EP3089550 - LIGHT-EMITTING ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.08.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.09.2018 [2018/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JX Nippon Oil & Energy Corporation 1-2, Otemachi, 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8162 / JP | [2016/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NISHIMURA, Suzushi c/o JX Nippon Oil & Energy Corporation 1-2, Otemachi1 - chome Chiyoda - ku Tokyo 100-8162 / JP | 02 /
SHIBANUMA, Toshihiko c/o JX Nippon Oil&Energy Corporation 1- 2, Otemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8162 / JP | 03 /
TORIYAMA, Shigetaka c/o JX Nippon Oil&Energy Corporation 1-2, Otemachi 1- chome Chiyoda- ku Tokyo 100-8162 / JP | [2016/44] | Representative(s) | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/44] | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 14875433.6 | 26.11.2014 | [2016/44] | WO2014JP81182 | Priority number, date | JP20130272344 | 27.12.2013 Original published format: JP 2013272344 | [2016/44] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015098401 | Date: | 02.07.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3089550 | Date: | 02.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.07.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H05B33/02, H01L51/52, H05B33/22 | [2017/36] | CPC: |
H10K50/858 (EP,KR,US);
H10K50/11 (US);
H10K50/828 (US);
H10K71/00 (US);
H10K77/10 (KR);
H01L33/24 (US);
H10K2101/00 (US);
H10K2102/351 (EP,KR);
H10K50/80 (US);
|
Former IPC [2016/44] | H05B33/02, H01L51/50, H05B33/22 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/44] | Title | German: | LICHTEMITTIERENDES ELEMENT | [2016/44] | English: | LIGHT-EMITTING ELEMENT | [2016/44] | French: | ÉLÉMENT ÉLECTROLUMINESCENT | [2016/44] | Entry into regional phase | 20.05.2016 | Translation filed | 20.05.2016 | National basic fee paid | 20.05.2016 | Search fee paid | 20.05.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.05.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.05.2016 | Examination requested [2016/44] | 02.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/36] | 19.04.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2017 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2010327304 (SONODA SHINICHIRO [JP], et al); | [IY]CA2856007 (JX NIPPON OIL & ENERGY CORP [JP]) | International search | [Y]JP2003031353 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]JP2008066027 (FUJI ELECTRIC HOLDINGS); | [Y]JP2008098083 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD); | [Y]JP2008117735 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD); | [Y]JP2011054526 (FUJIFILM CORP); | [A]JP2011060720 (FUJIFILM CORP); | [Y]JP2011071012 (FUJIFILM CORP); | [Y]WO2013018149 (HITACHI LTD [JP], et al); | [Y]WO2013161454 (JX NIPPON OIL & ENERGY CORP [JP]) | by applicant | JPH05238827 | JPH06122852 | JPH06240208 | JPH06299118 | JPH06306329 | JPH07196986 | JPH08112879 | WO2011007878 | JP2011054407 | WO2012096368 | WO2012147759 | WO2013161454 |