EP3088542 - COPPER ALLOY SHEET MATERIAL, CONNECTOR, AND PRODUCTION METHOD FOR COPPER ALLOY SHEET MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.08.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.09.2018 [2018/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Furukawa Electric Co., Ltd. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2016/44] | For all designated states Furukawa Electric Co., Ltd. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KANEKO, Hiroshi c/o FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO. LTD. 2-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | [2016/44] | Representative(s) | Forstmeyer, Dietmar, et al Boeters & Lieck Oberanger 32 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/44] | Forstmeyer, Dietmar, et al BOETERS & LIECK Oberanger 32 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14874503.7 | 25.12.2014 | [2016/44] | WO2014JP84432 | Priority number, date | JP20130273521 | 27.12.2013 Original published format: JP 2013273521 | [2016/44] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015099098 | Date: | 02.07.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3088542 | Date: | 02.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.07.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C22C9/06, C22C1/02, C22F1/08, B22D21/00, H01B1/02, H01B5/02, H01B13/00 | [2017/33] | CPC: |
C22F1/08 (EP,KR,US);
C22C9/06 (EP,KR,US);
B22D21/005 (EP,US);
C22C1/02 (EP,US);
C22C9/02 (KR);
C22C9/04 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2016/44] | C22C9/06, C22C9/00, C22C9/02, C22C9/04, C22C9/05, C22C9/10, C22F1/08, H01B1/02, H01B5/02, H01B13/00, C22F1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/44] | Title | German: | FOLIENMATERIAL AUS KUPFERLEGIERUNG, VERBINDER UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR FOLIENMATERIAL AUS KUPFERLEGIERUNG | [2016/44] | English: | COPPER ALLOY SHEET MATERIAL, CONNECTOR, AND PRODUCTION METHOD FOR COPPER ALLOY SHEET MATERIAL | [2016/44] | French: | MATÉRIAU EN FEUILLE D'ALLIAGE DE CUIVRE, CONNECTEUR ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DU MATÉRIAU EN FEUILLE D'ALLIAGE DE CUIVRE | [2016/44] | Entry into regional phase | 26.07.2016 | Translation filed | 26.07.2016 | National basic fee paid | 26.07.2016 | Search fee paid | 26.07.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.07.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.07.2016 | Examination requested [2016/44] | 02.02.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2012241056 (SATO KOJI [JP], et al) [X] 1-4 * the whole document * * example 15 * [I] 5-8; | [A]EP2508631 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document * | International search | [A]JP2012122114 (MITSUBISHI SHINDO KK); | [A]WO2011068134 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP], et al); | [A]WO2012150702 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP], et al); | [A]JP2013163853 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD); | [A]JP2012177153 (KOBE STEEL LTD); | [A]WO2012026611 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP], et al) | by applicant | JPS63312937 | JP2002294367 | JP2006152392 | JP2011132594 | WO2011068134 | JP2012122114 | JP2006009108 | JP2009074125 | - HIROSHI INOUE, "Three-dimensional orientation analysis for texture", LIGHT METALS, (1992), pages 358 - 367 | - HIROSHI INOUE ET AL., "Determination of crystal orientation distribution function from incomplete pole figures according to repeated series expansion method", JOURNAL OF JAPAN INSTITUTE OF METALS AND MATERIALS, (1994), vol. 58, pages 892 - 898 | - U. F. KOCKS ET AL., Texture and Anisotropy, CAMBRIDGE UNIVERSITY PRESS, (1998), pages 102 - 125 |