALTIGER GETRÄNKE AUF SIRUPBASIS | [2016/41] | English: | SYSTEM FOR CARBONATING SYRUP BASED CARBONATED DRINKS | [2016/41] | French: | SYSTÈME DE GAZÉIFICATION DE BOISSONS GAZÉIFIÉES À BASE DE SIROP | [2016/41] | Entry into regional phase | 29.06.2016 | National basic fee paid | 29.06.2016 | Search fee paid | 29.06.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.06.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.06.2016 | Examination requested [2016/41] | 01.03.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 16.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 06.02.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4518541 (HARRIS DEREK W [GB]) [A] 1-21* the whole document *; | [YA]US5160461 (BURROWS BRUCE D [US]) [Y] 9-13 * abstract * * figure 3 * * column 4 * [A] 1-8,14-21; | [YA]US5178799 (BROWN JOHN [US], et al) [Y] 5-7,16-21 * abstract * * figures 2-5 * * column 4, line 20 - column 5, line 30 * [A] 1-4,8-15; | [YA]US5329975 (HEITEL ROBERT G [US]) [Y] 19 * abstract * * figures 2,5 * * column 6, lines 7-34 * [A] 1-18,20,21; | [A]US2006016511 (CHANTALAT VINIT [US]) [A] 1-21 * abstract * * figures 1-7,15 * * paragraphs [0062] - [0066] - [0067] , [0071] , [0072] - [0075] - [0086] - [0088] - [0112] - [0114] *; | [YA]US2008308176 (WEEMS COREY [US]) [Y] 15-19 * abstract * * figure 8 * * paragraphs [0064] , [0066] - [0069] - [0072] - [0077] - [0079] - [0085] - [0101] - [0111] * [A] 1-14,20,21; | [IAY]WO2012162762 (BREVILLE R & D PTY LTD [AU], et al) [I] 1-4,8 * abstract * * figures 1-7,8-13,17,18, * * page 9, lines 24-32 * * page 10, line 1 - page 11, line 2 * * page 7, lines 21-28 * * page 13, line 22 - page 14, line 8 * * page 11, line 22 - page 12, line 13 * * page 20, line 14 - page 21, line 15 * [A] 14 [Y] 5-7,9-13,15-21 | International search | [Y]US5329975 (HEITEL ROBERT G [US]); | [A]US5642761 (HOLBROOK BEN F [US]); | [Y]US2008308176 (WEEMS COREY [US]); | [A]US2010266742 (FERREIRA WAYNE [US], et al); | [X]WO2012162762 (BREVILLE R & D PTY LTD [AU], et al); | [A]WO2013050185 (SPARKLING DRINK SYSTEMS INNOVATION CT LTD [CN], et al) |