Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10302603 | Global Dossier | 28.05.2019 | B2 | US2016313289 | 27.10.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | SE1351525 | 19.12.2013 | WO2014SE51499 | 15.12.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6575946B | Global Dossier | 18.09.2019 | B2 | JP2017501352 | 12.01.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | SE1351525 | 19.12.2013 | WO2014SE51499 | 15.12.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105829884B | Global Dossier | 08.03.2019 | B | CN105829884 | 03.08.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | SE1351525 | 19.12.2013 | WO2014SE51499 | 15.12.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3084421 | Global Dossier | 27.02.2019 | B1 | EP3084421 | 21.06.2017 | A4 | EP3084421 | 26.10.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | SE1351525 | 19.12.2013 | WO2014SE51499 | 15.12.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2015094095 | Global Dossier | 25.06.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | SE1351525 | 19.12.2013 |