EP3082477 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR COMPUTER MODELS OF ANIMAL FEED [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.09.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alltech, Inc. 3031 Catnip Hill Pike Nicholasville, KY 40356 / US | [2016/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCKINNEY, Kyle 2400 Dogwood Trace Blvd. Lexington, KY 40514 / US | 02 /
LOVELL, Allyson 1383 Strawberry Lane Lexington, KY 40502 / US | 03 /
HENRY, Benjamin 485 Warriors Way Shelbyville, KY 40065 / US | 04 /
BECKER, Patrick 3701 White Pine Drive Lexington, KY 40514 / US | 05 /
TIMMONS, Rebecca, A. 1830 Mcdonald Avenue Lexington, KY 40503 / US | [2016/43] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2016/43] | Application number, filing date | 14873058.3 | 11.02.2014 | [2016/43] | WO2014US15740 | Priority number, date | US201314109926 | 17.12.2013 Original published format: US201314109926 | [2016/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015094391 | Date: | 25.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3082477 | Date: | 26.10.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3082477 | Date: | 03.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.06.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A23N17/00, G01N21/359, A23K10/14, A23K50/75, A23K50/30, G16H50/50, G16C20/30 | [2023/41] | CPC: |
G16C20/30 (EP,KR,US);
A23K10/14 (EP,KR,US);
A23K50/30 (EP,KR,US);
A23K50/75 (EP,KR,US);
G01N21/359 (EP,KR,US);
G01N21/68 (KR,US);
G16H50/50 (EP,US);
G01N2201/129 (EP,KR,US);
G16C20/20 (EP,US);
G16C20/70 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/08] | G06F19/00, A23N17/00 | ||
Former IPC [2016/43] | A23N17/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN FÜR COMPUTERMODELLE VON TIERFUTTER | [2016/43] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR COMPUTER MODELS OF ANIMAL FEED | [2016/43] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR MODÈLES INFORMATIQUES D'ALIMENTATION ANIMALE | [2016/43] | Entry into regional phase | 13.06.2016 | National basic fee paid | 13.06.2016 | Search fee paid | 13.06.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.06.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.06.2016 | Examination requested [2016/43] | 14.08.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.08.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 04.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.08.2021 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 03.04.2024 | [2024/44] | Documents cited: | Search | [XI] - CORSON D. C. ET AL, "NIRS: Forage analysis and livestock feeding", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NEW ZEALAND GRASSLAND ASSOCIATION, (19990101), vol. 61, pages 127 - 132, XP055439395 [X] 1,2,5-7 * the whole document * [I] 3,4 | [XI] - FOSTER J. G. ET AL, "Quantification of Fatty Acids in Forages by Near-Infrared Reflectance Spectroscopy", JOURNAL OF AGRICULTURAL AND FOOD CHEMISTRY, (20060408), vol. 54, no. 9, doi:10.1021/jf052398u, ISSN 0021-8561, pages 3186 - 3192, XP055439112 [X] 1,2,5-7 * the whole document * [I] 3,4 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jf052398u | [A] - DOWMAN M. G. ET AL, "The use of enzymes to predict the digestibility of animal feeds", JOURNAL OF THE SCIENCE OF FOOD AND AGRICULTURE, GB, (19820801), vol. 33, no. 8, doi:10.1002/jsfa.2740330802, ISSN 0022-5142, pages 689 - 696, XP055439838 [A] 3 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jsfa.2740330802 | International search | [A]WO8302158 (BUDAPESTI MUESZAKI EGYETEM [HU], et al); | [A]US2003028328 (JULIA THIERRY [FR], et al); | [A]US2005000457 (BECK JAMES F [US]); | [A]US2009061055 (NEWCOMB MARK D [US], et al); | [Y]US2012114770 (REGINA AHMED [AU], et al); | [X]US2012271449 (WEAKLEY DAVID [US]) | Examination | US6008053 | by applicant | US2003028328 | US2012271449 | - CORSON, D.C. et al., "NIRS: Forage analysis and livestock feeding", Proceedings of the New Zealand Grassland Association, (19990000), vol. 61, pages 127 - 132, XP055439395 | - FOSTER, J.G. et al., "Quantification of Fatty Acids in Forages by Near-Infrared Reflectance Spectroscopy", Journal of Agricultural and Food Chemistry, (20060000), vol. 54, no. 9, doi:10.1021/jf052398u, pages 3186 - 3192, XP055439112 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jf052398u | - DOWMAN, M.G. et al., "The use of enzymes to predict the digestibility of animal feeds", Journal of the Science of Food and Agriculture, (19820000), vol. 33, no. 8, doi:10.1002/jsfa.2740330802, pages 689 - 696, XP055439838 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jsfa.2740330802 |