06.09.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] |
14.06.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] |
27.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] |
23.06.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] |
16.06.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.07.2023 [2023/29] |
16.12.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.01.2023 [2023/03] |
02.12.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.01.2023 [2023/01] |
28.10.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.11.2022 [2022/48] |
21.10.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.11.2022 [2022/47] |
14.10.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.11.2022 [2022/46] |
05.08.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.09.2022 [2022/36] |
15.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] |
01.07.2022 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] |
17.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.07.2022 [2022/29] |
27.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.06.2022 [2022/26] |
13.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.06.2022 [2022/24] |
22.04.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.05.2022 [2022/21] |
18.03.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.04.2022 [2022/16] |
18.02.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.03.2022 [2022/12] |
11.02.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.03.2022 [2022/11] |
04.02.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.03.2022 [2022/10] |
28.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.03.2022 [2022/09] |
21.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.02.2022 [2022/08] |
14.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.02.2022 [2022/07] |
23.07.2021 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] |
21.07.2021 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
16.07.2021 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
16.07.2021 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
22.04.2021 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
26.03.2021 |
Change - German title |
published on 28.04.2021 [2021/17] |
25.12.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.12.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.01.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.06.2018 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
11.05.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
27.04.2018 |
First examination report |
|
08.01.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.07.2017 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
24.02.2017 |
Change - extension states |
published on 29.03.2017 [2017/13] |
11.01.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.12.2016 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 28.12.2016 [2016/52] |
25.11.2016 |
Change - classification |
published on 28.12.2016 [2016/52] |
25.11.2016 |
Change - classification |
published on 28.12.2016 [2016/52] |
26.08.2016 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 28.09.2016 [2016/39] |
26.08.2016 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 28.09.2016 [2016/39] |
17.08.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.07.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.06.2016 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
25.06.2016 |
Change - representative |
|
25.06.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.07.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.06.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|