Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10768960 | Global Dossier | 08.09.2020 | B2 | US2016306647 | 20.10.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014CN93686 | 12.12.2014 | CN201310716755 | 20.12.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6257778B | Global Dossier | 10.01.2018 | B2 | JP2017504109 | 02.02.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014CN93686 | 12.12.2014 | CN201310716755 | 20.12.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3073373 | Global Dossier | 25.08.2021 | B1 | EP3073373 | 28.12.2016 | A4 | EP3073373 | 28.09.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014CN93686 | 12.12.2014 | CN201310716755 | 20.12.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2015090158 | Global Dossier | 25.06.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201310716755 | 20.12.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103699428 | Global Dossier | 02.04.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201310716755 | 20.12.2013 |