EP3094848 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR FUEL INJECTION AND DYNAMIC COMBUSTION CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.12.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.01.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.12.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.10.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.06.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Westport Power Inc. 1750 West 75th Avenue Suite 101 Vancouver, BC V6P 6G2 / CA | [2016/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FEI, Wei 8822 Erin Avenue Burnaby, British Columbia V3N 4E9 / CA | 02 /
WALKER, James D. 19 Christ Church Road Malvern, Worcestershire WR14 3BH / GB | 03 /
MCTAGGART-COWAN, Gordon P. 503 - 2851 Heather Street Vancouver, British Columbia V1B 3A3 / CA | 04 /
MANN, Kenneth R. 406 - 5775 Hampton Place Vancouver, British Columbia V6T 2G6 / CA | [2021/05] |
Former [2016/47] | 01 /
FEI, Wei 8822 Erin Avenue Burnaby, British Columbia V3N 4E9 / CA | ||
02 /
WALKER, James D. 19 Christ Church Road Malvern Worcestershire WR14 3BH / GB | |||
03 /
MCTAGGART-COWAN, Gordon P. 503 - 2851 Heather Street Vancouver, British Columbia V1B 3A3 / CA | |||
04 /
MANN, Kenneth R. 406 - 5775 Hampton Place Vancouver, British Columbia V6T 2G6 / CA | Representative(s) | Beyer, Andreas Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/47] | Beyer, Andreas Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14873596.2 | 16.12.2014 | [2016/47] | WO2014CA51219 | Priority number, date | CA20132838120 | 23.12.2013 Original published format: CA 2838120 | [2016/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015095955 | Date: | 02.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3094848 | Date: | 23.11.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.07.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3094848 | Date: | 03.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 02.07.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F02D19/08, F02M25/00, F02M43/00 | [2016/47] | CPC: |
F02D19/061 (EP,US);
F02D19/0689 (EP,US);
F02D19/0694 (EP,US);
F02D19/10 (EP,US);
F02D35/025 (EP,US);
F02D41/0025 (EP,US);
F02D41/0027 (EP,US);
F02D41/3011 (EP,US);
F02D41/3064 (EP,US);
F02D41/401 (EP,US);
F02D41/403 (EP,US);
F02B43/00 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BRENNSTOFFEINSPRITZUNG UND DYNAMISCHE VERBRENNUNGSSTEUERUNG | [2016/47] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR FUEL INJECTION AND DYNAMIC COMBUSTION CONTROL | [2016/47] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL D'INJECTION DE CARBURANT ET DE COMMANDE DYNAMIQUE DE LA COMBUSTION | [2016/47] | Entry into regional phase | 13.07.2016 | National basic fee paid | 13.07.2016 | Search fee paid | 13.07.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.07.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.07.2016 | Examination requested [2016/47] | 04.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 16.10.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 16.10.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.12.2020 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 18.12.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 04.11.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.12.2014 | AL | 03.02.2021 | AT | 03.02.2021 | CY | 03.02.2021 | CZ | 03.02.2021 | DK | 03.02.2021 | EE | 03.02.2021 | ES | 03.02.2021 | FI | 03.02.2021 | HR | 03.02.2021 | IT | 03.02.2021 | LT | 03.02.2021 | LV | 03.02.2021 | MC | 03.02.2021 | MK | 03.02.2021 | MT | 03.02.2021 | NL | 03.02.2021 | PL | 03.02.2021 | RO | 03.02.2021 | RS | 03.02.2021 | SE | 03.02.2021 | SI | 03.02.2021 | SK | 03.02.2021 | SM | 03.02.2021 | BG | 03.05.2021 | NO | 03.05.2021 | GR | 04.05.2021 | IS | 03.06.2021 | PT | 04.06.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 16.12.2014 | |
AL | 03.02.2021 | ||
AT | 03.02.2021 | ||
CY | 03.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.02.2021 | ||
DK | 03.02.2021 | ||
EE | 03.02.2021 | ||
ES | 03.02.2021 | ||
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
IT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
MC | 03.02.2021 | ||
MK | 03.02.2021 | ||
NL | 03.02.2021 | ||
PL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RO | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
SI | 03.02.2021 | ||
SK | 03.02.2021 | ||
SM | 03.02.2021 | ||
BG | 03.05.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
IS | 03.06.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 16.12.2014 | |
AL | 03.02.2021 | ||
AT | 03.02.2021 | ||
CY | 03.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.02.2021 | ||
DK | 03.02.2021 | ||
EE | 03.02.2021 | ||
ES | 03.02.2021 | ||
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
IT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
MC | 03.02.2021 | ||
NL | 03.02.2021 | ||
PL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RO | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
SI | 03.02.2021 | ||
SK | 03.02.2021 | ||
SM | 03.02.2021 | ||
BG | 03.05.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
IS | 03.06.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 16.12.2014 | |
AL | 03.02.2021 | ||
AT | 03.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.02.2021 | ||
DK | 03.02.2021 | ||
EE | 03.02.2021 | ||
ES | 03.02.2021 | ||
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
IT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
MC | 03.02.2021 | ||
NL | 03.02.2021 | ||
PL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RO | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
SI | 03.02.2021 | ||
SK | 03.02.2021 | ||
SM | 03.02.2021 | ||
BG | 03.05.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
IS | 03.06.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 03.02.2021 | |
AT | 03.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.02.2021 | ||
DK | 03.02.2021 | ||
EE | 03.02.2021 | ||
ES | 03.02.2021 | ||
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
IT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
MC | 03.02.2021 | ||
NL | 03.02.2021 | ||
