Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
02.11.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.12.2018 [2018/49] |
26.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant | |
16.12.2017 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
07.07.2017 | Supplementary search report | published on 09.08.2017 [2017/32] |
07.07.2017 | Change - classification | published on 09.08.2017 [2017/32] |
03.03.2017 | Change - extension states | published on 05.04.2017 [2017/14] |
16.12.2016 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
07.10.2016 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 09.11.2016 [2016/45] |
07.10.2016 | Request for examination filed | published on 09.11.2016 [2016/45] |
20.07.2016 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
05.07.2016 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
02.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant | |
30.06.2016 | Change - representative | |
30.06.2016 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
21.07.2015 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
10.07.2015 | PCT data prior to European publication |