EP3083008 - PROCESS AND APPARATUS FOR CLEANING RAW PRODUCT GAS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.03.2023 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.04.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.12.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Renergi Pty Ltd. 95 Hay Street Suite 5 Subiaco, Western Australia 6008 / AU | [2016/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Chun-Zhu 10 Albion Street Cottesloe, Western Australia 6011 / AU | 02 /
GUNAWAN, Richard 2/56 Oats Street East Victoria Park, Western Australia 6101 / AU | 03 /
DONG, Li 6 Mistral Place Willetton, Western Australia 6155 / AU | [2016/43] | Representative(s) | Herrmann, Jochen, et al Herrmann Patentanwälte Königstrasse 30 70173 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/43] | Herrmann, Jochen, et al Herrmann Patentanwälte Königstrasse 30 70173 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 14872814.0 | 16.12.2014 | [2016/43] | WO2014AU01135 | Priority number, date | AU20130904914 | 16.12.2013 Original published format: AU 2013904914 | [2016/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015089554 | Date: | 25.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3083008 | Date: | 26.10.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3083008 | Date: | 11.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 25.06.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/00, C01B3/50, C10K1/04, C10K1/20, C10K1/34 | [2016/43] | CPC: |
C01B3/58 (EP,US);
B01D53/04 (EP,US);
C01B3/56 (EP,US);
C10J3/06 (EP,US);
C10J3/58 (US);
C10J3/84 (US);
C10K1/046 (EP,US);
C10K1/32 (EP,US);
B01D2253/102 (EP,US);
B01D2255/20738 (US);
B01D2255/20753 (US);
B01D2257/304 (EP,US);
B01D2257/406 (EP,US);
B01D2257/408 (EP,US);
B01D2257/7027 (US);
C01B2203/0227 (EP,US);
C01B2203/042 (EP,US);
C01B2203/0435 (EP,US);
C01B2203/0465 (EP,US);
C01B2203/048 (EP,US);
C01B2203/0883 (US);
C01B2203/1047 (US);
C01B2203/1058 (US);
C01B2203/1082 (US);
C01B2203/146 (US);
C10J2300/0916 (EP,US);
C10J2300/093 (EP,US);
C10J2300/094 (US);
C10J2300/1618 (EP,US);
C10J2300/1853 (EP,US);
Y02P20/129 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR REINIGUNG VON ROHSTOFFGAS | [2016/43] | English: | PROCESS AND APPARATUS FOR CLEANING RAW PRODUCT GAS | [2016/43] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR ÉPURER UN PRODUIT BRUT GAZEUX | [2016/43] | Entry into regional phase | 18.07.2016 | National basic fee paid | 18.07.2016 | Search fee paid | 18.07.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.07.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.07.2016 | Examination requested [2016/43] | 12.02.2017 | Observations by third parties | 10.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.08.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 31.03.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.03.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 14.02.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.12.2014 | AL | 11.05.2022 | AT | 11.05.2022 | CY | 11.05.2022 | CZ | 11.05.2022 | DK | 11.05.2022 | EE | 11.05.2022 | FI | 11.05.2022 | HR | 11.05.2022 | LT | 11.05.2022 | LV | 11.05.2022 | MC | 11.05.2022 | MK | 11.05.2022 | MT | 11.05.2022 | PL | 11.05.2022 | RO | 11.05.2022 | RS | 11.05.2022 | SE | 11.05.2022 | SI | 11.05.2022 | SK | 11.05.2022 | SM | 11.05.2022 | BG | 11.08.2022 | NO | 11.08.2022 | GR | 12.08.2022 | IS | 11.09.2022 | PT | 12.09.2022 | IE | 16.12.2022 | LU | 16.12.2022 | BE | 31.12.2022 | CH | 31.12.2022 | LI | 31.12.2022 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 16.12.2014 | |
AL | 11.05.2022 | ||
AT | 11.05.2022 | ||
CY | 11.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2022 | ||
DK | 11.05.2022 | ||
EE | 11.05.2022 | ||
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
MC | 11.05.2022 | ||
MK | 11.05.2022 | ||
PL | 11.05.2022 | ||
RO | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
SI | 11.05.2022 | ||
SK | 11.05.2022 | ||
SM | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
GR | 12.08.2022 | ||
IS | 11.09.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
IE | 16.12.2022 | ||
LU | 16.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/27] | HU | 16.12.2014 | |
AL | 11.05.2022 | ||
AT | 11.05.2022 | ||
CY | 11.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2022 | ||
DK | 11.05.2022 | ||
EE | 11.05.2022 | ||
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
MK | 11.05.2022 | ||
PL | 11.05.2022 | ||
RO | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
SI | 11.05.2022 | ||
SK | 11.05.2022 | ||
SM | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
GR | 12.08.2022 | ||
IS | 11.09.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
IE | 16.12.2022 | ||
LU | 16.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 16.12.2014 | |
AL | 11.05.2022 | ||
AT | 11.05.2022 | ||
CY | 11.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2022 | ||
DK | 11.05.2022 | ||
EE | 11.05.2022 | ||
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
PL | 11.05.2022 | ||
RO | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
SI | 11.05.2022 | ||
SK | 11.05.2022 | ||
SM | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
GR | 12.08.2022 | ||
IS | 11.09.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
IE | 16.12.2022 | ||
LU | 16.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 16.12.2014 | |
AL | 11.05.2022 | ||
AT | 11.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2022 | ||
