EP3087984 - PROPHYLACTIC AND THERAPEUTIC AGENT FOR ATTENTION-DEFICIT/HYPERACTIVITY DISORDER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.02.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.03.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.11.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujimoto Co., Ltd. 3-40, Nishiotsuka 1-chome Matsubara-shi Osaka 580-0011 / JP | [2016/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOGASHI, Hiroko c/o Health Sciences University of Hokkaido 1757 Kanazawa Tobetsu-cho Ishikari-gun Hokkaido 061-0293 / JP | 02 /
HIRADE, Sachiko c/o Health Sciences University of Hokkaido 1757 Kanazawa Tobetsu-cho Ishikari-gun Hokkaido 061-0293 / JP | 03 /
YONEDA, Fumio c/o FP Pharmaceutical Corp 3-40 Nishiotsuka 1-chome Matsubara-shi Osaka 580-0011 / JP | 04 /
TAKAHATA, Kazue c/o FP Pharmaceutical Corp 3-40 Nishiotsuka 1-chome Matsubara-shi Osaka 580-0011 / JP | [2016/44] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2016/44] | Application number, filing date | 14875426.0 | 15.12.2014 | [2016/44] | WO2014JP83100 | Priority number, date | JP20130266498 | 25.12.2013 Original published format: JP 2013266498 | [2016/44] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015098591 | Date: | 02.07.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3087984 | Date: | 02.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3087984 | Date: | 07.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.07.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/343, A61K31/135, A61K31/137, A61K31/155, A61K31/165, A61K31/4168, A61K31/4458, A61K45/00, A61P25/00, A61K45/06, A61K31/138, A61P25/14 | [2020/49] | CPC: |
A61K31/343 (EP,IL,KR,RU,US);
A61K31/137 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/138 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/165 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/4168 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/4458 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61P25/00 (EP,IL,RU);
A61P25/14 (EP,IL);
A61K2300/00 (IL,KR)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/137, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/138, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/165, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/343, A61K2300/00 (EP,US); |
Former IPC [2017/34] | A61K31/343, A61K31/135, A61K31/137, A61K31/155, A61K31/165, A61K31/4168, A61K31/4458, A61K45/00, A61P25/00, A61K45/06, A61K31/138 | ||
Former IPC [2016/44] | A61K31/343, A61K31/135, A61K31/137, A61K31/155, A61K31/165, A61K31/4168, A61K31/4458, A61K45/00, A61P25/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PROPHYLAKTIKUM ODER THERAPEUTIKUM GEGEN AUFMERKSAMKEITSDEFIZIT-/HYPERAKTIVITÄTSSTÖRUNG | [2016/44] | English: | PROPHYLACTIC AND THERAPEUTIC AGENT FOR ATTENTION-DEFICIT/HYPERACTIVITY DISORDER | [2016/44] | French: | AGENT PROPHYLACTIQUE ET THÉRAPEUTIQUE CONTRE LE TROUBLE DU DÉFICIT DE L' ATTENTION AVEC HYPERACTIVITÉ | [2020/51] |
Former [2016/44] | AGENT PROPHYLACTIQUE ET THÉRAPEUTIQUE CONTRE LE TROUBLE DE DÉFICIT D'ATTENTION AVEC HYPERACTIVITÉ | Entry into regional phase | 13.07.2016 | Translation filed | 13.07.2016 | National basic fee paid | 13.07.2016 | Search fee paid | 13.07.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.07.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.07.2016 | Examination requested [2016/44] | 30.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 06.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 25.02.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.02.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 07.04.2021 | CY | 07.04.2021 | CZ | 07.04.2021 | EE | 07.04.2021 | HR | 07.04.2021 | HU | 07.04.2021 | LT | 07.04.2021 | LV | 07.04.2021 | MC | 07.04.2021 | MK | 07.04.2021 | MT | 07.04.2021 | PL | 07.04.2021 | RO | 07.04.2021 | RS | 07.04.2021 | SK | 07.04.2021 | SM | 07.04.2021 | TR | 07.04.2021 | BG | 07.07.2021 | NO | 07.07.2021 | GR | 08.07.2021 | IS | 07.08.2021 | PT | 09.08.2021 | AT | 15.12.2021 | FI | 15.12.2021 | GB | 15.12.2021 | IE | 15.12.2021 | IT | 15.12.2021 | LU | 15.12.2021 | ES | 16.12.2021 | SE | 16.12.2021 | SI | 16.12.2021 | BE | 31.12.2021 | CH | 31.12.2021 | DK | 31.12.2021 | FR | 31.12.2021 | LI | 31.12.2021 | NL | 01.01.2022 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | AL | 07.04.2021 | |
CY | 07.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
HU | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
MK | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
TR | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
AT | 15.12.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
GB | 15.12.2021 | ||
IE | 15.12.2021 | ||
IT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LU | 15.12.2021 | ||
ES | 16.12.2021 | ||
SE | 16.12.2021 | ||
SI | 16.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
CH | 31.12.2021 | ||
DK | 31.12.2021 | ||
FR | 31.12.2021 | ||
LI | 31.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.01.2022 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AL | 07.04.2021 | |
CY | 07.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
HU | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
MK | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
AT | 15.12.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
GB | 15.12.2021 | ||
IE | 15.12.2021 | ||
IT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LU | 15.12.2021 | ||
ES | 16.12.2021 | ||
SE | 16.12.2021 | ||
SI | 16.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
CH | 31.12.2021 | ||
DK | 31.12.2021 | ||
FR | 31.12.2021 | ||
LI | 31.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 07.04.2021 | |
CY | 07.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
HU | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
AT | 15.12.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
GB | 15.12.2021 | ||
IE | 15.12.2021 | ||
IT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LU | 15.12.2021 | ||
ES | 16.12.2021 | ||
SE | 16.12.2021 | ||
SI | 16.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
CH | 31.12.2021 | ||
DK | 31.12.2021 | ||
FR | 31.12.2021 | ||