PL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RO | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
SI | 03.02.2021 | ||
SK | 03.02.2021 | ||
SM | 03.02.2021 | ||
BG | 03.05.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
IS | 03.06.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 03.02.2021 | |
AT | 03.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.02.2021 | ||
DK | 03.02.2021 | ||
EE | 03.02.2021 | ||
ES | 03.02.2021 | ||
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
IT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
NL | 03.02.2021 | ||
PL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RO | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
SI | 03.02.2021 | ||
SK | 03.02.2021 | ||
SM | 03.02.2021 | ||
BG | 03.05.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
IS | 03.06.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/13] | AL | 03.02.2021 | |
AT | 03.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.02.2021 | ||
DK | 03.02.2021 | ||
EE | 03.02.2021 | ||
ES | 03.02.2021 | ||
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
NL | 03.02.2021 | ||
PL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RO | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
SI | 03.02.2021 | ||
SK | 03.02.2021 | ||
SM | 03.02.2021 | ||
BG | 03.05.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 03.02.2021 | |
AT | 03.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.02.2021 | ||
DK | 03.02.2021 | ||
EE | 03.02.2021 | ||
ES | 03.02.2021 | ||
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
NL | 03.02.2021 | ||
PL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RO | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
SK | 03.02.2021 | ||
SM | 03.02.2021 | ||
BG | 03.05.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 03.02.2021 | |
AT | 03.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.02.2021 | ||
DK | 03.02.2021 | ||
EE | 03.02.2021 | ||
ES | 03.02.2021 | ||
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
NL | 03.02.2021 | ||
PL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RO | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
SK | 03.02.2021 | ||
SM | 03.02.2021 | ||
BG | 03.05.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
IS | 03.06.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 03.02.2021 | |
CZ | 03.02.2021 | ||
DK | 03.02.2021 | ||
EE | 03.02.2021 | ||
ES | 03.02.2021 | ||
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
NL | 03.02.2021 | ||
PL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RO | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
SK | 03.02.2021 | ||
SM | 03.02.2021 | ||
BG | 03.05.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
IS | 03.06.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 03.02.2021 | |
CZ | 03.02.2021 | ||
DK | 03.02.2021 | ||
EE | 03.02.2021 | ||
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
NL | 03.02.2021 | ||
PL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RO | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
SK | 03.02.2021 | ||
SM | 03.02.2021 | ||
BG | 03.05.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
IS | 03.06.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 03.02.2021 | |
CZ | 03.02.2021 | ||
DK | 03.02.2021 | ||
EE | 03.02.2021 | ||
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
NL | 03.02.2021 | ||
PL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
SM | 03.02.2021 | ||
BG | 03.05.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
IS | 03.06.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 03.02.2021 | |
CZ | 03.02.2021 | ||
EE | 03.02.2021 | ||
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
NL | 03.02.2021 | ||
PL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
SM | 03.02.2021 | ||
BG | 03.05.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
IS | 03.06.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 03.02.2021 | |
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
NL | 03.02.2021 | ||
PL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
SM | 03.02.2021 | ||
BG | 03.05.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
IS | 03.06.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | AT | 03.02.2021 | |
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
NL | 03.02.2021 | ||
PL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
BG | 03.05.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
IS | 03.06.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/39] | AT | 03.02.2021 | |
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
NL | 03.02.2021 | ||
PL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
BG | 03.05.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/38] | AT | 03.02.2021 | |
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
NL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
BG | 03.05.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 03.02.2021 | |
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
BG | 03.05.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 03.02.2021 | |
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
BG | 03.05.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 03.02.2021 | |
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 03.02.2021 | |
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6202601 (OUELLETTE PATRIC [CA], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 4, line 18 - column 8, line 42; figures 1-6 *; | [XYI]WO0159285 (WESTPORT RES INC [CA], et al) [X] 1,8 * page 17, line 3 - page 18, line 12; figures 5-6b * [Y] 5-7,12-15 [I] 2-4,9-11; | [XAY]WO0159280 (WESTPORT RES INC [CA], et al) [X] 1,8 * page 12, line 15 - page 16, line 24; figures 2-4b * [A] 2-4,9-11 [Y] 5-7,12-15; | [A]CA2767247 (WESTPORT POWER INC [CA]) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0008]; figures 1-3a * | International search | [A]US6386149 (COLEMAN GERALD N [US], et al); | [A]US7657361 (INOUE MIKIO [JP], et al); | [A]US8412439 (WARNER NICK [GB], et al); | [A]CA2853740 (EHT PATENTS AND LICENSING LTD [GB]); | [A]US8874351 (JIANG LI [US], et al) | Examination | US2004118557 | by applicant | WO0159285 | WO0159280 | US6640773 |