EP3087627 - BATTERY PACK HAVING A SPRING TO CONNECT AT LEAST TWO BATTERY CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2016/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ADRE, Norman U. 17735 NW Fall Ct Beaverton, Oregon 97006 / US | 02 /
MATSUMURA, Naoki 5286 Gatewood Lane San Jose, California 95118 / US | [2016/44] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/44] | HGF Limited Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | Application number, filing date | 14873944.4 | 26.11.2014 | [2016/44] | WO2014US67610 | Priority number, date | US201314142587 | 27.12.2013 Original published format: US201314142587 | [2016/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015099948 | Date: | 02.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3087627 | Date: | 02.11.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.07.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 02.07.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H01M2/20, H01M2/10, H01M2/34, H01M10/42 | [2017/34] | CPC: |
H01M10/425 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/502 (KR);
G06F1/188 (KR,US);
H01M10/6557 (KR);
H01M50/20 (KR);
H01M50/213 (EP,US);
H01M50/247 (EP,US);
H01M50/284 (EP,US);
H01M50/289 (EP,US);
H01M50/51 (EP,US);
H01M50/519 (EP,US);
H05K1/11 (KR,US);
H01M2010/4271 (EP,KR,US);
H01M2220/30 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/516 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP,KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/44] | H01M2/20, H01M2/10, H01M2/34 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/44] | Title | German: | BATTERIEPACK MIT EINER FEDER ZUM VERBINDEN VON MINDESTENS ZWEI BATTERIEZELLEN | [2016/44] | English: | BATTERY PACK HAVING A SPRING TO CONNECT AT LEAST TWO BATTERY CELLS | [2016/44] | French: | BATTERIE POURVUE D'UN RESSORT POUR CONNECTER AU MOINS DEUX ÉLÉMENTS DE BATTERIE | [2016/44] | Entry into regional phase | 23.05.2016 | National basic fee paid | 23.05.2016 | Search fee paid | 23.05.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.05.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.05.2016 | Examination requested [2016/44] | 19.02.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.08.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/33] | 05.02.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2019 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB214377 (EFANDEM CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-15* page 1, column right, line 81 - page 2, column right, line 76 *; | [A]US5169733 (SAVOVIC NIKO M [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * column 2, line 40 - column 3, line 57 *; | [XAI]US2011311858 (LIM SEUNG-JU [KR]) [X] 1-5,7-9,13-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0079]; figures 1-7 * [A] 6 [I] 10-12 | International search | [A]JP2003223876 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO); | [Y]US6929879 (YAMAZAKI MASATO [JP]); | [A]KR20080042960 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]); | [A]US2009068555 (FUKUOKA TAKAHIRO [JP], et al); | [X]US2011311858 (LIM SEUNG-JU [KR]) |