EP3088291 - VERTICAL FUEL TANK AND SUPPORT STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.02.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.05.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.03.2020 [2020/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kawasaki Jukogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 1-1, Higashikawasaki-cho 3-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 650-8670 / JP | [2016/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KADA, Kazuo c/o KAWASAKI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Higashikawasaki-cho 3-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 650-8670 / JP | 02 /
SHIMIZU, Yusuke c/o KAWASAKI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Higashikawasaki-cho 3-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 650-8670 / JP | 03 /
HASEGAWA, Yuta c/o KAWASAKI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Higashikawasaki-cho 3-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 650-8670 / JP | [2016/44] | Representative(s) | Leinweber & Zimmermann Patentanwalts-PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Viktualienmarkt 8 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/44] | Leinweber & Zimmermann Rosental 7, II. Aufgang 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14873993.1 | 19.12.2014 | [2016/44] | WO2014JP06347 | Priority number, date | JP20130270643 | 27.12.2013 Original published format: JP 2013270643 | [2016/44] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015098069 | Date: | 02.07.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3088291 | Date: | 02.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.07.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F17C13/08, // F17C3/00 | [2019/21] | CPC: |
F17C3/00 (EP,KR);
B63B17/0027 (KR);
B63B11/04 (KR);
B63B25/16 (EP,KR);
F17C2201/0109 (EP,KR);
F17C2201/032 (EP,KR);
F17C2201/052 (EP,KR);
F17C2203/03 (EP,KR);
F17C2203/0604 (EP,KR);
F17C2203/0636 (EP,KR);
F17C2205/018 (EP,KR);
F17C2205/0192 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2016/44] | B63B11/04, B65D90/12, F17C13/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/44] | Title | German: | VERTIKALER KRAFTSTOFFTANK UND STÜTZSTRUKTUR | [2016/44] | English: | VERTICAL FUEL TANK AND SUPPORT STRUCTURE | [2016/44] | French: | RÉSERVOIR DE CARBURANT VERTICAL ET STRUCTURE DE SUPPORT ASSOCIÉE | [2016/44] | Entry into regional phase | 02.06.2016 | Translation filed | 23.06.2016 | National basic fee paid | 23.06.2016 | Search fee paid | 23.06.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.06.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.06.2016 | Examination requested [2016/44] | 19.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/13] | 11.11.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2019 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]AU2012254258 (DAEWOO SHIPBUILDING & MARINE) [X] 1,2,6-8 * page 60 - page 62; figures 40-42 * [I] 3-5; | [XI]US2600015 (MCLAUGHLIN GEORGE F) [X] 1,2,6-8 * columns 1-3; figure 1 * [I] 3-5; | [XI]JP2002274597 (HITACHI SHIPBUILDING ENG CO) [X] 1-3,5-8 * figures 1-4 * [I] 4; | [XI]WO2010020431 (TGE MARINE GAS ENGINEERING GMB [DE], et al) [X] 1,6-8 * page 1; figures 6,8 * [I] 2-5; | [XI]US3270700 (KOHN HAROLD B, et al) [X] 1,4-8 * figures 1-6 * [I] 2,3 | International search | [Y]US3270700 (KOHN HAROLD B, et al); | [Y]JP2006168711 (SNECMA, et al); | [Y]JP2002274597 (HITACHI SHIPBUILDING ENG CO); | [A]JP2013505173 (DAEWOO SHIPBUILDING & MARINE ENGINEERING CO., LTD.); | [A]JPS5336019 (TEIKOKU SANSO KK); | [A]US3312076 (CLARKE JAMES S, et al); | [A]DE102012104634 (MT AEROSPACE AG [DE]) | by applicant | JP2003240198 |