LI | 31.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/27] | AL | 07.04.2021 | |
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
HU | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
AT | 15.12.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
GB | 15.12.2021 | ||
IE | 15.12.2021 | ||
IT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LU | 15.12.2021 | ||
ES | 16.12.2021 | ||
SE | 16.12.2021 | ||
SI | 16.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
CH | 31.12.2021 | ||
DK | 31.12.2021 | ||
FR | 31.12.2021 | ||
LI | 31.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AL | 07.04.2021 | |
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
AT | 15.12.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
GB | 15.12.2021 | ||
IE | 15.12.2021 | ||
IT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LU | 15.12.2021 | ||
ES | 16.12.2021 | ||
SE | 16.12.2021 | ||
SI | 16.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
CH | 31.12.2021 | ||
DK | 31.12.2021 | ||
FR | 31.12.2021 | ||
LI | 31.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 07.04.2021 | |
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
GB | 15.12.2021 | ||
IE | 15.12.2021 | ||
IT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LU | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 16.12.2021 | ||
SI | 16.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
CH | 31.12.2021 | ||
DK | 31.12.2021 | ||
FR | 31.12.2021 | ||
LI | 31.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AL | 07.04.2021 | |
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
GB | 15.12.2021 | ||
IE | 15.12.2021 | ||
LU | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 16.12.2021 | ||
SI | 16.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
CH | 31.12.2021 | ||
DK | 31.12.2021 | ||
FR | 31.12.2021 | ||
LI | 31.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/03] | AL | 07.04.2021 | |
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
GB | 15.12.2021 | ||
IE | 15.12.2021 | ||
LU | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 16.12.2021 | ||
SI | 16.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
CH | 31.12.2021 | ||
FR | 31.12.2021 | ||
LI | 31.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 07.04.2021 | |
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
GB | 15.12.2021 | ||
IE | 15.12.2021 | ||
LU | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 16.12.2021 | ||
SI | 16.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
FR | 31.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AL | 07.04.2021 | |
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
GB | 15.12.2021 | ||
IE | 15.12.2021 | ||
LU | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 16.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AL | 07.04.2021 | |
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
GB | 15.12.2021 | ||
LU | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 16.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AL | 07.04.2021 | |
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
LU | 15.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/44] | AL | 07.04.2021 | |
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | AL | 07.04.2021 | |
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 07.04.2021 | |
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 07.04.2021 | |
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | CZ | 07.04.2021 | |
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | CZ | 07.04.2021 | |
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | CZ | 07.04.2021 | |
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | HR | 07.04.2021 | |
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | HR | 07.04.2021 | |
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | HR | 07.04.2021 | |
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | HR | 07.04.2021 | |
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | HR | 07.04.2021 | |
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | LT | 07.04.2021 | |
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | LT | 07.04.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2011207718 (BIRD PHILIP [AU]) [X] 1-6* paragraph [0090]; claims 2, 13, 22 * | International search | [A]WO9907667 (FUJIMOTO BROTHERS CO LTD [JP], et al); | [Y]WO0026204 (FUJIMOTO BROTHERS CO LTD [JP], et al); | [Y] - SEIICHIRO SHIMAZU ET AL., "Transporter- mediated actions of R-(-)-1-(benzofuran-2-yl)- 2-propylaminopentane", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY, (2003), vol. 482, pages 9 - 16, XP055355385 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ejphar.2003.09.044 | [Y] - FUMIO YONEDA ET AL., "Structure-activity studies leading to (-)1-(Benzofuran-2-yl)-2- propylaminopentane, ((-)BPAP), a highly potent, selective enhancer of the impulse propagation mediated release of Catecholamines and Serotonin in the brain", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (2001), vol. 9, pages 1197 - 1212, XP055355387 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0968-0896(01)00002-5 | [Y] - TIMOTHY E. WILENS, "Mechanism of Action of Agents Used in Attention-Deficit/Hyperactivity Disorder", J CLIN PSYCHIATRY, (2006), vol. 67, no. SUPPL, pages 32 - 37, XP008184070 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4088/JCP.v67n0502 | by applicant | WO9907667 | WO0026204 | WO0107704 | JP2003089643 | WO2006057211 | WO2007001015 | JP2013056944 | - "Text Revision (DSM-IV-TR", The Diagnostic and Statistical Manual of Mental Disorders, AMERICAN PSYCHIATRIC ASSOCIATION | - SWANSON JM ET AL., NEUROPSYCHOLOGY REVIEW, (2007), vol. 17, pages 39 - 59 | - FRANKE B ET AL., HUMAN GENETICS, (2009), vol. 126, pages 13 - 50 | - SHIMAZU S ET AL., LIFE SCIENCE, (2003), vol. 72, pages 2785 - 92 | - JAPANESE JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY, (2000), vol. 82, no. 1, page 230P | - JAPANESE JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY, (2001), vol. 85, no. 1, page 249P | - NEUROPSYCHOPHARMACOLOGY, (2002), vol. 27, pages 699 - 711 | - SARTER ET AL., PSYCHOPHARMACOLOGY (BERL, (1988), vol. 94, pages 491 - 5 |