Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10159525 | Global Dossier | 25.12.2018 | B2 | US2016317216 | 03.11.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014US63653 | 03.11.2014 | US201361917591 | 18.12.2013 | US201415104766 | 03.11.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6482560B | Global Dossier | 13.03.2019 | B2 | JP2017506919 | 16.03.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014US63653 | 03.11.2014 | US201361917591 | 18.12.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105828734B | Global Dossier | 03.08.2018 | B | CN105828734 | 03.08.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014US63653 | 03.11.2014 | US201361917591 | 18.12.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2932459 | Global Dossier | 04.01.2022 | C | CA2932459 | 25.06.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014US63653 | 03.11.2014 | US201361917591 | 18.12.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3082635 | Global Dossier | 04.05.2022 | B1 | EP3082635 | 18.10.2017 | A4 | EP3082635 | 26.10.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014US63653 | 03.11.2014 | US201361917591 | 18.12.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2015094493 | Global Dossier | 25.06.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361917591 | 18.12.2013 |