DK | 11.05.2022 | ||
EE | 11.05.2022 | ||
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
PL | 11.05.2022 | ||
RO | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
SI | 11.05.2022 | ||
SK | 11.05.2022 | ||
SM | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
GR | 12.08.2022 | ||
IS | 11.09.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
IE | 16.12.2022 | ||
LU | 16.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AL | 11.05.2022 | |
AT | 11.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2022 | ||
DK | 11.05.2022 | ||
EE | 11.05.2022 | ||
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
PL | 11.05.2022 | ||
RO | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
SI | 11.05.2022 | ||
SK | 11.05.2022 | ||
SM | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
GR | 12.08.2022 | ||
IS | 11.09.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
IE | 16.12.2022 | ||
LU | 16.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 11.05.2022 | |
AT | 11.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2022 | ||
DK | 11.05.2022 | ||
EE | 11.05.2022 | ||
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
PL | 11.05.2022 | ||
RO | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
SI | 11.05.2022 | ||
SK | 11.05.2022 | ||
SM | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
GR | 12.08.2022 | ||
IS | 11.09.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
IE | 16.12.2022 | ||
LU | 16.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/47] | AL | 11.05.2022 | |
AT | 11.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2022 | ||
DK | 11.05.2022 | ||
EE | 11.05.2022 | ||
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
PL | 11.05.2022 | ||
RO | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
SI | 11.05.2022 | ||
SK | 11.05.2022 | ||
SM | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
GR | 12.08.2022 | ||
IS | 11.09.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
LU | 16.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 11.05.2022 | |
AT | 11.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2022 | ||
DK | 11.05.2022 | ||
EE | 11.05.2022 | ||
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
PL | 11.05.2022 | ||
RO | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
SI | 11.05.2022 | ||
SK | 11.05.2022 | ||
SM | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
GR | 12.08.2022 | ||
IS | 11.09.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
LU | 16.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 11.05.2022 | |
AT | 11.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2022 | ||
DK | 11.05.2022 | ||
EE | 11.05.2022 | ||
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
PL | 11.05.2022 | ||
RO | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
SI | 11.05.2022 | ||
SK | 11.05.2022 | ||
SM | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
GR | 12.08.2022 | ||
IS | 11.09.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 11.05.2022 | |
AT | 11.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2022 | ||
DK | 11.05.2022 | ||
EE | 11.05.2022 | ||
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
PL | 11.05.2022 | ||
RO | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
SK | 11.05.2022 | ||
SM | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
GR | 12.08.2022 | ||
IS | 11.09.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 11.05.2022 | |
CZ | 11.05.2022 | ||
DK | 11.05.2022 | ||
EE | 11.05.2022 | ||
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
PL | 11.05.2022 | ||
RO | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
SK | 11.05.2022 | ||
SM | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
GR | 12.08.2022 | ||
IS | 11.09.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 11.05.2022 | |
DK | 11.05.2022 | ||
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
PL | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
GR | 12.08.2022 | ||
IS | 11.09.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | AT | 11.05.2022 | |
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
PL | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
GR | 12.08.2022 | ||
IS | 11.09.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | AT | 11.05.2022 | |
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
PL | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
GR | 12.08.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 11.05.2022 | |
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
GR | 12.08.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 11.05.2022 | |
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4104149 (VEINERMAN ELLIOT, et al) [Y] 4,9* column 1, lines 53-64 *; | [YA]JP2005154722 (KOBAYASHI YOSHIO, et al) [Y] 1-4,8-10,12-15 * paragraphs [0021] - [0024] - [0026] , [0028] , [0029] , [0032] , [0048]; figures 1,2 * [A] 5-7,11; | [YA]US2010228062 (BABICKI MATTHEW L [CA], et al) [Y] 1-4,8,9,12-15 * figure 1 * [A] 5-7,10,11; | [XAYI]WO2012012823 (UNIV CURTIN TECH [AU], et al) [X] 1-3,8,11,14,15 * pages 10-12,15; figures 1,2 * [A] 5-7,10 [Y] 4,9 [I] 12,13; | [YA]US2013153826 (PAQUET ANTONIN [CA], et al) [Y] 1-4,8-10,12,13 * paragraphs [0091] - [0093]; figure 5 * [A] 5-7,11,14,15 | International search | [A]US6015450 (JOSHI GIRISH CHIMANLAL [US], et al); | [A]US2011126460 (BROMBERG LESLIE [US], et al); | [A]US2013058856 (YUAN WENQIAO [US], et al); | [A]WO2013049368 (THERMOCHEM RECOVERY INT INC [US]) | by applicant | WO2012012823 |