EP3085813 - PLATED STEEL SHEET FOR HOT PRESS FORMING HAVING EXCELLENT WELDABILITY AND CORROSION RESISTANCE, FORMING MEMBER, AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.01.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.02.2021 [2021/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states POSCO (Goedong-dong) 6261 Donghaean-ro Nam-gu, Pohang-si Gyeongsangbuk-do 790-300 / KR | [2016/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Myung-Soo c/o Gwangyang Iron & Steel Works 20-26 Pokposarang-gil Gwangyang-si, Jeollanam-do 545-711 / KR | 02 /
HWANG, Hyeon-Seok c/o Gwangyang Iron & Steel Works 20-26 Pokposarang-gil Gwangyang-si, Jeollanam-do 545-711 / KR | 03 /
KWAK, Young-Jin c/o Gwangyang Iron & Steel Works 20-26 Pokposarang-gil Gwangyang-si, Jeollanam-do 545-711 / KR | [2016/43] | Representative(s) | Zech, Stefan Markus Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [2016/43] | Application number, filing date | 14872120.2 | 12.12.2014 | [2016/43] | WO2014KR12273 | Priority number, date | KR20130160776 | 20.12.2013 Original published format: KR 20130160776 | [2016/43] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015093793 | Date: | 25.06.2015 | Language: | KO | [2015/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3085813 | Date: | 26.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 25.06.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C23C28/02, C23C28/00, C23C2/12, C23C2/28, C23C14/14, B21D22/02, B32B15/01, C22C38/00, C22C38/02, C22C38/04, C22C38/22, C22C38/24, C22C38/26, C22C38/28, C22C38/32, C22C38/38, C22C38/60 | [2017/23] | CPC: |
C23C28/021 (EP,US);
C23C28/02 (KR);
B21D22/022 (US);
B32B15/011 (EP,US);
B32B15/012 (EP,US);
C22C38/001 (EP,US);
C22C38/02 (EP,US);
C22C38/04 (EP,US);
C22C38/22 (EP,US);
C22C38/24 (EP,US);
C22C38/26 (EP,US);
C22C38/28 (EP,US);
C22C38/32 (EP,US);
C22C38/38 (EP,US);
C22C38/60 (EP,US);
C23C14/14 (EP,US);
C23C2/12 (EP,US);
C23C2/28 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/04] | C23C28/02, C23C28/00, C23C2/12, C23C2/28, C23C14/14 | ||
Former IPC [2016/43] | C23C28/00, C23C30/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/43] | Title | German: | BESCHICHTETES STAHLBLECH FÜR HEISSPRESSFORMEN MIT HERVORRAGENDER SCHWEISSBARKEIT UND KORROSIONSBESTÄNDIGKEIT, FORMUNGSELEMENT UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2016/43] | English: | PLATED STEEL SHEET FOR HOT PRESS FORMING HAVING EXCELLENT WELDABILITY AND CORROSION RESISTANCE, FORMING MEMBER, AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREOF | [2016/43] | French: | TÔLE EN ACIER PLAQUÉ POUR FORMAGE PAR PRESSE À CHAUD AYANT D'EXCELLENTES SOUDABILITÉ ET RÉSISTANCE À LA CORROSION, ÉLÉMENT DE FORMAGE ET PROCÉDÉ POUR SA FABRICATION | [2016/43] | Entry into regional phase | 13.06.2016 | Translation filed | 13.06.2016 | National basic fee paid | 13.06.2016 | Search fee paid | 13.06.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.06.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.06.2016 | Examination requested [2016/43] | 08.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/07] | 25.09.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3268422 (SMITH EDWIN J, et al) [A] 1-5,12,13 * claim 1 *; | [A]JPH051388 (SUMITOMO METAL IND) [A] 1-5,12,13 * Example;; claims 1 - 3 *; | [XAYI]JPH05202488 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [X] 1,2,4,5,12 * Working Example; paragraphs [014 ] - [0 28]; figure 1 * [A] 6-11 [Y] 13 [I] 3; | [YA]JPH07252623 (SUMITOMO METAL IND) [Y] 13 * paragraphs [0029] , [0 30] , [ 35 ] - [0 37] - [0 40] , [0 42]; claim 1; table 2 * [A] 6-11; | [XI]WO2013132816 (JFE STEEL CORP [JP]) [X] 14 * paragraphs [0014] , [0 15] , [0 39] , [0 40] * [I] 15; | [XPI]EP2808417 (JFE STEEL CORP [JP]) [XP] 14 * paragraphs [0014] , [0 15] , [0 39] , [0 40] *[I] 15 | International search | [Y]JPH05202488 (NIPPON STEEL CORP); | [Y]KR960009193B (KOREA RES ASS NEW IRON & STEEL [KR]); | [A]KR960009194B (KOREA RES ASS NEW IRON & STEEL [KR]); | [A]KR960009192B (KOREA RES ASS NEW IRON & STEEL [KR]); | [A]JP2006299377 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) | by applicant | US6296805 | JP2006022395 |