Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2016299280 | Global Dossier | 13.10.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361922217 | 31.12.2013 | US201415036334 | 30.12.2014 | WO2014US72649 | 30.12.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20160105455 | Global Dossier | 06.09.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361922217 | 31.12.2013 | WO2014US72649 | 30.12.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2017503321 | Global Dossier | 26.01.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361922217 | 31.12.2013 | WO2014US72649 | 30.12.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105849604 | Global Dossier | 10.08.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361922217 | 31.12.2013 | WO2014US72649 | 30.12.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3090293 | Global Dossier | 09.08.2017 | A4 | EP3090293 | 09.11.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361922217 | 31.12.2013 | WO2014US72649 | 30.12.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2935238 | 09.07.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361922217 | 31.12.2013 | WO2014US72649 | 30.12.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2015103188 | Global Dossier | 09.07.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361922217 | 31.12.2013 |