EP3079847 - TRANSPARENT CONDUCTIVE MULTILAYER ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.07.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2016/42] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O.Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Wan-Chun 6F No. 95 Dunhua S. Road Sec. 2 Taipei 10682 / TW | 02 /
CHIU, Chun-Ming 6F No. 95 Dunhua S. Road Sec. 2 Taipei 10682 / TW | 03 /
LUO, Hui 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 04 /
WANG, Tze Yuan c/o Office of Intelliectual Property Counsel P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 05 /
YU, Ta-hua 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | [2017/02] |
Former [2016/42] | 01 /
CHEN, Wan-Chun 6F No. 95 Dunhua S. Road Sec. 2 Taipei 10682 / TW | ||
02 /
CHIU, Chun-Ming 6F No. 95 Dunhua S. Road Sec. 2 Taipei 10682 / TW | |||
03 /
LUO, Hui 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | |||
04 /
WANG, Tze Yuan 6F No. 95 Dunhua S. Road Sec. 2 Taipei 10682 / TW | |||
05 /
YU, Ta-hua 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2016/42] | Application number, filing date | 14869984.6 | 08.12.2014 | [2016/42] | WO2014US68993 | Priority number, date | US201361913513P | 09.12.2013 Original published format: US 201361913513 P | [2016/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015088938 | Date: | 18.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3079847 | Date: | 19.10.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.06.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 18.06.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B23B27/06, B32B7/02, G06F3/041, B32B27/30, B32B27/32, B32B27/36, B32B9/00, B32B7/12, B32B15/00, B32B15/04, B32B15/08, B32B27/00, B32B27/06, B32B27/18 | [2017/33] | CPC: |
B32B27/36 (EP,KR,US);
G06F3/044 (EP,KR,US);
B32B15/00 (EP,US);
B32B15/04 (EP,KR,US);
B32B15/08 (EP,KR,US);
B32B27/00 (EP,US);
B32B27/06 (EP,KR,US);
B32B27/18 (EP,KR,US);
B32B27/308 (EP,KR,US);
B32B27/325 (EP,KR,US);
B32B27/365 (EP,KR,US);
B32B7/12 (EP,KR,US);
B32B9/00 (EP,US);
B32B9/005 (KR);
B32B9/045 (KR);
C23C14/086 (KR,US);
C23C14/185 (KR,US);
C23C14/34 (KR,US);
G06F3/041 (EP,US);
B32B2250/00 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2250/05 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2255/10 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2255/20 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2255/205 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2255/26 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2255/28 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2264/00 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2264/102 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2307/202 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2307/40 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2307/412 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2307/418 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2307/42 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2307/546 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2457/00 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2457/20 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2457/208 (EP,KR,US);
G06F2203/04102 (KR,US);
G06F2203/04103 (EP,KR,US);
G06F2203/04107 (KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/42] | B23B27/06, B32B7/02, G06F3/041 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/42] | Title | German: | MEHRSCHICHTIGE, TRANSPARENTE UND LEITFÄHIGE ANORDNUNG | [2016/42] | English: | TRANSPARENT CONDUCTIVE MULTILAYER ASSEMBLY | [2016/42] | French: | ASSEMBLAGE MULTICOUCHE CONDUCTEUR TRANSPARENT | [2016/42] | Entry into regional phase | 08.06.2016 | National basic fee paid | 08.06.2016 | Search fee paid | 08.06.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.06.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.06.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.06.2016 | Examination requested [2016/42] | 15.02.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/34] | 05.04.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2017 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO0225324 (CPFILMS INC [US]) [X] 1 * claim 1 * * figure 1A * * page 1, line 1 - line 3 * * page 11, line 15 - line 25 * [I] 8,11; | [XYI]JP2004181975 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC) [X] 1,2,4,5 * paragraph [0261] - paragraph [0264]; example 3 * * paragraph [0231]; example 1 * * paragraph [0135] * * paragraph [0198] * [Y] 3 [I] 6,8,10,12; | [XYI]WO2006115325 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR], et al) [X] 1 * figure 16 * * paragraph [0137] * * claim 11 * * paragraph [0157] * * figure 18 * * paragraph [0092] * [Y] 3 [I] 8,13; | [XI]US2009273581 (KIM SHIN WOOK [KR], et al) [X] 1 * figure 2 * * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0060] * [I] 7,8; | [A]WO2013067418 (CAMBRIOS TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [A] 1-15 * figure 2B ** page 9, line 5 - line 16 *; | [XI]CN103345007 (NANCHANG O FILM TECH CO LTD) [X] 1,9 * figures 1,2 * * paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0040] * [I] 8 | International search | [A]JP2001147777 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD); | [A]WO03046616 (BEKAERT SA NV [BE]); | [X]JP2006189783 (BRIDGESTONE CORP); | [A]US2011012845 (ROTHKOPF FLETCHER R [US], et al); | [A]US2012229746 (NIRMAL MANOJ [US], et al); | [Y]US2013236697 (WALKER JR CHRISTOPHER B [US], et al); | [A]KR20130119256 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) |